Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Maricopa      
Angela C Cruz - (2)
 
Defendant  F   Carson, Michelle   Pineda  CR2007-006208-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Angela C Cruz  13-1102 (F4)  NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE  9/23/2005  Remand To Grand Jury  Remand To Grand Jury  6/13/2007 
Angela C Cruz  13-1102 (F4)  NEGLIGENT HOMICIDE  9/23/2005  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  1/11/2008 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/11/2008  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  3/11/2008   
2/21/2008  RES - Response - Party (001)  2/21/2008   
NOTE: TO STATE'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER PREJUDICE 
1/24/2008  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  1/28/2008   
1/22/2008  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001)  1/22/2008   
NOTE:  
1/16/2008  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)  1/16/2008   
1/11/2008  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  1/17/2008   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE 
12/7/2007  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)  12/7/2007   
11/27/2007  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  11/27/2007   
11/23/2007  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  11/23/2007   
11/15/2007  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  11/15/2007   
11/15/2007  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  11/15/2007   
NOTE: IMPROPER OPINION EVIDENCE 
11/15/2007  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  11/16/2007   
NOTE: TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE FOR DOUBLE JEOPARDY 
11/13/2007  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  11/13/2007   
NOTE: TRIAL 
11/8/2007  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  11/9/2007   
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE FOR DOUBLE JEOPARDY 
11/7/2007  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  11/7/2007   
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE FOR DOUBLE JEOPARDY  
11/7/2007  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  11/8/2007   
NOTE: RE: DEFENDANT'S PENALTY 
11/7/2007  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  11/8/2007   
NOTE: RE: HELMETS 
11/7/2007  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  11/8/2007   
NOTE: RE: DEFENDANT'S CHARACTER EVIDENCE 
11/7/2007  MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)  11/8/2007   
NOTE: TO PRECLUDE ADMISSION OF INADMISSIBLE HEARSAY 
11/6/2007  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  11/6/2007   
NOTE: TO COMPEL DISCOVERY 
10/1/2007  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  10/1/2007   
9/28/2007  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  10/1/2007   
NOTE: AMENDED / 
9/19/2007  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  9/19/2007   
9/10/2007  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  9/10/2007   
8/31/2007  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  9/4/2007   
NOTE: 2 VOL 
8/31/2007  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  8/31/2007   
8/30/2007  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  8/31/2007   
8/30/2007  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  8/31/2007   
8/30/2007  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  8/31/2007   
8/29/2007  STA - Statement - Party (001)  9/4/2007   
NOTE: PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT/ 
8/28/2007  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  8/29/2007   
NOTE: TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
8/6/2007  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  8/6/2007   
7/26/2007  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  7/30/2007   
NOTE: TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
7/17/2007  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  7/17/2007   
7/16/2007  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)  7/16/2007   
7/11/2007  ROR - Release Order - Party (001)  7/31/2007   
NOTE: SUPERVISED RELEASE 07/11/07 
7/3/2007  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  7/6/2007   
NOTE: TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
7/2/2007  SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  7/2/2007   
NOTE: SERVED 6/29/07 REMAND 
6/27/2007  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  7/2/2007   
NOTE: REMAND 
6/27/2007  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)  7/2/2007   
6/15/2007  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  6/15/2007   
6/13/2007  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  6/15/2007   
NOTE: TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE OR REMAND TO GRAND JURY 
6/6/2007  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/8/2007   
NOTE: TO STRIKE STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR DISMISSAL AND/OR REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY 
6/5/2007  RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)  6/7/2007   
NOTE: TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE OR REMAND TO GRAND JURY 
6/4/2007  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)  6/4/2007   
6/1/2007  ROR - Release Order - Party (001)  6/7/2007   
NOTE: SUPERVISED RELEASE 06/01/07 
5/29/2007  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)  5/29/2007   
5/24/2007  MRD - Motion to Release Defendant on Own Recognizance, Reduce Bond and/or Release to a Third Party - Party (001)  5/29/2007   
NOTE: EVIDENTIARY HEARING AND ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED 
5/23/2007  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (001)  5/24/2007   
5/18/2007  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/21/2007   
5/16/2007  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  5/16/2007   
5/16/2007  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  5/17/2007   
5/16/2007  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/17/2007   
5/16/2007  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/17/2007   
5/15/2007  ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (001)  5/17/2007   
5/15/2007  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  5/15/2007   
NOTE: eFile Id 75884 -- WITH PREJUDICE, OR REMAND TO GRAND JURY FOR REDETERMINATION OF PROBABLE CAUSE PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9, ARIZ.R.CRIM.P. 
5/14/2007  NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001)  5/14/2007   
NOTE: eFile Id 75276 --  
5/14/2007  REQ - Request - Party (001)  5/14/2007   
NOTE: eFile Id 75278 -- FOR COURT INTERPRETER AND ORDER 
5/11/2007  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  5/11/2007   
5/9/2007  STA - Statement - Party (001)  5/22/2007   
NOTE: PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT 
4/17/2007  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  4/17/2007   
4/16/2007  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/16/2007   
4/13/2007  REQ - Request - Party (001)  4/16/2007   
NOTE: FOR VOLUTARNINESS HEARING 
4/13/2007  RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)  4/16/2007   
NOTE: TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS 
4/13/2007  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  4/16/2007   
NOTE: DUCES TECUM SERVED 04/12/07 
4/12/2007  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  4/16/2007   
4/12/2007  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/16/2007   
4/12/2007  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  4/16/2007   
4/12/2007  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  4/13/2007   
4/12/2007  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)  4/16/2007   
4/9/2007  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  4/11/2007   
4/4/2007  ROR - Release Order - Party (001)  4/12/2007   
NOTE: SUPERVISED RELEASE 04/04/07 
4/4/2007  DRO - Indigent Defense Reimbursement Order - Party (001)  4/20/2007   
3/26/2007  SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  3/26/2007   
NOTE: SERVED 3/20/07 
3/13/2007  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  3/26/2007   
3/13/2007  600 - ME: GJ True Bill/Summons Issued - Party (001)  3/26/2007   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
4/4/2007  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
5/9/2007  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/1/2007  8:30   Oral Argument 
6/6/2007  8:30   Status Conference 
6/13/2007  8:30   Status Conference 
7/11/2007  8:30   Arraignment Hearing 
8/22/2007  10:30   Trial 
8/29/2007  8:15   Initial Pretrial Conference 
9/13/2007  9:30   Settlement Conference 
9/19/2007  15:30   Settlement Conference 
9/25/2007  8:30   Comprehensive PreTrial Conference 
11/13/2007  8:30   Status Conference 
11/20/2007  8:00   Hearing Pending Motion 
11/20/2007  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
12/10/2007  10:30   Trial 
12/10/2007  10:31   Oral Argument 
3/3/2008  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
3/10/2008  10:30   Trial