Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   County Attorney, Maricopa      
Shawn M Chock - (2)
 
Defendant  M   Defender, Public   Phillips  CR2006-174811-001  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Shawn M Chock  13-1204 (F3)  AGGRAVATED ASSAULT  8/8/2006  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment  4/27/2007 
Shawn M Chock  13-2904A6 (M1)  DISORD CONDUCT-WEAPON/INSTR  8/8/2006  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  12/4/2007 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
2/2/2010  DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)  2/5/2010   
1/11/2010  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)  1/11/2010   
1/7/2010  CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)  1/25/2010   
1/7/2010  ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (001)  1/28/2010   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
12/2/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)  12/2/2009   
12/1/2009  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  12/2/2009   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
12/1/2009  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  12/8/2009   
11/18/2009  112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)  11/18/2009   
4/28/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  4/30/2009   
NOTE: FOR EATLY TERMINATION OF JAIL 
3/20/2009  DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001)  3/26/2009   
3/16/2009  114 - ME: Dispo-Reinstate - Party (001)  3/16/2009   
3/13/2009  PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001)  3/18/2009   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
3/13/2009  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  3/18/2009   
3/13/2009  PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001)  3/16/2009   
3/13/2009  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (001)  3/16/2009   
3/13/2009  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)  3/16/2009   
3/6/2009  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (001)  3/6/2009   
2/26/2009  112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001)  2/26/2009   
2/6/2009  004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (001)  2/6/2009   
10/31/2008  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001)  11/7/2008   
NOTE: COUNT 1 
2/7/2008  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)  2/8/2008   
1/31/2008  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)  1/31/2008   
1/25/2008  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)  1/30/2008   
1/25/2008  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)  1/31/2008   
1/25/2008  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)  2/4/2008   
1/25/2008  STA - Statement - Party (001)  2/4/2008   
NOTE: VICTIM'S/ 
12/10/2007  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)  12/10/2007   
12/7/2007  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)  12/10/2007   
11/27/2007  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  11/27/2007   
10/16/2007  085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)  10/16/2007   
10/12/2007  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  10/12/2007   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL /  
10/11/2007  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)  10/11/2007   
10/3/2007  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)  10/3/2007   
NOTE:  
10/3/2007  RES - Response - Party (001)  10/3/2007   
NOTE: TO THE STATES MOTION TO CONTINUE 
10/1/2007  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  10/1/2007   
NOTE:  
7/5/2007  029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)  7/5/2007   
6/14/2007  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/19/2007   
6/13/2007  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)  6/13/2007   
6/13/2007  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  6/14/2007   
6/13/2007  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/14/2007   
6/13/2007  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/14/2007   
6/7/2007  DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)  6/7/2007   
NOTE: eFile Id 83632 --  
6/7/2007  ANP - Allegation of Aggravating Circumstances Other Than Prior Convictions - Party (001)  6/7/2007   
NOTE: eFile Id 83633 --  
6/7/2007  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (001)  6/8/2007   
NOTE: eFile Id 84062 -- SUPPLEMENTAL/ 
6/6/2007  STA - Statement - Party (001)  6/18/2007   
NOTE: PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT/ 
5/31/2007  MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)  5/31/2007   
NOTE: eFile Id 81162 --  
5/31/2007  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  6/1/2007   
5/25/2007  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)  5/25/2007   
5/25/2007  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/25/2007   
5/25/2007  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)  5/25/2007   
5/16/2007  NOT - Notice - Party (001)  5/16/2007   
NOTE: eFile Id 76299 -- OF DEFENSES, LIST OF WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS 
5/9/2007  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)  5/18/2007   
4/27/2007  MOT - Motion - Party (001)  6/12/2007   
NOTE: TO VACATE PRELIMINARY HEARING 
4/26/2007  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  4/27/2007  Plaintiff (1)  
4/26/2007  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)  4/27/2007   
4/26/2007  IND - Indictment - Party (001)  4/27/2007  Plaintiff (1)  
4/3/2007  584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)  4/3/2007   
3/30/2007  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/12/2007   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO SET WITNESS PRELIM HEARING 
3/29/2007  584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)  3/29/2007   
3/23/2007  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)  6/12/2007   
2/20/2007  584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)  2/20/2007   
2/16/2007  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/12/2007   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE 
1/29/2007  584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)  1/29/2007   
1/26/2007  ORD - Order - Party (001)  6/12/2007   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE 
1/10/2007  179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (001)  1/10/2007   
1/9/2007  ROR - Release Order - Party (001)  6/12/2007   
NOTE: SUPERVISED RELEASE 1-9-07 
12/27/2006  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)  12/28/2006   
12/18/2006  SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)  12/19/2006   
NOTE: SERVED 12/14/06 
12/7/2006  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)  12/7/2006   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/9/2007  10:00   Initial Appearance 
1/26/2007  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
2/16/2007  8:45   Preliminary Hearing 
3/23/2007  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
3/30/2007  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
4/27/2007  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
5/7/2007  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
6/6/2007  10:00   Initial Pretrial Conference 
6/28/2007  9:00   Status Conference 
10/2/2007  13:00   Trial 
10/4/2007  8:00   Hearing Pending Motion 
10/15/2007  10:00   Trial Management Conference 
10/22/2007  10:30   Trial 
11/20/2007  9:00   Trial Management Conference 
12/4/2007  9:00   Status Conference 
12/10/2007  10:30   Trial 
1/25/2008  9:00   Sentencing 
2/4/2009  14:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
2/25/2009  14:30   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
3/5/2009  8:00   Disposition Hearing 
3/13/2009  8:00   Disposition Hearing 
11/17/2009  11:00   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing