« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Done, Julie
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Hall, Julie
Judge
Mandell
Case #
CR2006-012721-001
Party Name
Samuel John Dieteman - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
SCHAFFER, MARIA
Judge
Mandell
Case #
CR2006-012721-002
Party Name
Linda Thomas - (4)
Relationship
Mitigation Specialist
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2006-012721-002
Disposition Information
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
5/17/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Not Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Not Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
5/24/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Not Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Not Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
6/29/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Not Guilty By Court
Disposition
Not Guilty By Court
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/29/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/29/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/29/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/30/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
7/7/2006
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/29/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Not Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Not Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
7/11/2006
Date
3/13/2009
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
5/17/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Not Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Not Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
5/24/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Not Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Not Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
6/29/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/29/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/29/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/29/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/29/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/30/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
7/7/2006
Date
3/13/2009
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
7/11/2006
Date
3/13/2009
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/30/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
DSCHG FIREARM AT A STRUCTURE
ARSCode
13-1211 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/30/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
DSCHG FIREARM AT A STRUCTURE
ARSCode
13-1211 (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
6/29/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ANIMAL CRUELTY/WORK ANIMAL
ARSCode
13-2910 (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
7/20/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ANIMAL CRUELTY/WORK ANIMAL
ARSCode
13-2910 (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
7/20/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ANIMAL CRUELTY/WORK ANIMAL
ARSCode
13-2910 (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
7/25/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ANIMAL CRUELTY/WORK ANIMAL
ARSCode
13-2910 (F6)
Disposition Code
Not Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Not Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
11/11/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ANIMAL CRUELTY/WORK ANIMAL
ARSCode
13-2910 (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
11/11/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ANIMAL CRUELTY/WORK ANIMAL
ARSCode
13-2910 (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/29/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ANIMAL CRUELTY/WORK ANIMAL
ARSCode
13-2910 (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/30/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ANIMAL CRUELTY/WORK ANIMAL
ARSCode
13-2910 (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/30/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ANIMAL CRUELTY/WORK ANIMAL
ARSCode
13-2910 (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
12/30/2005
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ANIMAL CRUELTY/WORK ANIMAL
ARSCode
13-2910 (F6)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
4/1/2006
Date
3/13/2009
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
6/8/2006
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ARSON OF OCCUPIED STRUCTURE
ARSCode
13-1704 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Dale Shawn Hausner
Crime Date
6/8/2006
Date
3/13/2009
Description
ARSON OF OCCUPIED STRUCTURE
ARSCode
13-1704 (F2)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
Samuel John Dieteman
Crime Date
4/1/2006
Date
4/4/2008
Description
MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Samuel John Dieteman
Crime Date
7/7/2006
Date
7/29/2009
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Samuel John Dieteman
Crime Date
7/7/2006
Date
7/29/2009
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Samuel John Dieteman
Crime Date
6/8/2006
Date
7/29/2009
Description
ARSON OF OCCUPIED STRUCTURE
ARSCode
13-1704 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Samuel John Dieteman
Crime Date
6/8/2006
Date
7/29/2009
Description
ARSON OF OCCUPIED STRUCTURE
ARSCode
13-1704 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Samuel John Dieteman
Crime Date
7/11/2006
Date
7/29/2009
Description
DRIVE BY SHOOTING
ARSCode
13-1209 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Samuel John Dieteman
Crime Date
7/11/2006
Date
7/29/2009
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2013
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2013
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2013
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/11/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2013
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/19/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Vacate Date Set for Competency Hearing and Return to Supreme Court and Motion to Withdraw
Filing Date
6/17/2013
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2013
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RESET DATE FOR COMPETENCY HEARING
Filing Date
4/1/2013
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to Response to Pre-hearing Brief
Filing Date
3/25/2013
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO PRE-HEARING
BRIEF.
Filing Date
3/25/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT
Filing Date
3/18/2013
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Pre-Hearing Brief
Filing Date
3/12/2013
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RESPONSE TO
MOTION TO VACATE
COMPETENCY HEARING
Filing Date
3/11/2013
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to Response to Motion to Disqualify Attorney Generals Office and APAAC-Member Offices
Filing Date
3/4/2013
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ERRATA/NOTICE
OF FILING TRANSCRIPT OF
FEBRUARY 1, 2013
Filing Date
3/4/2013
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motion to Vacate Competency Hearing
Filing Date
2/28/2013
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO HAUSNER’S
MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
ATTORNEY GENERALS
OFFICE AND APAAC MEMBER
OFFICES.
Filing Date
2/28/2013
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Motion to Vacate Competency Hearing
Filing Date
2/28/2013
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO HAUSNER’S
MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
ATTORNEY GENERAL’S
OFFICE AND APAAC MEMBER
OFFICES.
Filing Date
2/25/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO VACATE
COMPETENCY HEARING
Filing Date
2/25/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Disqualify Attorney Generals Office and APAAC-Member Offices
Filing Date
2/22/2013
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for appointment of counsel
Filing Date
2/20/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2013
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2013
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2013
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2013
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING THE MOTION
Filing Date
1/23/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2013
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR SUBMISSION OF EXPERT REPORTS
Filing Date
1/9/2013
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2013
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2013
Description
930 - ME: Order Designating Case Historically Significant - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2013
Description
930 - ME: Order Designating Case Historically Significant - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DESIGNATE CASE AS HISTORICALLY SIGNIFICANT
Filing Date
12/28/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/1/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DESIGNATE CASE AS HISTORICALLY SIGNIFICANT
Filing Date
12/28/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR HISTORICALLY SIGNIFICANT CASE DESIGNATION
Filing Date
12/28/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR HISTORICALLY SIGNIFICANT CASE DESIGNATION
Filing Date
12/20/2012
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Letter of Dr. Gwen Levitt
Filing Date
11/29/2012
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPREME COURT/WITH RELATED CASES CR06-048493-002, CR08-006364-001, CR07-006031-001 AND CR08-007313-002
Filing Date
11/29/2012
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2012
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER ALLOWING CONFIDENTIAL CONTACT VISIT
Filing Date
11/19/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING CONFIDENTIAL CONTACT VISIT
Filing Date
11/19/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING CONFIDENTIAL CONTACT VISIT
Filing Date
11/19/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING CONFIDENTIAL CONTACT VISIT
Filing Date
11/16/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING CONFIDENTIAL CONTACT VISIT
Filing Date
11/2/2012
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation for Order Allowing Confidential Contact Visit
Filing Date
10/10/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2012
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING COMPETENCY EVALUATION
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
for Appointment of Mental Health Expert
Filing Date
9/17/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
to Consolidated Motion/Response
Filing Date
8/30/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Consolidated / to Determine Counsel and Response to Hausners Motion to Vacate Transport order and ensure ethical communications
Filing Date
8/28/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/28/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
to Vacate Transport Order and Ensure Ethical Communications
Filing Date
8/23/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2012
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2012
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RECEIPT OF CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEFENDANT
Filing Date
8/9/2012
Description
PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2012
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
8/3/2012
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
/ TO STATES MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
7/31/2012
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
7/27/2012
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPREME COURT/
Filing Date
4/11/2012
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM SUPREME COURT OWN MOTION
Filing Date
10/19/2010
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/19/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPREME COURT/SUPPLEMENT RECORD BY 11/03/10
Filing Date
4/22/2010
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/22/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/9/2010
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint / for Nunc Pro Tunc Sentencing Order
Filing Date
11/27/2009
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/1/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2009
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/3/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/3/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/3/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2009
Description
571 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (no Monetary Orders Entered) - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/31/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2009
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2009
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/3/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE ALTERNATE JUROR
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/22/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/02/09
Filing Date
7/6/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/7/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/02/09
Filing Date
7/2/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/6/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/29/09
Filing Date
7/2/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/6/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/29/09
Filing Date
7/2/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/6/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/29/09
Filing Date
7/2/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/6/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 06/29/09
Filing Date
7/1/2009
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/30/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2009
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2009
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPREME COURT
Filing Date
6/16/2009
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2009
Description
905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2009
Description
REL - Reply - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO STATES MOTION IN LIMINE
Filing Date
6/5/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
6/1/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/1/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/1/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/1/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2009
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/28/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
MR. DIETMAN'S / TO STATE'S MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING HAUSER JURY INTERVIEW
Filing Date
5/27/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/27/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/21/2009
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2009
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Filing Date
5/15/2009
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/3/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF JURY TRIAL FOR AGGRAVATION PHASE
Filing Date
5/15/2009
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATION/
Filing Date
5/15/2009
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
LEGAL ADVOCATE
Filing Date
5/13/2009
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2009
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/11/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2009
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2009
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPEAL
Filing Date
4/27/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/28/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 04/24/09
Filing Date
4/27/2009
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPREME COURT
Filing Date
4/24/2009
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2009
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/28/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/23/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL/TO COURT REPORTERS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
4/20/2009
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/20/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2009
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2009
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM SUPERIOR COURT
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
571 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (no Monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASES FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/15/2009
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RECORD RELEASE FORM
Filing Date
4/14/2009
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
JURY QUESTIOINNAIRES
Filing Date
4/14/2009
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMPLOYER LETTER FROM ORIGINAL JUROR #5
Filing Date
4/14/2009
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2009
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/14/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOURTH / OF ADDITIONAL MITIGATION WITNESSES
Filing Date
4/13/2009
Description
REC - Receipt - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2009
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
4/9/2009
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/9/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTERS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
4/7/2009
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/7/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2009
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
(OFF LINE) MINUTE ENTRY FOR HEARING HELD 03/25/2009
Filing Date
3/31/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2009
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2009
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM SUPERIOR COURT
Filing Date
3/31/2009
Description
190 - ME: Sentence - Death Penalty - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/31/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2009
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2009
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002, CR2007-006031-001, CR2008-007313-002, CR2008-006364-001
Filing Date
3/30/2009
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2009
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL/
Filing Date
3/30/2009
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/26/2009
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/26/2009
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/26/2009
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/25/2009
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/30/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/25/2009
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/2009
Description
OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2009
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2009
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL / RE: ALLOCUTION
Filing Date
3/26/2009
Description
SME – Sentencing Memo - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/30/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR NON-CAPITAL SENTENCES
Filing Date
3/26/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/14/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL/PENALTY PHASE
Filing Date
3/25/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/25/09
Filing Date
3/25/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/27/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD / OF ADDITIONAL MITIGATION WITNESSES
Filing Date
3/24/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/24/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/24/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/24/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/24/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/24/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/23/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2009
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/20/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2009
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2009
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT REQUEST TO DETERMINE SCOPE OF MITIGATION & REQUEST OF PROTECTIVE ORDER; DR MARK CUNNINGHAM REPORT DATED 03/16/2009
Filing Date
3/17/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
VER - Verdict - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIGNED
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/11/09
Filing Date
3/12/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/11/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3-10-09
Filing Date
3/11/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3-10-09
Filing Date
3/11/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3-10-09
Filing Date
3/11/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 3-9-09
Filing Date
3/10/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/10/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/06/09
Filing Date
3/9/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/9/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2009
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/3/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Supplemental / Phase 2 Jury Instruction
Filing Date
3/2/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2009
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/2/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR AGGRAVATION PHASE
Filing Date
2/27/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/27/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Renewed / to Strike F(6) and F(13) and Requested Aggravation Phase Jury Instruction
Filing Date
2/27/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2009
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2009
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
and PRETRIAL OBJECTIONS TO IMPROPER PROSECUTORIAL ARGUMENTS THAT MISSTATE DEATH PENALTY LAW
Filing Date
2/25/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND PRETRIAL OBJECTIONS TO IMPROPER PROSECUTORIAL ARGUMENTS THAT ADVANCE IMPROPER GROUNDS FOR THE IMPOSITION OF THE DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
2/25/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
and PRETRIAL OBJECTIONS TO IMPROPER PROSECUTORIAL ARGUMENTS THAT MISUSES EVIDENCE RELEVANT TO THE DEATH PENALTY
Filing Date
2/25/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
and PRETRIAL OBJECTIONS TO IMPROPER PROSECUTORIAL ARGUMENTS THAT CAN UNDULY INFLAME A JUROR
Filing Date
2/25/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
and PRETRIAL OBJECTIONS TO IMPROPER PROSECUTORIAL ARGUMENTS THAT MISSTATE THE ROLE OF A JUROR IN A DEATH PENALTY CASE
Filing Date
2/25/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL/
Filing Date
2/23/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL/
Filing Date
2/23/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/24/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 02/23/09
Filing Date
2/20/2009
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF REQUESTING JUDGE
Filing Date
2/19/2009
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
JURY QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
2/19/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF MITIGATING FACTORS
Filing Date
2/19/2009
Description
CER - Certificate - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF REQUESTING JUDGE
Filing Date
2/19/2009
Description
APL - Application - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ATTENDANCE OF OUT OF STATE WITNESS AND DECLARATION OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT THEREOF
Filing Date
2/19/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL PROPOSED/
Filing Date
2/19/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/2/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF MITIGATING FACTORS
Filing Date
2/18/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/18/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET TRIAL DATES
Filing Date
2/18/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE THE (F)(6) AGGRAVATING FACTOR: ESPECIALLY CRUEL HENIOUS OR DEPRAVED
Filing Date
2/18/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DECLARE A.R.S. §13-4426.01 UNCONSTITUTIONAL
Filing Date
2/18/2009
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TESTIMONY AND/OR ARGUMENT AT SENTENCING ABOUT MENTAL STATES
Filing Date
2/18/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE THE STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO SEEK DEATH AS A POSSIBLE PENALTY: OMNIBUS MOTION
Filing Date
2/18/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DECLARE LETHAL INJECTION UNCONSTITUTIONAL
Filing Date
2/18/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED PENALTY PHASE/
Filing Date
2/18/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE THE (F)(13) AGGRAVATING FACTOR: COLD, CALCULATED MANNER WITHOUT PRETENSE OR MORAL OR LEGAL JUSTIFICATION
Filing Date
2/18/2009
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRESENT SURREBUTTAL
Filing Date
2/17/2009
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND / OF ADDITIONAL MITIGATION WITNESSES
Filing Date
2/13/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/12/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#2
Filing Date
2/12/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE-NEWED / FOR A DIRECTED VERDICT
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RENEWED / TO SEVER AT THE CLOSE OF THE DEFENDANT'S CASE
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#10
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#9
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#8
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#7
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#6
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#5
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#4
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#3
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#2
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#1
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#15
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#14
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#13
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#12
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#11
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#20
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#19
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#18
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#17
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#16
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#43
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#44
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#31
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#32
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#33
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#34
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#45
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#46
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#47
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#48
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#49
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#50
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#51
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#29
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#30
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#27
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#26
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#25
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#24
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#23
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#22
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#21
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#42
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#41
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#40
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#39
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#38
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#37
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#35
Filing Date
2/10/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#36
Filing Date
2/9/2009
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
to rebuttal evidence
Filing Date
2/9/2009
Description
PSA - Petition to Secure Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS WITNESS
Filing Date
2/9/2009
Description
OSA - Order Securing Attendance of Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/6/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2009
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ADMIT DAY PLANNERS AS BUSINESS RECORDS
Filing Date
2/4/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/3/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/2/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/30/2009
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2009
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2009
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RECONSIDER THE ADMISSION OF THREATENING STATEMENTS MADE IN CONNECTION WITH THE DAVID ESTRADA MURDER DURING THE DEFENDANT'S CASE
Filing Date
1/26/2009
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/28/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ADMIT THE EXCITED UTTERNACES OF UNAVAILABLE WITNESSES
Filing Date
1/23/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/27/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR COURT ORDERED IMMUNITY
Filing Date
1/22/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR A DIRECTED VERDICT
Filing Date
1/22/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RENEWED / TO SEVER THE 2006 SHOTGUN SHOOTINGS FROM THE REMAINING CHARGES
Filing Date
1/20/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/20/09
Filing Date
1/20/2009
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/21/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/20/09
Filing Date
1/20/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2009
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/20/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR LESSER INCLUDED INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
1/15/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF FINAL DEADLINE FOR RULE 15.1 DISCLOSURE AND AFFIDAVIT AND OBJECTION TO THE ADMISSION OF CELL TOWER INFORMATION
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#13
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#14
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#15
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#16
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#17
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#18
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#19
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#20
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#9
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#10
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#11
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#12
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#1
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#2
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#29
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#3
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#4
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#5
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#6
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#7
Filing Date
1/14/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#8
Filing Date
1/12/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/12/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2009
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2009
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/8/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
1/8/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2009
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2009
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2009
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2009
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/31/2008
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/31/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE / FOR EXPEDITED HEARING RE: NEW EVIDENCE IMPACTING COURTROOM RESTRAINTS ASSESSMENT
Filing Date
12/23/2008
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF FINAL DEADLINE FOR RULE 15.1 DISCLOSURE AND AFFIDAVIT
Filing Date
12/23/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/10/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
#6
Filing Date
12/19/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2008
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/26/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/16/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/SERVED 12/10/2008
Filing Date
12/10/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/9/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/1/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11-25-08
Filing Date
11/26/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/26/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/26/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/26/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2008
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO / TO PLAY GPS TRACKING DEVICE
Filing Date
11/18/2008
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO THE STATE'S TRIAL MEMO REGARDING EXCITED UTTERNACE
Filing Date
11/18/2008
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL / ON ADMISSION OF STATEMENTS BY MR. ROBERTS
Filing Date
11/18/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2008
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL/ REGARDING EXCITED UTTERANCE
Filing Date
11/17/2008
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PLAY GPS TRACKING DEVICE AND REQUEST TO PRECLUDE MEDIA FROM FILMING THE FACES OF UNDERCOVER OFFICERS
Filing Date
11/17/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO RECONSIDER THE ADMISSION OF THREATENING STATEMENTS MADE IN CONNECTION WITH THE DAVID ESTRADA MURDER
Filing Date
11/10/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/12/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN LIMINE RE: JUNE 30, 2006 ASSAULT
Filing Date
11/7/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2008
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO RECONSIDER THE ADMISSION OF THREATENING STATEMENTS MADE IN CONNECTION WITH THE DAVID ESTRADA MURDER
Filing Date
11/5/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RENEWED / TO SEVER THE .22 SHOOTINGS FROM THE SHOTGUN SHOOTINGS
Filing Date
11/5/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/4/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/29/08
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/29/08
Filing Date
10/29/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/28/08
Filing Date
10/29/2008
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR MISTRIAL OR REQUEST TO PRECLUDE THE STATE'S USE OF A SINGLE PHOTO TO IDENTIFY MR. HAUSNER'S CAR IN COURT
Filing Date
10/29/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
for mistrial or request to preclude the state's use of a single photo to identify mr. hausner's car in court
Filing Date
10/24/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/24/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/27/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR MISTRIAL OR REQUEST TO PRECLUDE THE STATE'S USE OF A SINGLE PHOTO TO IDENTIFY MR. HAUSNER'S CAR IN COURT
Filing Date
10/23/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2008
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONCERNING CLARISSA ROWLEYS MEDICAL CONDITION
Filing Date
10/21/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM;SERVED 10/17/2008
Filing Date
10/17/2008
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TI RECONSIDER THE ADMISSION OF THREATENING STATEMENTS MADE IN CONNECTION WITH THE DAVID ESTRADA MURDER
Filing Date
10/16/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
ASSAULT OF JUNE 30,2006 BY SAMUEL DIETMAN
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/10/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2008
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2008
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2008
Description
JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
INSTRUCTIONS OF LAW
Filing Date
10/6/2008
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/6/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2008
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / OF LAW RE: CRIMINAL CONVICTIONS OF SAMUEL DIETEMAN
Filing Date
10/2/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/2/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 09/30/08
Filing Date
9/30/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2008
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF THE SCOPE OF JURY VOIR DIRE
Filing Date
9/29/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ALLOW DEFENDANT'S RELATIVES TO ATTEND TRIAL: ROSIE HAUSNER, GREG HAUSNER, AND RANDY HAUSNER
Filing Date
9/29/2008
Description
RJI - Request for Jury Instructions - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/25/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2008
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/SERVED 09/22/08
Filing Date
9/22/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2008
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 09/17/08
Filing Date
9/19/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO AMEND THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
9/19/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY; MOTION TO CLARIFY IMPEACHMENT OF SAMUEL DIETEMAN
Filing Date
9/19/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RULING ON COURTROOM SECURITY RE WITNESS DIETEMAN
Filing Date
9/19/2008
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE 4/24/06 PALM TREE EVIDENCE
Filing Date
9/18/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/18/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/22/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED INDICTMENT FOR TRIAL
Filing Date
9/17/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2008
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/17/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2008
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF THE SCOPE OF JURY VOIR DIRE
Filing Date
9/16/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2008
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/2008
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES MOTION IN LIMINE RE: MITIGATION VOIRE DIRE
Filing Date
9/15/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2008
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADDITIONAL / TO RELEASE PROSPECTIVE JURORS; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/11/2008
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: MITIGATION VOIR DIRE; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/10/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2008
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2008
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
JURY QUESTIONNAIRE; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/3/2008
Description
JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FINAL DRAFT OF DOCUMENTS FOR JURY SELECTION AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/28/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RENUMBER THE INDICTMENT FOR TRIAL RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-0060312-001DT CR2008-007313-002 DT
Filing Date
8/28/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO AMEND THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
8/26/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADDITIONAL DRAFT DOCUMENTS FOR JURY SELECTION AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/26/2008
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/25/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND DRAFT JURY QUESTIONNAIRE RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/21/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/19/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2008
Description
JQU - Jury Question - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST DRAFT/
Filing Date
8/15/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR MEDICAL RECORDS AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-003031-001DT
Filing Date
8/15/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR MEDICAL RECORDS AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/15/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/26/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR MEDICAL RECORDS AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/12/2008
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE
Filing Date
8/11/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/11/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/4/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTA TO MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
8/1/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULE OF UNAVAILABLE DATES
Filing Date
7/31/2008
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE'S REQUEST FOR RULE 609 HEARING; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/22/2008
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF PRIOR BAD ACTS; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/21/2008
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/23/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS RENEWED NOTION FOR SEVERANCE BASED UPON NEWLY DISCOVERED EVIDENCE RELATED CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/18/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF VENUE WITNESSES; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/17/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR MEDICAL RECORDS; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/17/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR MEDICAL RECORDS; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/17/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR MEDICAL RECORDS; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/14/2008
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL / RE: USE OF TRANSCRIPTS AT TRIAL AND ADMISSION OF ENHANCED RECORDINGS AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/11/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PLAY WIRETAP RECORDING UNEDITED AND IN ITS ENTIREY MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE TRANSCRIPTS OF SURVEILLANCE RECORDINGS AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
7/11/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SEVERANCE OF SHOOTING COUNTS AFTER 5-2-06 BASES ON NEWLY DISCOVERED EVIDENCE AND RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
7/11/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SEVERANCE OF SHOOTING COUNTS AFTER 5/2/06 BASED ON NEWLY DISCOVERED EVIDENCE/ AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 CR2007-006031-001
Filing Date
7/11/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PLAY WIRETAP RECORDING UNEDITED AND IN ITS ENTIRETY; MOTION TO PRECLUDE STATE TRANSCRIPTS OF SURVEILLANCE RECORDINGS/ AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/11/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S SUPPLEMENT TO ORIGINAL MOTION AND SUBMISSION OF AFFIDAVITS RE: FOUNDATION OF WIRETAP;RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/11/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 07/09/08
Filing Date
7/10/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL/OF PRIOR BAD ACTS AND RELATED CASECR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
7/10/2008
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609 AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
7/9/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/08/08 AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/9/2008
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/09/08 AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/7/2008
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/7/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2008
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2008
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DISMISSING SPECIAL ACTION
Filing Date
6/20/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/23/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF WITNESS TO BE CALLED JEFF HAUSNER AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT CR2008-006364-001 DT
Filing Date
6/12/2008
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
To States Response To Motion For Discovery On High Priority Leads And Gps Tracking And Warrant And Emergency Wiretap ProceedingS CR2006048493002DT/CR2007006031001DT
Filing Date
6/12/2008
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADDITIONAL CR2006048493002DT/CR2007006031001DT
Filing Date
6/9/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF TRIAL CONFLICT AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
6/3/2008
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
6/3/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2008
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/28/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY REGARDING HIGH PRIORITY LEADS AND GPS TRACKING AND WARRANT AND EMERGENCY WIRETAP PROCEEDINGS; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
5/27/2008
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT MARIANNE LESCHER APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION ON 6-5-08 AT 1:30 PM BEFORE THIS COURT CENTRAL COURT BUILDING #402 201 W JEFFERSON ST PHORNIX AZ 85003 AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT CR2008-006364-001 DT
Filing Date
5/27/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DEPOSITION AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT CR2008-006364-001 DT
Filing Date
5/12/2008
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2008
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002 DT
Filing Date
5/7/2008
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/15/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002DT
Filing Date
5/2/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/5/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFER OF PROOF FOR EVIDENTIRAY HEARING RE: THE ADMISSIBILITY OF DEFENDANT'S WIRETAP STATEMENTS
Filing Date
5/1/2008
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/1/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATES MOTION IN LIMINE TO ADMIT SILENT WITNESS STATEMENTS OF RON HORTON AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT, CR2008-006364-001DT
Filing Date
4/29/2008
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/29/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFER OF PROOF AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT CR2008-006364-001 DT
Filing Date
4/24/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/24/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/18/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/17/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO UNSEAL TRANSCRIPT AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
4/16/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / OF WITNESS FOR HEARING ON 4/18/08; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
4/16/2008
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNSEALING THE TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS ON 8-4-06 PERTAINING TO CWT-273 AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
4/15/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/15/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2008
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/8/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2008
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-001DT
Filing Date
4/4/2008
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/14/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2008
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING HIGH PRIORITY LEADS AND GPS TRACKING AND WARRANT AND EMERGENCY WIRETAP PROCEEDINGS; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
4/1/2008
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/2/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ADMIT SILENT WITNESS STATEMENTS OF HORTON RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
4/1/2008
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
4/2/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ADMIT SILENT WITNESS STATEMENTS OF RON HORTON RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-001 DT
Filing Date
3/20/2008
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/20/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/19/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/19/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2008
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)
Docket Date
3/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2008
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2008
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/27/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002 DT
Filing Date
2/28/2008
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2008
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND/OR STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
2/27/2008
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED/AND/OR STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
2/27/2008
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/13/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2008
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (002)
Docket Date
2/25/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2008
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/25/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/21/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DECLARE ARS 13-3015 UNCONSTITUTIONAL; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
2/8/2008
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/8/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DECLARE ARS §13-3015 UNCONSTITUTIONAL UNDER UNITED STATES AND AZ CONSTITUTIONS; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
2/5/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/5/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/4/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/31/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2008
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2008
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/31/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
COPY OF DECISION ORDER
Filing Date
1/29/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED SUBMISSION OF AFFIDAVIT OF MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY ANDREW P THOMAS AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-001 DT CR2006-012721-002 DT CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
1/29/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED SUBMISSION OF AFFIDAVIT OF MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY ANDREW P THOMAS AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-001 DT CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2006-012721-001 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
1/29/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/29/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2008
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2008
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING DISCOVERY OF MATERIALS TO BE PROVIDED TO DEFENDANT/RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2004-006031-001DT
Filing Date
1/24/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/25/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SUBMISSION OF AFFIDAVIT OF MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY ANDREW P THOMAS RELATED CASE CR2006-012721-002DT
Filing Date
1/24/2008
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/25/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SUBMISSION OF AFFIDAVIT OF MFARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY ANDREW P THOMAS RELATED CASES CR2007-006031-001 CR2006-048493-002
Filing Date
1/22/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/22/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2008
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CLARIFICATION AND RECONSIDERATION, AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RULING; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
1/16/2008
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/17/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ADDITIONAL AND SPECIFIC DISCOVERY; PAYMENTS TO WITNESSES; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
1/15/2008
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY RE PRESS CONFERENCE/RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
1/7/2008
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/7/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2008
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/7/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/31/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/2/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT TO STATE'S / TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SUPPRESS "PRESS CONFERENCE" STATEMENTS AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
12/20/2007
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2007
Description
STA - Statement - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL/ RE REPLY TO STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SUPPRESS PRESS CONFERENCE STATEMENTS AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
12/18/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ADDITIONAL SPECIFIC DISCOVERY RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
12/13/2007
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO AMEND STATES RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEVER AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
12/4/2007
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SUPPRESS PRESS CONFERENCE RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
11/30/2007
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/3/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11-30-07 AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
11/28/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE AND VACATE AND STATES RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SUPPRESS DEFENDANTS PRESS CONFERENCE STATEMENTS /RELATED CASES 2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
11/27/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SECOND MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY; RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
11/27/2007
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
10-26-07 AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
11/26/2007
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF THE SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE/RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
11/23/2007
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2007
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/23/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM TO SUPPRESS DALE HAUSNERS STATEMENTS OF 8-4-06 AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
11/21/2007
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/16/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
11/16/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS DEFENDANTS PRESS CONFERENCE STATEMENTS AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
11/14/2007
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / RE SUPPRESSION OF STATEMENTS OF DALE HAUSNER ON 08/04/06; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
11/13/2007
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2007
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2007
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/13/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO INTRODUCTION OF PRIOR BAD ACT EVIDENCE AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
11/8/2007
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/8/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT DIETEMAN'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANT HAUSNER'S MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE
Filing Date
11/7/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/8/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
11/5/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ADMISSION OF A CO-CONSPIRATOR'S STATEMENTS TO A THIRD PARTY; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
10/31/2007
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/1/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR USE OF DUAL JURIES
Filing Date
10/30/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / FOR CHANGE OF VENUE, RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR207-006031-001DT
Filing Date
10/29/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENT/TO STATE'S MOTION FOR DUAL JURIES/RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-001DT
Filing Date
10/29/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE'S MOTION FOR DUAL JURIES; RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-001DT
Filing Date
10/26/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: FINAL SUBMISSION ON ARGUMENT TO SEVER SHOOTING COUNTS BY ALLEGED VICTIMS; REQUEST FOR SEPARATE TRIALS UNDER RULE 13; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
10/26/2007
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE'S NOTICE OF PRIOR BAD ACTS; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
10/26/2007
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S/TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT IN ITS FINAL SUBMISSION ON ARGUMENT TO SEVER SHOOTING COUNTS BY ALLEGED VICTIMS
Filing Date
10/25/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/25/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR USE OF DUAL JURIES/ RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
10/25/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/25/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR USE OF DUAL JURIES/ RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-001DT
Filing Date
10/23/2007
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2007
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/22/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2007
Description
086 - ME: Ord/Attendance Prisoner - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/18/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO TRANSPORT DEFENDANT FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE ON 10-19-07
Filing Date
10/15/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/15/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/15/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PRIOR BAD ACTS/RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
10/11/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2007
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/5/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2007
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/27/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/27/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2007
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/27/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2007
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/28/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DALE HAUSNER'S / TO STATE'S RESPONSE REGARDING MOTION FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY (OTHER EMERGENCY WIRETAP CASES AUTHORIZED BY MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY); RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/25/2007
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2007
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/25/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2007
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
to States Motion To Amend Count 29 of the Indictment
Filing Date
9/21/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/24/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEVER OBJECTION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
9/21/2007
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/25/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT IN ITS REPLY TO SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SEVER; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/20/2007
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/20/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DETERMINE ADMISSIBILITY OF ITEMS PRETRIAL FOR DANGER OF UNFAIR PREJUDICE AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
9/20/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/21/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY REGARDING OTHER EMERGENCY WIRETAP CASES AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
9/14/2007
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT HAUSNER'S LIST OF WITNESSES FOR 10/19/07 EVIDENTIARY HEARING; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/12/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/13/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE; / OF WITNESS, RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT, CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/12/2007
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL / TO SEVER; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/7/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DECLARE JURY SENTENCING STATUTES UNCONSTITUTIONAL; LACK OF LEGISLATIVE STANDARDS; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/7/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PROCLUDE DEATH PENALTY AS A VIOLATION OF INTERNATIONAL LAW; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/7/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE THE AGGRAVATING FACTOR; ESPECIALLY CRUEL HENIOUS OR DEPRAVED; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/7/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DECLARE LETHAL INJECTION UNCONSTITUTIONAL; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/7/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE THE STATES NOTICE OF INTENTION TO SEEK DEATH AS A POSSIBLE PENALTY: OMNIBUS MOTION
Filing Date
9/7/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE THE (F) (13) AGGRAVATING FACTOR:COLD, CALCULATED MANNER WITHOUT PRETENSE OF MORAL OR LEGAL JUSTIFICATION
Filing Date
9/7/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
LIST OF WITNESSES NEEDED FOR OCTOBER 2007, UNCONSTITUTIONAL "ROOM PROBE" WIRETAP EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
9/7/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
10/22/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT HASUNERS OBJECTION TO SUBMISSION OF SPECIFIED PORTIONS OF ENHANCED RECORDINGS AND RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-001 DT
Filing Date
9/7/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT HASUNER'S OBJECTION TO SUBMISSION OF SPECIFIED PORTIONS OF ENHANCED RECORDINGS; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/6/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/14/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT HASUNER'S OBJECTION TO SUBMISSION OF SPECIFIED PORTIONS OF ENHANCED RECORDINGS
Filing Date
9/6/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO OBJECTION TO SUBMISSION OF SPECIFIED PORTIONS OF ENHANCED RECORDINGS
Filing Date
9/6/2007
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUBMISSION OF SPECIFIED PORTIONS OF ENHANCED UNCONSTITUTIONALLY OBTAINED SURREPTITIOUS CONVERSATIONS ON COMPACT DISC/RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
9/6/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION TO COURT OF SPECIFIED PROTIONS OF ENHANCED AUDIO RECORDINGS/RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-001 DT
Filing Date
9/6/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/7/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION TO COURT OF SPECIFIED PORTIONS OF ENHANCED AUDIO RECORDING
Filing Date
9/6/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/7/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/6/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/7/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
9/5/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/6/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL / TO SEVER; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
9/4/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE STATES REPLY AND REPLY TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION AND REPLY ON THE MOTION TO SUPRESS RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-001 & 002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
9/4/2007
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LINIT IN ITS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO SUPRESS RELATED CASE CR2006-018893-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
9/4/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
9/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE STATES REPLY AND REPLY TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION AND RPLY ON THE MOTION TO SUPRESS RELATED CASES CR2006-014193-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
9/4/2007
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/1/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S/TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT IN ITS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
8/31/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY INMATE TAPES CONVERSATIONS LETTERS RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
8/31/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/4/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DETERMINE BURDEN OF PROOF RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
8/31/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/31/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/31/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT HAUSNER'S / TO STATE'S MOTION TO AMEND MINUTE ENTRY TO REFLECT DEADLINES AND DATES; MOTION TO STRIKE REPLY TO DEFENSE COUNSEL'S REPLY ON THE MOTION TO SUPPRESS; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/27/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT OF POTENTIAL WITNESS' UNAVAILABILITY CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
8/27/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENSE COUNSEL'S/TO COURT OF UNAVAILABILITY CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
8/27/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO AMEND MINUTE ENTRY TO REFLECT DEADLINES AND DATES RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/27/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT OF POTENTIAL WITNESS' UNAVAILABILITY CR2006-048493-001DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/27/2007
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2007
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT HAUSNER'S MOTION TO SUPPRESS "ROOM PROBE" WIRETAP EVIDENCE; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/24/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE THE (F)(6) AGRAVATING FACTOR: ESPECIALLY CRUEL HENIOUS OR DEPRAVED RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
8/24/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY; OTHER EMERGENCY WIRETAP CASES AUTHORIZED BY MARICOPA COUNTY ATTORNEY RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
8/24/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS DEFENDANT HAUSNER'S STATEMENTS ON 08/04/06; REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARINESS HEARING RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/24/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE DEATH PENALTY AS A VIOLATION OF INTERNATIONAL LAW RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
8/24/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE THE (F)(13)AGGRAVATING FACTOR: COLD,CALCUALTED MANNER WITHOUT PRETENSE OF MORAL OR LEGAL JUSTIFICATION RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/24/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DECLARE JURY SENTENCING STATUTES UNCONSTITUTIONAL: LACK OF LEGISLATIVE STANDARDS RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/24/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT TO INSTRUCT THE TRIAL JURY THAT MITIGATION MUST OUTWIEGH AGGRAVATION CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
8/24/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DECLARE LETHAL INJECTION UNCONSTITUTIONAL RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/24/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE THE STATE'S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO SEEK DEATH AS A POSSIBLE PENALTY: OMNIBUS MOTION RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/23/2007
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS, AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
8/21/2007
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/22/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION TO COURT OF ENHANCED AUDIO RECORDINGS AND LEGAL / REGARDING RECORDED CONVERSATIONS
Filing Date
8/21/2007
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUBMISSION TO COURT OF ENHANCED AUDIO RECORDINGS AND LEGAL / REGARDING RECORDED CONVERSATIONS
Filing Date
8/21/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/22/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS, AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
8/17/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE'S MOTION TO STRIKE, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT HAUSNER'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM ON SUPPRESSION OF WIRETAP EVIDENCE; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/17/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/21/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DETERMINE ADMISSIBILITY OF ITEMS PRE-TRIAL FOR DANGER OF UNFAIR PREJUDICE; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT; CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/16/2007
Description
REQ - Request - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXEED PAGE LIMIT IN ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO SUPPRESS AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
8/16/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT HAUSNER'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM ON SUPPRESSION OF WIRETAP EVIDENCE
Filing Date
8/16/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STRIKE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT HAUSNER'S SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM ON SUPPRESSION OF WIRETAP EVIDENCE
Filing Date
8/16/2007
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL/ON SUPPRESSION OF WIRETAP EVIDENCE RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/15/2007
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT IN ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO SUPPRESS AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Filing Date
8/14/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/16/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO AMEND COUNT 29 OF THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
8/14/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO AMEND COUNT 29 OF THE INDICTMENT
Filing Date
8/10/2007
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
8/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR MORE SPECIFIC DISCOVERY; MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW OF WIRETAP, RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/10/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY, RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-00603-001DT
Filing Date
8/10/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/14/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY, RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
8/3/2007
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2007
Description
REL - Reply - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO SEVER SEPARATE COUNTS ON SEPARATE DATES RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
7/24/2007
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/25/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/23/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/24/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF INTENT TO JOIN IN MR HAUSNERS MOTION TO SUPPRESS TELEPHONIC WIRETAP, HOUSEBUG AND VIHICLE BUG
Filing Date
7/20/2007
Description
NOI - Notice Of Intent - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/20/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 96641 -- MR DIETEMANS / TO JOIN IN MR HAUSNERS MOTION TO SUPPRESS TELEPHONIC WIRETAP HOUSEBUG AND VEHICLE BUG
Filing Date
7/20/2007
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 96660 -- TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPRESS AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING / RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002DT
Filing Date
7/18/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR MORE SPECIFIC DISCOVERY; MOTION FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW OF WIRETAP RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
7/16/2007
Description
REQ - Request - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 94821 -- TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT IN ITS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SEVER; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/16/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEVER/RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-005031-001DT
Filing Date
7/16/2007
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO STATE'S MOTION IN LIMINE RE: PRE-TRIAL HEARING ON FOUNDATION OF WIRETAP/RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
7/13/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS TELEPHONIC WIRETAP; HOUSE BUG; AND VEHICLE BUG EVIDENCE, RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002DT
Filing Date
7/13/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/16/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY AND RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002 DT CR2007-006031-001 DT
Filing Date
7/5/2007
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (002)
Docket Date
7/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 91581 -- RE: PRETRIAL HEARING ON FOUNDATION OF WIRE TRAP; RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-001DT
Filing Date
7/5/2007
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 91585 -- RE: PRETRIAL HEARING ON FOUNDATION OF WIRETAP; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
6/13/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
6/13/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 85674 -- OF ADDITIONAL MITIGATION WITNESSES AND RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-001 DT
Filing Date
5/25/2007
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/25/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2007
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/23/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 78792 -- FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY; RELATED CASES CR2006-048493-002DT AND CR2007-006031-001DT
Filing Date
5/22/2007
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/22/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (002)
Docket Date
5/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-001DT
Filing Date
5/8/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEVER COUNTS
Filing Date
5/8/2007
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONSOLIDATION
Filing Date
5/8/2007
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SPECIFIC DISCOVERY
Filing Date
5/7/2007
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/8/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 05/07/07 RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002DT
Filing Date
4/12/2007
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/13/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 4-11-07 AND RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002 DT
Filing Date
3/23/2007
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM SERVED 03/23/07/RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002DT
Filing Date
2/15/2007
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/20/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DUCES TECUM/SERVED 02/08/07; RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002DT
Filing Date
1/15/2007
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/15/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2007
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/18/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2007
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2007
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2007
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2007
Description
085 - ME: Conference - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/5/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/5/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2006
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/29/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
401 STATUTES 8/14/06
Filing Date
12/20/2006
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/28/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF ARPAIOS / TO DEFENDANTS MOTION REGARDING DRESSING OUT FOR ALL PRETRIAL HEARINGS
Filing Date
12/20/2006
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/28/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF ARPAIOS SUPPLEMENT TO / TO DEFENDANTS MOTION REGARDING DRESSING OUT FOR ALL PRETRIAL HEARINGS RELATED CASE CR2006-048493-002
Filing Date
12/20/2006
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 37630 -- OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER THAN PRIOR CONVICTIONS
Filing Date
12/20/2006
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 37631 --
Filing Date
12/20/2006
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 37634 -- OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER THAN PRIOR CONVICTIONS
Filing Date
12/20/2006
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 37635 --
Filing Date
12/19/2006
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/3/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
8/14/06 STATUTES 401
Filing Date
12/19/2006
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/3/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATUTES 401 8/14/06
Filing Date
12/19/2006
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
1/3/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATUTES 401 8/14/06
Filing Date
12/19/2006
Description
NID - Notice of Intent to Seek the Death Penalty - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
eFile Id 37548 -- NOTICE OF AGGRAVATING FACTORS AND WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/15/2006
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/2006
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LAW RE: CIVILIAN CLOTHES FOR PRE-TRIAL HEARINGS INVOLVING DEFENDANT AND BROADCAST BY THE MEDIA
Filing Date
12/1/2006
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/5/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2006
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/5/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2006
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/5/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2006
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/12/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2006
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/12/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2006
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2006
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2006
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2006
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (002)
Docket Date
12/4/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/2006
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/17/06
Filing Date
11/20/2006
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/17/06
Filing Date
11/17/2006
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2006
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (002)
Docket Date
11/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2006
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2006
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/20/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/27/2006
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
11/27/2006
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
1/3/2007
Time
8:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
1/3/2007
Time
13:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
1/8/2007
Time
13:15
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
5/14/2007
Time
13:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/21/2007
Time
13:15
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
7/30/2007
Time
13:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/6/2007
Time
13:15
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
8/20/2007
Time
11:00
Event
Hearing Pending Motion
Date
9/17/2007
Time
13:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/18/2007
Time
8:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/19/2007
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/28/2007
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/2/2007
Time
8:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/12/2007
Time
10:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/19/2007
Time
10:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/26/2007
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/26/2007
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/26/2007
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
11/19/2007
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
11/19/2007
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
11/20/2007
Time
8:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
12/7/2007
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
12/10/2007
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/3/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/25/2008
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/29/2008
Time
8:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/30/2008
Time
8:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/1/2008
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/8/2008
Time
8:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
2/22/2008
Time
11:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/7/2008
Time
8:29
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/7/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/7/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/18/2008
Time
8:15
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/3/2008
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/4/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
4/8/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
4/18/2008
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
4/18/2008
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
4/25/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
4/25/2008
Time
14:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/7/2008
Time
10:00
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/21/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/30/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/25/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Hearing Pending Motion
Date
8/1/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
8/15/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
8/22/2008
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
8/26/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
9/2/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
9/2/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
9/2/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
9/3/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/3/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/4/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/8/2008
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/9/2008
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/10/2008
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
9/11/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/15/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/16/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/17/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/17/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/18/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/22/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/23/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/24/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/25/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/30/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/1/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/2/2008
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/3/2008
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/6/2008
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/7/2008
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/8/2008
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/9/2008
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/14/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/15/2008
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/20/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/21/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/22/2008
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/23/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/27/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/28/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/29/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
10/30/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/3/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/4/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/5/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/6/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/10/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/12/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/13/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/17/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/18/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/19/2008
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
11/20/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
11/25/2008
Time
8:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
12/1/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/2/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/3/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/8/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/9/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/10/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/11/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/15/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/16/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/17/2008
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
12/18/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/5/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/5/2009
Time
11:00
Event
Hearing Pending Motion
Date
1/6/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/7/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/8/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/12/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/13/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/14/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/15/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/16/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
1/20/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/21/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/22/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/27/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/28/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
1/29/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/2/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/3/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/4/2009
Time
13:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/5/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/9/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/10/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/11/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/12/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/23/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/24/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/25/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/26/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
2/27/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/2/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/3/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/4/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/5/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/6/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/9/2009
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/10/2009
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/11/2009
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/12/2009
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/13/2009
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/23/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/24/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/25/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/26/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/27/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
3/30/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
5/1/2009
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/15/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Hearing Pending Motion
Date
5/20/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/21/2009
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
5/26/2009
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/27/2009
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
5/28/2009
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/1/2009
Time
13:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/2/2009
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/3/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
6/4/2009
Time
10:00
Event
Trial
Date
6/9/2009
Time
11:00
Event
Hearing Pending Motion
Date
6/25/2009
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/15/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/16/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/17/2009
Time
8:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/20/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/21/2009
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/22/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/23/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/27/2009
Time
13:00
Event
Trial
Date
7/28/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/29/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/29/2009
Time
15:30
Event
Sentencing
Date
7/30/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
8/31/2012
Time
11:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/8/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/9/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
12/21/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/1/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/28/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/1/2013
Time
9:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
4/24/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
4/25/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/10/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/11/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing