Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Southeast |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | McDermott, Laura | ||
Anthony Wayne Gushee - (2) |
Defendant | M | Lundin, Anders | Phillips | CR2003-034780-001 |
Clerk Of The Court - (3) |
In The Matter Of | N/A | To Be Determined |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Anthony Wayne Gushee | 13-3407 (F3) | DANGEROUS DRUG VIOLATION | 5/1/2003 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 9/15/2003 |
Anthony Wayne Gushee | 13-3407 (F2) | DANGEROUS DRUG VIOLATION | 5/29/2003 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 10/27/2003 |
Anthony Wayne Gushee | 13-3407 (F3) | DANGEROUS DRUG VIOLATION | 5/29/2003 | Pled to Reduced Charge | Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge | 9/15/2003 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
11/7/2008 | SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (001) | 11/10/2008 | |
9/10/2008 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (001) | 9/10/2008 | |
9/5/2008 | ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (001) | 9/8/2008 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 AND 3 | |||
9/5/2008 | CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (001) | 9/8/2008 | |
8/5/2008 | PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001) | 8/11/2008 | |
NOTE: COUNT 1 AND 3 | |||
5/8/2008 | MPL - Modification of Probation Level - Party (001) | 5/9/2008 | |
2/29/2008 | MPL - Modification of Probation Level - Party (001) | 2/29/2008 | |
1/17/2008 | MPL - Modification of Probation Level - Party (001) | 1/18/2008 | |
9/28/2007 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 9/28/2007 | |
9/27/2007 | OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel - Party (001) | 10/10/2007 | |
9/24/2007 | MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (001) | 9/25/2007 | |
9/13/2007 | PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001) | 9/14/2007 | |
9/13/2007 | PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (001) | 9/14/2007 | |
9/12/2007 | DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party (001) | 9/18/2007 | |
9/11/2007 | 114 - ME: Dispo-Reinstate - Party (001) | 9/11/2007 | |
9/10/2007 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 9/14/2007 | |
9/10/2007 | PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (001) | 9/18/2007 | |
9/10/2007 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 9/17/2007 | |
9/10/2007 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 9/17/2007 | |
8/31/2007 | 112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001) | 8/31/2007 | |
8/30/2007 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 8/31/2007 | |
NOTE: DISPOSITION / AND NOTICE OF FILING LETTERS | |||
8/23/2007 | 005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001) | 8/23/2007 | |
8/10/2007 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 8/10/2007 | |
7/31/2007 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001) | 7/21/2008 | |
NOTE: ON PROBATION REVOCATION | |||
7/25/2007 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001) | 7/25/2007 | |
7/12/2007 | 112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (001) | 7/12/2007 | |
7/5/2007 | MEM - Memorandum - Party (001) | 7/19/2007 | |
NOTE: TO THE COURT | |||
5/23/2005 | BON - Bond - Party (001) | 5/26/2005 | |
NOTE: $1800 SAFETY NATIONAL CASUALTY CORP | |||
3/22/2004 | PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (001) | 6/7/2004 | |
1/23/2004 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001) | 7/29/2004 | |
11/6/2003 | 109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (001) | 11/6/2003 | |
10/27/2003 | LET - Letter - Party (001) | 2/13/2004 | |
10/27/2003 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (001) | 2/18/2004 | |
10/27/2003 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (001) | 11/3/2003 | |
10/27/2003 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 11/12/2003 | |
10/27/2003 | TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (001) | 11/13/2003 | |
10/24/2003 | NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (001) | 2/12/2004 | |
NOTE: OF CORRESPONDENCE | |||
9/25/2003 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (001) | 9/25/2003 | |
9/15/2003 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (001) | 11/19/2003 | |
NOTE: REVISED | |||
9/9/2003 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001) | 9/9/2003 | |
8/12/2003 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 11/17/2003 | |
8/12/2003 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 11/17/2003 | |
8/12/2003 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 11/18/2003 | |
8/12/2003 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 11/18/2003 | |
7/29/2003 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001) | 7/29/2003 | |
7/23/2003 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 10/8/2003 | |
NOTE: OF AMOUNT OF DRUGS EQUAL TO OR IN EXCESS OF THE STATUTORY THRESHOLD AMOUNT | |||
7/23/2003 | ALG - Allegation - Party (001) | 10/8/2003 | |
NOTE: OF MULITPLE DRUG OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE SAME OCCASION | |||
7/21/2003 | STA - Statement - Party (001) | 10/7/2003 | |
NOTE: JOINTLY PREPARED PRETRIAL | |||
7/17/2003 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 9/2/2003 | |
7/17/2003 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 9/2/2003 | |
7/17/2003 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001) | 6/25/2004 | |
7/17/2003 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001) | 8/20/2004 | |
7/2/2003 | NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (001) | 8/20/2004 | |
7/2/2003 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (001) | 7/15/2003 | |
7/2/2003 | MOT - Motion - Party (001) | 7/15/2003 | |
NOTE: FOR DISCOVERY | |||
6/18/2003 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001) | 9/23/2003 | |
6/6/2003 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 6/9/2003 | Plaintiff (1) |
6/6/2003 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (001) | 6/9/2003 | |
6/6/2003 | IND - Indictment - Party (001) | 6/9/2003 | Plaintiff (1) |
6/5/2003 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001) | 6/9/2003 | |
NOTE: RELEASE ORDER: BOND $1800 05/30/03; ORDER REGARDING COUNSEL; PSA RECOMMENDATION; PSA BACKGROUND INFORMATION; PSA FINANCIAL INFORMATION; RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE; RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE; RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE | |||
6/3/2003 | DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (001) | 6/4/2003 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
6/9/2003 | 17:00 | Preliminary Hearing |
6/17/2003 | 8:30 | Original Arraignment Hearing |
7/21/2003 | 8:30 | Initial Pretrial Conference |
9/3/2003 | 10:30 | Settlement Conference |
9/15/2003 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
10/27/2003 | 8:30 | Sentencing |
11/10/2003 | 8:30 | Trial Management Conference |
11/12/2003 | 10:30 | Trial |
7/11/2007 | 11:00 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
7/24/2007 | 8:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
8/9/2007 | 8:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
8/22/2007 | 8:00 | Non-Witness Violation Hearing |
8/29/2007 | 14:30 | Witness Violation Hearing |
9/10/2007 | 8:00 | Disposition Hearing |