« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
COUNTY ATTORNEY CRIMINAL -CCC,
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Paul Brinnon Nelson - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Walton, Michael
Judge
Criminal
Case #
CR2004-017716-001
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2004-017716-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Paul Brinnon Nelson
Crime Date
9/29/2003
Date
10/5/2005
Description
ENDANGERMENT
ARSCode
13-1201 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Paul Brinnon Nelson
Crime Date
9/29/2003
Date
10/5/2005
Description
DUI-LIQUOR/DRUGS/VAPORS/COMBO
ARSCode
28-1381A1 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2008
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/16/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2008
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
10/1/2008
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2008
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/29/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2008
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 2
Filing Date
11/14/2005
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/14/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2005
Description
LET - Letter - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/9/2005
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO DETERMINE COUNSEL
Filing Date
11/9/2005
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Filing Date
11/1/2005
Description
ACA - Arizona Department Of Transportation Court Abstract - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/22/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2005
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/15/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2005
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/26/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2005
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/7/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2005
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/17/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2005
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2005
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/7/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2005
Description
WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2005
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPERVISED 10-05-05
Filing Date
10/5/2005
Description
INF - Information - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2005
Description
584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/26/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2005
Description
DRO - Indigent Defense Reimbursement Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2005
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
9/22/2005
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/10/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPERVISED 09-23-05
Filing Date
9/12/2005
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/23/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 9-7-05
Filing Date
8/20/2004
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/30/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2004
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/6/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2004
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2004
Description
SUM - Summons - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2004
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/30/2004
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/30/2004
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
9/22/2005
Time
8:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/5/2005
Time
13:30
Event
Preliminary Hearing
Date
10/5/2005
Time
13:31
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
10/24/2005
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing