« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Schenks, Rene      
Party is a minor: name not published   Defendant  M   Public Defender-, Ccc   Brickner  CR2007-006287-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Not Published  13-1102 (F4)  NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE  4/7/2007  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  4/25/2008 
Not Published  28-661 (F3)  HIT AND RUN W/DEATH/INJURY  4/7/2007  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  4/25/2008 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/12/2015  ORR - Order re: Restoring Civil Rights - Party (001)  10/13/2015   
8/12/2015  CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001)  8/12/2015   
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
8/6/2015  APL - Application - Party (001)  8/6/2015  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: TO RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS
11/13/2014  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)  11/18/2014   
NOTE: COUNT 2
9/4/2014  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)  9/8/2014   
5/8/2014  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/8/2014   
4/30/2014  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  4/30/2014   
NOTE: COUNT 2
4/29/2014  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  4/29/2014   
NOTE: IA Packet
4/29/2014  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  4/29/2014   
NOTE: IA Release Order
4/21/2014  580 - ME: Dispo Reinst-Rev Arr/Hrg - Party (001)  4/21/2014   
4/21/2014  DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)  4/22/2014   
4/18/2014  PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)  4/23/2014   
4/18/2014  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  4/24/2014   
4/18/2014  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  4/23/2014   
NOTE: MITIGATION SUBMISSION
4/18/2014  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  4/24/2014   
4/4/2014  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  4/4/2014   
3/19/2014  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  3/19/2014   
3/12/2014  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  3/12/2014   
3/7/2014  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  3/7/2014   
3/4/2014  ASN – Amended/Supp Pet/Order to Revoke Probation no warrant - Party (001)  3/4/2014   
NOTE: COUNT 2/WARRANTLESS
3/3/2014  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  3/3/2014   
NOTE: IA Packet
3/3/2014  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  3/3/2014   
NOTE: IA Release Order
2/11/2014  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  2/11/2014   
1/30/2014  BON - Bond - Party (001)  2/3/2014   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY/$3,600/FINANCIAL CASUALTY & SURETY
1/22/2014  176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)  1/22/2014   
1/7/2014  112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)  1/7/2014   
12/31/2013  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  12/31/2013   
NOTE: COUNT 2
12/30/2013  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  12/30/2013   
NOTE: IA Release Order
12/30/2013  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  12/30/2013   
NOTE: IA Packet
8/15/2013  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  8/15/2013   
6/20/2013  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  6/24/2013  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: REQUEST FOR EARLY RELEASE FROM PROBATION
6/19/2013  RPT - Response to Petition for Early Termination - Party (001)  6/24/2013   
NOTE: OF DEFENDANTS PROBATION: CRIMINAL RULE 27.4
5/17/2013  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)  5/23/2013  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: EARLY RELASED FROM PROBATION
12/5/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/5/2012   
12/3/2012  BON - Bond - Party (001)  12/10/2012   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY $3600 LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY
11/28/2012  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  12/6/2012   
NOTE: COUNT 2
11/21/2012  112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)  11/21/2012   
11/14/2012  ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)  11/15/2012   
NOTE: IA Release Order
11/14/2012  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  11/15/2012   
NOTE: IA Packet
9/15/2010  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (001)  9/21/2010   
7/2/2008  ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)  7/2/2008   
7/2/2008  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  7/3/2008   
6/17/2008  189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (001)  6/17/2008   
6/13/2008  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (001)  6/19/2008   
6/13/2008  REP - Report - Party (001)  6/19/2008   
NOTE: MITIGATION
6/13/2008  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  6/18/2008   
6/13/2008  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  6/18/2008   
6/13/2008  OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)  6/18/2008   
6/12/2008  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  6/13/2008   
NOTE: SENTENCING MITIGATION HEARING FOR TEN DAYS
6/12/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/13/2008   
NOTE: TO ACCELERATE MOTION TO CONTINUE SENTENCING AND MITIGATION HEARING
6/12/2008  MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)  6/13/2008   
NOTE: SENTENCING / WITH LETTERS FROM VICTIMS FAMILY AND FRIENDS
6/5/2008  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  6/13/2008   
NOTE: SERVED 06/04/08
6/5/2008  SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)  6/13/2008   
NOTE: TO APPEAR AT SENTENCING
5/29/2008  SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)  6/4/2008   
5/29/2008  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  6/3/2008   
NOTE: SERVED 05/20/08
5/5/2008  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  5/5/2008   
4/25/2008  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  4/29/2008   
4/1/2008  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  4/1/2008   
3/25/2008  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  3/25/2008   
NOTE: TO RELEASE PROPERTY
3/19/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  3/20/2008   
NOTE: FOR RETURN OF TRUCK
3/19/2008  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  3/19/2008   
NOTE:
3/7/2008  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  3/7/2008   
3/6/2008  ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (001)  3/11/2008   
3/5/2008  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  3/5/2008   
2/25/2008  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  2/25/2008   
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS
2/21/2008  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  2/25/2008   
NOTE: TRIAL DATE
2/19/2008  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  2/19/2008   
2/14/2008  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  2/15/2008   
NOTE: OMNIBUS/
2/14/2008  REQ - Request - Party (001)  2/14/2008   
NOTE: FOR COURT INTERPRETER
2/13/2008  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  2/13/2008   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE ADMISSION OF INADMISSIBLE HEARSAY
2/13/2008  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  2/13/2008   
NOTE: RE: DEFENDANTS PENALTY
2/13/2008  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  2/13/2008   
NOTE: RE: DEFENDANTS CHARACTER EVIDENCE
2/13/2008  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  2/13/2008   
NOTE: TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY
2/13/2008  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)  2/13/2008   
NOTE:
2/11/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  2/13/2008   
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS STATEMENTS
2/7/2008  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  2/20/2008   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
2/7/2008  ORD - Order - Party (001)  2/21/2008   
NOTE: GRANTING RELEASE OF F ROBERT WALMSLEYS MEDICAL RECORDS
2/6/2008  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  2/6/2008   
1/30/2008  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  1/31/2008   
NOTE: STATUS CONFERENCE
1/23/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  1/24/2008   
NOTE: FOR RELEASE OF F ROBERT WALMSLEYS MEDICAL RECORDS
1/14/2008  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  1/15/2008   
1/9/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  1/9/2008   
1/9/2008  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  1/9/2008   
1/9/2008  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  1/9/2008   
NOTE: 2 VOL
12/18/2007  089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)  12/18/2007   
12/12/2007  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  12/18/2007   
NOTE: JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
11/27/2007  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  11/27/2007   
11/16/2007  NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)  11/16/2007   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL
11/8/2007  STA - Statement - Party (001)  11/16/2007   
NOTE: PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT/
11/6/2007  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)  11/6/2007   
10/24/2007  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  10/24/2007   
10/18/2007  ORD - Order - Party (001)  10/22/2007   
9/28/2007  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  9/28/2007   
9/27/2007  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  9/27/2007   
9/20/2007  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  9/21/2007   
NOTE: FOR RELEASE OF VICTIMS MEDICAL RECORDS
9/17/2007  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  9/17/2007   
NOTE: SERVED 9/13/07
9/12/2007  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  9/17/2007   
9/12/2007  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  9/17/2007   
9/7/2007  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)  9/7/2007   
9/4/2007  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  9/4/2007   
8/29/2007  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)  8/29/2007   
8/21/2007  590 - ME: Complex Case Order - Party (001)  8/21/2007   
8/7/2007  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (001)  8/7/2007   
8/2/2007  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  8/6/2007   
NOTE: OF ERRATA
7/30/2007  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  7/31/2007   
NOTE: FINAL TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL AND MOTION TO DESIGNATE MATTERS AS A COMPLEX CASE
7/30/2007  REL - Reply - Party (001)  7/31/2007   
NOTE: AMENDED/IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBALBE CAUSE
7/27/2007  REL - Reply - Party (001)  7/30/2007   
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
7/20/2007  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  7/20/2007   
7/18/2007  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/20/2007   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO REMAND TO GRAND JURY
7/17/2007  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/19/2007   
NOTE: AMENDED / FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
7/11/2007  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)  7/13/2007   
7/11/2007  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/13/2007   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL/OF DISCLOSURE
7/11/2007  RES - Response - Party (001)  7/13/2007   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE, REDUCE BONE, AND/OR RELEASE THIRT PARTY
7/10/2007  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/10/2007   
7/5/2007  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  7/11/2007   
7/5/2007  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/11/2007   
7/5/2007  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  7/11/2007   
7/5/2007  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  7/5/2007   
NOTE: eFile Id 91659 -- SUPPLEMENTAL/OF DISCLOSURE
7/2/2007  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/5/2007   
NOTE: TO RELEASE DEFENDANT ON HIS OWN RECOGNIZANCE, REDUCE BOND, AND/OR THIRD PARTY RELEASE
7/2/2007  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  7/5/2007   
NOTE: FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE
7/2/2007  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  7/2/2007   
6/28/2007  STA - Statement - Party (001)  7/5/2007   
NOTE: PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT/
6/27/2007  NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)  6/28/2007   
NOTE: eFile Id 89853 --
6/27/2007  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)  6/28/2007   
NOTE: TO STATE'S MOTION TO CONTINUE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
6/19/2007  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/25/2007   
6/18/2007  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/19/2007   
6/18/2007  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  6/19/2007   
NOTE: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
6/18/2007  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  6/19/2007   
5/30/2007  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/30/2007   
5/29/2007  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/19/2007   
5/29/2007  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/6/2007   
NOTE: GRANTING RELEASE OF GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPTS TO DEFENDANT
5/22/2007  REQ - Request - Party (001)  5/25/2007   
NOTE: FOR GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPTS
5/21/2007  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  5/24/2007   
5/14/2007  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  5/17/2007   
5/10/2007  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  5/10/2007   
5/7/2007  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  5/15/2007   
NOTE: ORIGINAL ARRAIGNMENT HEARING
5/7/2007  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  5/8/2007   
5/3/2007  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)  5/3/2007   
NOTE: SERVED 5/2/07
4/30/2007  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  5/3/2007   
4/30/2007  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)  5/3/2007   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
5/9/2007  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
5/16/2007  8:30   Arraignment Hearing 
5/30/2007  8:30   Arraignment Hearing 
6/28/2007  10:00   Initial Pretrial Conference 
7/16/2007  10:00   Status Conference 
7/16/2007  10:00   Oral Argument 
8/14/2007  8:30   Oral Argument 
8/21/2007  8:30   Status Conference 
8/29/2007  11:30   Oral Argument 
9/21/2007  8:30   Arraignment Hearing 
9/24/2007  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
10/4/2007  10:30   Trial 
10/23/2007  9:00   Status Conference 
11/8/2007  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
12/12/2007  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
1/31/2008  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
1/31/2008  10:30   Trial 
2/7/2008  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
2/26/2008  8:30   Complex / Capital Case 
3/5/2008  10:30   Trial 
3/21/2008  13:30   Oral Argument 
3/24/2008  10:30   Trial 
4/25/2008  9:00   Evidentiary Hearing 
6/13/2008  8:30   Sentencing 
11/14/2012  8:00   Initial Appearance 
11/20/2012  10:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
12/30/2013  5:00   Initial Appearance 
1/6/2014  10:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
1/21/2014  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
2/4/2014  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
3/3/2014  2:00   Initial Appearance 
3/6/2014  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
3/10/2014  10:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
3/10/2014  10:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
3/18/2014  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
3/18/2014  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
4/3/2014  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
4/3/2014  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
4/18/2014  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
4/18/2014  8:30   Non-Witness Violation Hearing 
4/18/2014  8:35   Disposition Hearing 
4/29/2014  2:00   Initial Appearance 
click here for Law Library Resource Center