Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Hymas, Douglas | ||
Michael Arthur Wood - (2) |
Defendant | M | Macias, Carolyn | LaBianca | CR2007-007191-001 |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Michael Arthur Wood | 13-2004 (M1) | CRIMINAL SIMULATION | 12/20/2006 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 5/13/2008 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
8/6/2009 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/6/2009 | |
NOTE: DENIED CIVIL RIGHTS/DENIED VACATE JUDGMENT/DISMISS CHARGES | |||
7/8/2009 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (001) | 7/8/2009 | |
NOTE: CFO INFO | |||
6/17/2009 | AVJ - Application to Vacate Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (001) | 6/19/2009 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: TO RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS | |||
4/28/2009 | ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (001) | 5/7/2009 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 | |||
3/23/2009 | PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001) | 3/25/2009 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 | |||
7/2/2008 | 109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001) | 7/2/2008 | |
6/27/2008 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 7/2/2008 | |
6/27/2008 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 7/2/2008 | |
NOTE: WITH RELATED CASE CR2007-170473-001DT | |||
6/27/2008 | TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001) | 7/3/2008 | |
NOTE: COUNT I | |||
5/19/2008 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 5/19/2008 | |
5/13/2008 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 5/16/2008 | |
5/12/2008 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001) | 5/12/2008 | |
4/1/2008 | DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001) | 4/1/2008 | |
NOTE: | |||
1/29/2008 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001) | 1/29/2008 | |
12/12/2007 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 12/12/2007 | |
12/10/2007 | WPH - Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001) | 12/14/2007 | |
12/10/2007 | INF - Information - Party (001) | 12/14/2007 | |
12/10/2007 | ROR - Release Order - Party (001) | 12/14/2007 | |
NOTE: OWN RECOGNIZANCE 12/10/07 | |||
11/29/2007 | 179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (001) | 11/29/2007 | |
11/26/2007 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 12/3/2007 | |
11/26/2007 | ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond - Party (001) | 12/3/2007 | |
11/26/2007 | ROR - Release Order - Party (001) | 12/3/2007 | |
NOTE: OWN RECOGNIZANCE 11/26/07 | |||
11/5/2007 | WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001) | 11/6/2007 | |
NOTE: SERVED 10-26-07 | |||
11/2/2007 | BON - Bond - Party (001) | 11/5/2007 | |
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY $1200 BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY | |||
7/30/2007 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001) | 7/30/2007 | |
7/17/2007 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001) | 7/18/2007 | |
7/17/2007 | SUM - Summons - Party (001) | 7/18/2007 | |
6/21/2007 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 6/22/2007 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
7/24/2007 | 10:00 | Initial Appearance |
11/26/2007 | 13:30 | Initial Appearance / Wfa |
12/10/2007 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
12/10/2007 | 8:31 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
12/14/2007 | 8:30 | Preliminary Hearing |
1/23/2008 | 8:30 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
5/7/2008 | 8:30 | Trial Management Conference |
5/13/2008 | 8:30 | Trial Management Conference |
5/13/2008 | 13:30 | Trial |
6/27/2008 | 8:30 | Sentencing |