« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Bailey, Michael
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Moises Cisneros Llamas - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Agan, Tim
Judge
Master Calendar
Case #
CR2002-004636-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Moises Cisneros Llamas
Crime Date
3/8/2002
Date
10/11/2002
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Moises Cisneros Llamas
Crime Date
3/8/2002
Date
10/11/2002
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - MURDER 1ST DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1105 (F1)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Moises Cisneros Llamas
Crime Date
3/8/2002
Date
9/5/2002
Description
MURDER 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1104 (F1)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/2002
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/21/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2002
Description
571 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (no Monetary Orders Entered) - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/14/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2002
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/21/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2002
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/17/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2002
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/10/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2002
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/9/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/5/2002
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/25/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/2/2002
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/2/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2002
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/18/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR APPT OF CT INTERPRETER
Filing Date
7/23/2002
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/24/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2002
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/24/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/23/2002
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/24/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/23/2002
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/24/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/23/2002
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/12/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
COMPLAINT
Filing Date
6/4/2002
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/4/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2002
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/27/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2002
Description
073 - ME: Motion Withdrawn - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/24/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2002
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/21/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2002
Description
172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/20/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2002
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/13/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2002
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/22/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW CONFLICT OF INTEREST
Filing Date
5/8/2002
Description
MRD - Motion to Release Defendant on Own Recognizance, Reduce Bond and/or Release to a Third Party - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/22/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
5/7/2002
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/7/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2002
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/30/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO DETERMINE COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/1/2002
Description
098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/1/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2002
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/25/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
4/24/2002
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/25/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
4/24/2002
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/25/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
4/24/2002
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/25/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
4/22/2002
Description
RET - Request For Extension Of Time - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/19/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO CHALLENGE THE GRAND JURY PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
4/22/2002
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/6/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/18/2002
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/6/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
4/11/2002
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/25/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/8/2002
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/23/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2002
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/7/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/5/2002
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/5/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2002
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/23/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
3/22/2002
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/26/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1-2: BOND $885,000 NOT POSTED; CT 3: BOND $885,000 NOT POSTED
Filing Date
3/22/2002
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/26/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2002
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/26/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2002
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/26/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1: FIRST DEGREE MURDER CL 1 DANG FEL; CT 2: ATTEMPTED FIRST DEGREE MURDER CL 1 DANG FEL; CT 3: ATTEMPTED FIRST DEGREE MURDER CL 1 DANG FEL; DR 200220443901 - PHOENIX PD DOC: ON OR ABT 03-08-02
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/1/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty
Date
4/1/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Hearing.
Date
4/23/2002
Time
0:00
Event
Motion For Extension Of Time
Date
4/26/2002
Time
0:00
Event
Motion To Withdraw - Attorney
Date
5/2/2002
Time
0:00
Event
Motion To Determine Counsel
Date
5/13/2002
Time
0:00
Event
Motion To Withdraw - Attorney
Date
5/13/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/20/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
5/30/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
9/5/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
10/11/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing.