Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Southeast |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | County Attorney, Maricopa | ||
Nicholas W Babcock - (2) |
Defendant | M | To Be Determined | ZZ CR Admin | CR2004-043017-001 |
Clerk Of The Court - (3) |
In The Matter Of | N/A | To Be Determined |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Nicholas W Babcock | 13-2003 (F6) | CRIM POSS OF FORGERY DEVICE | 3/1/2001 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 10/29/2004 |
Nicholas W Babcock | 13-2002 (F4) | FORGERY | 3/1/2001 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 11/30/2004 |
Nicholas W Babcock | 13-2002 (F4) | FORGERY | 3/1/2001 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 11/30/2004 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
6/2/2020 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001) | 6/3/2020 | |
6/2/2020 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001) | 6/3/2020 | |
11/2/2018 | OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party (001) | 11/2/2018 | |
NOTE: GRANTED SET ASIDE/GRANTED GUN RIGHTS | |||
8/10/2018 | CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001) | 8/13/2018 | |
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet | |||
8/3/2018 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (001) | 8/3/2018 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT | |||
8/20/2015 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 8/24/2015 | |
NOTE: DENIED SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT | |||
7/6/2015 | CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (001) | 7/6/2015 | |
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet | |||
6/19/2015 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 6/19/2015 | |
5/29/2015 | PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (001) | 6/2/2015 | Defendant (2) |
4/11/2013 | ORD - Order - Party (001) | 4/11/2013 | |
NOTE: DENIED SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT | |||
3/28/2013 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (001) | 4/3/2013 | |
NOTE: CFO INFO | |||
3/5/2013 | NOT - Notice - Party (001) | 3/5/2013 | |
1/28/2013 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 2/19/2013 | |
NOTE: TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT | |||
7/24/2008 | ODM - Order of Discharge from Probation - Misdemeanor Designation - Party (001) | 7/28/2008 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 | |||
6/5/2008 | PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (001) | 6/5/2008 | |
NOTE: COUNT I | |||
10/4/2007 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 10/5/2007 | |
9/25/2007 | 580 - ME: Dispo Reinst-Rev Arr/Hrg - Party (001) | 9/25/2007 | |
9/24/2007 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 10/5/2007 | |
9/24/2007 | PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001) | 10/9/2007 | |
NOTE: RELATED CASE CR2002-099808 | |||
9/24/2007 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 10/9/2007 | |
9/24/2007 | BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (001) | 9/25/2007 | |
NOTE: SERVED 09/16/2007 | |||
6/14/2007 | 099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (001) | 6/14/2007 | |
6/13/2007 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001) | 6/20/2007 | |
NOTE: RELATED CASE CR2002-099808 | |||
3/16/2007 | 133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (001) | 3/16/2007 | |
3/1/2007 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 3/1/2007 | |
12/21/2006 | 056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (001) | 12/21/2006 | |
12/14/2006 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 4/12/2007 | |
NOTE: TO THE COURT | |||
11/14/2006 | BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (001) | 11/20/2006 | |
NOTE: PROBATION VIOLATION/QUASHED 11/08/06 | |||
11/9/2006 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001) | 11/9/2006 | |
11/3/2006 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001) | 11/3/2006 | |
10/11/2006 | PTT - Petition - Party (001) | 10/12/2006 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: FOR HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE | |||
8/31/2006 | PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (001) | 9/11/2006 | |
NOTE: ISSUE WARRANT/NO BOND | |||
2/28/2005 | WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001) | 3/2/2005 | |
NOTE: QUASHED 10/01/04 | |||
2/16/2005 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 2/17/2005 | |
NOTE: TO THE COURT | |||
12/3/2004 | 109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001) | 12/3/2004 | |
11/30/2004 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 12/9/2004 | |
11/30/2004 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 12/8/2004 | |
11/30/2004 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 12/7/2004 | |
NOTE: W/RELATED CASE CR 2002-099808 SE | |||
11/2/2004 | 102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001) | 11/2/2004 | |
11/1/2004 | SUB - Subpoena - Party (001) | 11/4/2004 | |
10/29/2004 | INF - Information - Party (001) | 11/8/2004 | |
10/29/2004 | ROR - Release Order - Party (001) | 11/8/2004 | |
NOTE: OWN RECOGNIZANCE 10/29/04 | |||
10/29/2004 | WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001) | 11/8/2004 | |
10/27/2004 | COM - Complaint - Party (001) | 10/27/2004 | |
10/27/2004 | BND - Bindover - Party (001) | 10/27/2004 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
10/29/2004 | 8:28 | Initial Appearance / Wfa |
10/29/2004 | 8:29 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
11/30/2004 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
11/3/2006 | 10:00 | Status Conference |
12/14/2006 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
2/23/2007 | 13:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
3/8/2007 | 8:30 | Evidentiary Hearing |
9/24/2007 | 11:00 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
9/24/2007 | 11:5 | Disposition Hearing |