« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
County Attorney, Maricopa
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Efrain Guillen Olivas - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Cantor, David
Judge
Unit
Case #
CR2005-112230-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Efrain Guillen Olivas 
Crime Date
4/22/2005
Date
9/23/2005
Description
AGGRAVATED ASSAULT
ARSCode
13-1204 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
6/3/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2015
Description
RMR - Response to Defendant's Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Motion for Clarification and Correction of Sentence
Filing Date
5/20/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/20/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/23/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2007
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2007
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS PUBLIC DEFENDER AND RE-APPOINT LEGAL ADVOCATE RELATED CASE CR2005-048474-001 DT
Filing Date
7/5/2007
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/5/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2007
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/25/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE PETITION FOR REVIEW
Filing Date
4/26/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/26/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2007
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2007
Description
597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/28/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2007
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/28/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2007
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/9/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTARY FILING OF SIGNED AND NOTARIZED NOTICE OF POST-CONVICTION RELIEF AND ACCOMPANYING VERIFICATION
Filing Date
12/27/2006
Description
PCR - Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/28/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/2006
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/28/2006
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
11/28/2006
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/28/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2006
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/23/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2006
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO FILE PETITION FOR POST-CONVICITON RELIEF
Filing Date
9/15/2006
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/15/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2006
Description
197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2005
Description
595 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/29/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2005
Description
NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/19/2005
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
11/8/2005
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/29/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2005
Description
193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/31/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2005
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2005
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/20/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
NO BOND 09/23/05
Filing Date
9/26/2005
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2005
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2005
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2005
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2005
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2005
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2005
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/8/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2005
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/2/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2005
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/6/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
5/19/2005
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/3/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2005
Description
ADN - Allegation of Dangerous Nature Felony - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2005
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2005
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/27/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF AGGRAVATING CIRCUMSTANCES OTHER THAN PRIOR CONVICTIONS
Filing Date
5/17/2005
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2005
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
5/17/2005
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2005
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/1/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURE REQUIRED BY RULE 15.1 (c) AND (d)
Filing Date
5/17/2005
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2005
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/19/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2005
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2005
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/2/2005
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2005
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/3/2005
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/28/2005
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/9/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2005
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/27/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/2/2005
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
5/11/2005
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/21/2005
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/24/2005
Time
8:45
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
8/31/2005
Time
10:30
Event
Trial
Date
9/23/2005
Time
8:30
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
10/28/2005
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing
Date
11/1/2005
Time
8:45
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
11/8/2005
Time
10:30
Event
Trial