Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Southeast  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Smith, Kirk      
Nicholas William Babcock - (2)
 
Defendant  M   To Be Determined   Z Unassigned  CR2002-099808-A  
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Nicholas William Babcock  13-1802 (F6)  THEFT  7/23/2002  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  10/28/2004 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
6/2/2020  DRS - Disposition Report Supplemental - Party ()  6/3/2020   
11/2/2018  OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party (A)  11/2/2018   
NOTE: GRANTED SET ASIDE/GRANTED GUN RIGHTS 
8/7/2018  CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (A)  8/7/2018   
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet 
8/3/2018  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (A)  8/3/2018  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT 
4/11/2013  ORD - Order - Party (A)  4/11/2013   
NOTE: DENIED SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT 
3/11/2013  WSH - Worksheet - Party (A)  3/11/2013   
NOTE: CFO INFO 
2/19/2013  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  2/19/2013   
1/28/2013  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  2/1/2013   
NOTE: TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT 
12/12/2007  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (A)  12/18/2007   
NOTE: COUNT I 
9/25/2007  580 - ME: Dispo Reinst-Rev Arr/Hrg - Party (A)  9/25/2007   
9/24/2007  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (A)  10/5/2007   
9/24/2007  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A)  10/9/2007   
9/24/2007  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (A)  10/5/2007   
9/24/2007  BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (A)  9/25/2007   
NOTE: SERVED 09/16/2007 
6/25/2007  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (A)  6/27/2007   
6/14/2007  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (A)  6/14/2007   
5/31/2007  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel - Party (A)  6/1/2007   
NOTE: RELATED CASE CR2004-043017-001SE 
4/27/2007  PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (A)  4/27/2007   
NOTE: W/RELATED CASE CR 2004-043017-001 SE 
3/16/2007  133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (A)  3/16/2007   
3/1/2007  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (A)  3/1/2007   
12/21/2006  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (A)  12/21/2006   
11/14/2006  BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (A)  11/20/2006   
NOTE: PROBATION VIOLATION/QUASHED 11/08/06 
11/9/2006  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (A)  11/9/2006   
11/3/2006  028 - ME: Status Conference Set - Party (A)  11/3/2006   
10/11/2006  PTT - Petition - Party (A)  10/12/2006  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: FOR HEARING TO SHOW CAUSE 
8/31/2006  PRP - Petition To Revoke Probation/Order w/warrant - Party (A)  9/11/2006   
NOTE: ISSUE WARRANT/NO BOND 
12/3/2004  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (A)  12/3/2004   
11/30/2004  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (A)  12/9/2004   
11/30/2004  MEM - Memorandum - Party (A)  12/8/2004   
11/30/2004  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A)  12/8/2004   
11/2/2004  102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (A)  11/2/2004   
10/29/2004  WWP - Waiver With a Plea - Party (A)  11/8/2004   
10/29/2004  INF - Information - Party (A)  11/8/2004   
10/6/2004  584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (A)  10/6/2004   
9/14/2004  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (A)  9/24/2004   
NOTE: QUASHED 09/03/04 
9/8/2004  584 - ME: Preliminary Hearing Continued - Party (A)  9/8/2004   
9/3/2004  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (A)  9/8/2004   
9/3/2004  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (A)  9/8/2004   
9/3/2004  ROR - Release Order - Party (A)  9/9/2004   
NOTE: SUPERVISED RELEASE 
1/2/2003  SUM - Summons - Party (A)  1/2/2003  Plaintiff (1)  
1/1/2003  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (A)  1/1/2003   
11/20/2002  DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (A)  11/27/2002   
NOTE: CT 1: THEFT CL 3 FEL; DOC: ON 07/23/2002 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/3/2004  8:26   Oral Argument 
9/3/2004  8:29   Initial Appearance 
10/1/2004  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
10/29/2004  8:30   Preliminary Hearing 
10/29/2004  8:31   Original Arraignment Hearing 
11/30/2004  8:30   Sentencing 
11/3/2006  10:00   Status Conference 
12/14/2006  8:30   Status Conference 
2/23/2007  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
3/8/2007  8:30   Evidentiary Hearing 
9/24/2007  11:00   Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing 
9/24/2007  11:5   Disposition Hearing