« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Roseberry, Jeffrey
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Joseph John Henn - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Lamb, Brittany
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2003-017982-001
Party Name
B Victim - (3)
Relationship
Victim
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Pastor, Robert
Judge
Case #
CR2003-017982-001
Disposition Information
Party Name
Joseph John Henn
Crime Date
6/1/1979
Date
7/28/2021
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Joseph John Henn
Crime Date
6/1/1979
Date
7/28/2021
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Joseph John Henn
Crime Date
6/1/1979
Date
7/28/2021
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Joseph John Henn
Crime Date
6/1/1979
Date
7/28/2021
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Joseph John Henn
Crime Date
8/15/1980
Date
7/28/2021
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Joseph John Henn
Crime Date
8/15/1980
Date
7/28/2021
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Joseph John Henn
Crime Date
8/15/1980
Date
7/28/2021
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Joseph John Henn
Crime Date
8/15/1980
Date
7/28/2021
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Joseph John Henn
Crime Date
8/15/1980
Date
7/28/2021
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Joseph John Henn
Crime Date
6/1/1979
Date
7/28/2021
Description
MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Joseph John Henn
Crime Date
1/1/1979
Date
7/28/2021
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MOLESTATION OF CHILD
ARSCode
13-1410 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Joseph John Henn
Crime Date
3/1/1979
Date
7/28/2021
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Joseph John Henn
Crime Date
3/1/1979
Date
7/28/2021
Description
SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR
ARSCode
13-1405 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2022
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/13/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2021
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
12/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2021
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/16/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2021
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2021
Description
OOR - Order Of Release - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Release Order
Filing Date
7/27/2021
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2021
Description
OTC – Order to Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING
Filing Date
7/23/2021
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/3/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUING CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING
Filing Date
6/24/2021
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2021
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2021
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (001)
Docket Date
4/6/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2021
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2021
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
2/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND
FTMC
Filing Date
11/25/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/25/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2020
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND
FTMC
Filing Date
11/6/2020
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2020
Description
598 - ME: Continuance Past last Day - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/8/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
9/1/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
7/17/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2020
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/15/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLEX CASE
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT
PURSUANT TO A.O. NO. 2010-090
Filing Date
5/11/2020
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (001)
Docket Date
5/11/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2020
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
3/18/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/2020
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (001)
Docket Date
1/22/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/21/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2019
Description
REP - Report - Party (001)
Docket Date
11/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Case Management Report
Filing Date
10/1/2019
Description
027 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
10/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2019
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/29/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2019
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2019
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2019
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/15/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2019
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
8/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Second Motion to Extend Time To File Motion to Remand to Grand Jury
Filing Date
7/31/2019
Description
599 - ME: Complex Case Order/Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/31/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2019
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
OBJECTION TO UNTIMELY CAMERA REQUEST OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO LIMIT MEDIA COVERAGE
Filing Date
7/25/2019
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S RULE 15.2
NOTICE OF DEFENSES
AND DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/25/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Complex Case Designation
Filing Date
7/25/2019
Description
DAR - Notice of Disclosure and Request for Disclosure - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE AND
REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Filing Date
7/25/2019
Description
AOM - Allegation of Multiple Offenses Not Committed on the Same Occasion - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S ALLEGATION OF MULTIPLE
OFFENSES NOT COMMITTED ON THE
SAME OCCASION PURSUANT TO A.R.S. §
13-702.02
Filing Date
7/18/2019
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2019
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2019
Description
MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time to File Motion to Remand to Grand Jury
Filing Date
7/1/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
7/2/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
6/21/2019
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2019
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2019
Description
AIN - Amended Indictment - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/19/2019
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO SEAL INDICTMENT AND ORDER
Filing Date
6/19/2019
Description
ORD - Order - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/19/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SEALING THE ORIGINAL INDICTMENT IN THIS CASE AND SUBSTITUTING THE AMENDED INDICTMENT
Filing Date
6/14/2019
Description
NCJ - Notice Of Change Of Judge - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE’S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF JUDGE
Filing Date
6/14/2019
Description
ROB – Release Order Secured Appearance Bond - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/17/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
$100,000.00
Filing Date
6/13/2019
Description
RES - Response - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/13/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S RESPONSE TO CAMERA
REQUEST
Filing Date
6/11/2019
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Objection to Camera Request or, In the Alternative, to Limit Media Coverage
Filing Date
6/10/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
6/10/2019
Description
WRS-Warrant Served - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
06/08/2019
Filing Date
6/8/2019
Description
IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Packet
Filing Date
6/8/2019
Description
ROC– Release Order/Order Regarding Counsel - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA Release Order
Filing Date
8/11/2003
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
EXEMPLIFIED COPY PURSUANT TO EXTRADITION PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
7/24/2003
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2003
Description
CID - Court Information Sheet - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/10/2019
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/24/2003
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document - Party (001)
Docket Date
6/21/2019
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/8/2019
Time
5:00
Event
Initial Appearance
Date
6/14/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/14/2019
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
7/26/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
8/27/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
8/27/2019
Time
8:31
Event
Comprehensive PreTrial Conference
Date
9/24/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/19/2019
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
1/14/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
3/16/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
5/6/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
7/15/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/1/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
9/30/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/7/2020
Time
8:00
Event
Trial
Date
10/21/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Complex / Capital Case
Date
11/30/2020
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/15/2020
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
2/23/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/9/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
3/19/2021
Time
13:30
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
5/14/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Settlement Conference
Date
6/18/2021
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/15/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/5/2021
Time
9:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/19/2021
Time
9:00
Event
Trial
Date
8/19/2021
Time
11:00
Event
Trial
Date
1/12/2022
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference