« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, Maricopa
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Kimberly Ann Nelson - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Childers, Kristopher
Judge
ZZ CR Admin
Case #
CR2006-105289-001
Party Name
Paul Richard Nelson - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Defender, Public
Judge
Gantz
Case #
CR2006-105289-002
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2006-105289-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Kimberly Ann Nelson
Crime Date
1/30/2006
Date
11/9/2006
Description
DANGEROUS DRUG VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3407 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Kimberly Ann Nelson
Crime Date
1/30/2006
Date
11/9/2006
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3415 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Paul Richard Nelson
Crime Date
1/30/2006
Date
11/9/2006
Description
DANGEROUS DRUG VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3407 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Paul Richard Nelson
Crime Date
1/30/2006
Date
11/9/2006
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3415 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2012
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2012
Description
PVW - Probation Violation Bench Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
QUASHED 05/14/12
Filing Date
5/15/2012
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2012
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2012
Description
PDP - Petition to Dismiss Petition to Revoke Probation/Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/24/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2/REMAIN UNDESIGNATED/WARRANT E-QUASHED CONFIRM#56822
Filing Date
8/31/2011
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/1/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2011
Description
DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2009
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/18/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2/OFFENSE REMAIN UNDESIGNATED
Filing Date
2/3/2009
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/6/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
$750 PAID TO COUNTY TREASURER
Filing Date
1/13/2009
Description
RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/14/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2009
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2009
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
$750
Filing Date
12/31/2008
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/12/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2008
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/31/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2008
Description
580 - ME: Dispo Reinst-Rev Arr/Hrg - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/2/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2008
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/5/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2008
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/5/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2008
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/8/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2008
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/8/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2008
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/2/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/23/08
Filing Date
11/26/2008
Description
195 - ME: Bond Forfeited - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/26/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2008
Description
BFJ - Bond Forfeiture Judgment - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/28/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2008
Description
180 - ME: Bond Forfeiture Hrg - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/22/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2008
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/20/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2008
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/25/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2007
Description
PVW - Probation Violation Bench Warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/14/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2007
Description
BON - Bond - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $750 BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Filing Date
11/7/2007
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2007
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2007
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
WARRANT ISSUED/BOND $750
Filing Date
8/14/2007
Description
PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
WARRANT ISSUED/$750 BOND
Filing Date
11/20/2006
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
QUASHED 11/09/06
Filing Date
11/15/2006
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2006
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2006
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2006
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/15/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2006
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2006
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2006
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2006
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2006
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/21/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2006
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2006
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/28/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2006
Description
572 - ME: Prosecution Reinstated - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2006
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2006
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE SUSPENDED PROSECUTION
Filing Date
9/14/2006
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/14/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2006
Description
NRV - Notice of Request to Vacate Suspended Prosecution - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/12/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2006
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
QUASHED ON 4/11/06
Filing Date
4/18/2006
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
QUASHED 4/11/06
Filing Date
4/14/2006
Description
588 - ME: Suspension of Prosecution - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/14/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2006
Description
588 - ME: Suspension of Prosecution - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2006
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2006
Description
INF - Information - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2006
Description
DRO - Indigent Defense Reimbursement Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2006
Description
WPH - Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/18/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2006
Description
WPH - Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/17/2006
Description
583 - ME: Preliminary Hearing/Bw Issued - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/17/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2006
Description
583 - ME: Preliminary Hearing/Bw Issued - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/9/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2006
Description
584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/9/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2006
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/4/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2006
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/4/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2006
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2006
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/2/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/8/2006
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/8/2006
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
2/15/2006
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/11/2006
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/11/2006
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/11/2006
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/11/2006
Time
8:31
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
4/11/2006
Time
8:32
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
4/11/2006
Time
8:32
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/18/2006
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/9/2006
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/9/2006
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/9/2006
Time
8:31
Event
Sentencing
Date
11/9/2006
Time
8:31
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/22/2008
Time
14:30
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
8/19/2008
Time
8:00
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
10/14/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Bond Forfeiture Hearing
Date
11/18/2008
Time
13:31
Event
Bond Forfeiture Hearing
Date
12/1/2008
Time
11:00
Event
Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
12/1/2008
Time
11:1
Event
Disposition Hearing