« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, Maricopa
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Raul Portillo - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Brown, David
Judge
Fisher
Case #
CR2007-103272-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Raul Portillo
Crime Date
12/15/2005
Date
2/13/2008
Description
FORGERY
ARSCode
13-2002 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Raul Portillo
Crime Date
12/15/2005
Date
1/28/2008
Description
TAKING IDENTITY OF ANOTHER
ARSCode
13-2008 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2010
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1/OFFENSE DESIGNATED A FELONY
Filing Date
2/28/2008
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/29/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2008
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/15/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 1-25-08
Filing Date
2/13/2008
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2008
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
2/13/2008
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/14/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2008
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2008
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2008
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2008
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 1-21-08
Filing Date
1/23/2008
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2007
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2007
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/28/2008
Time
8:35
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/28/2008
Time
8:36
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/31/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/13/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing