Criminal Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Southeast  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   NOTHWEHR, RICHARD      
Scott G Sucharew - (3)
 
Defendant  M   N/A     CR2001-093523-A  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Scott G Sucharew  28-661 (F3)  HIT AND RUN W/DEATH/INJURY  7/4/2001  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  1/18/2002 
Scott G Sucharew  13-1104 (F1)  MURDER 2ND DEGREE  7/4/2001  Guilty By Jury  Guilty By Jury  1/18/2002 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
4/18/2019  OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party (A)  4/18/2019   
NOTE: GRANTED SET ASIDE/GRANTED GUN RIGHTS 
1/30/2019  CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (A)  1/30/2019   
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet 
1/24/2019  ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (A)  1/28/2019   
4/18/2018  ORD - Order - Party (A)  4/18/2018   
NOTE: GRANTED GUN RIGHTS/DENIED SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT  
2/23/2018  CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (A)  2/23/2018   
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet 
2/21/2018  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (A)  2/21/2018  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO RESTORE GUN RIGHTS/TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT/VETERANS STAND DOWN 
6/27/2017  ORD - Order - Party (A)  6/29/2017   
NOTE: GRANTED CIVIL RIGHTS/DENIED SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT 
5/9/2017  CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (A)  5/9/2017   
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet 
5/2/2017  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (A)  5/3/2017  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS/TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT 
4/10/2017  ORD - Order - Party (A)  4/11/2017   
NOTE: DENIED CIVIL RIGHTS/DENIED SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT 
3/10/2017  CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (A)  3/10/2017   
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet 
2/28/2017  ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (A)  2/28/2017  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS/VETS STANDDOWN 
12/30/2016  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party ()  12/30/2016   
12/9/2016  ORD - Order - Party (A)  12/9/2016   
NOTE: DENIED CIVIL RIGHTS/DENIED GUN RIGHTS/DENIED SET ASIDE JUDGMENT OF GUILT 
11/18/2016  CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party (A)  11/18/2016   
NOTE: Criminal Financial Information Worksheet 
11/9/2016  ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party (A)  11/9/2016  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS/TO RESTORE GUN RIGHTS 
11/2/2016  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (A)  11/8/2016   
NOTE: COUNT 2 
10/4/2016  PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (A)  10/5/2016   
NOTE: COUNT 2 
5/27/2016  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (A)  5/27/2016   
5/24/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (A)  5/31/2016   
NOTE: STATE'S SECOND/TO DEFENDANT'S PETITION FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION 
5/23/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)  5/23/2016   
5/20/2016  EMF - Email Filed - Party (A)  5/24/2016   
5/16/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)  5/16/2016   
5/13/2016  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (A)  5/16/2016  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: REQUEST FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION 
5/11/2016  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)  5/11/2016   
5/6/2016  OBJ - Objection/Opposition. - Party (A)  5/10/2016   
NOTE: STATES/TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION 
4/28/2016  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (A)  5/4/2016  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: REQUEST FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION 
4/22/2015  DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet - Party ()  4/22/2015   
1/22/2015  LED - 2.8 (d) Letter - Party ()  1/23/2015   
6/19/2014  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party (A)  6/23/2014   
6/14/2011  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (A)  6/16/2011   
6/14/2011  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (A)  6/16/2011   
NOTE: DENYING REVIEW 
1/4/2010  REL - Reply - Party (A)  1/5/2010  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO STATE'S RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR REVIEW 
11/20/2009  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (A)  11/23/2009  Defendant (3)  
10/16/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)  10/16/2009   
9/30/2009  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (A)  10/1/2009  Defendant (3)  
9/3/2009  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (A)  9/3/2009   
9/2/2009  REC - Receipt - Party (A)  9/2/2009   
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL 
8/31/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)  8/31/2009   
8/28/2009  LET - Letter - Party (A)  9/11/2009   
8/28/2009  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (A)  8/28/2009   
8/28/2009  LET - Letter - Party (A)  8/28/2009   
NOTE: AUDIT LETTER 
8/19/2009  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (A)  8/20/2009  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: AND REQUEST FOR DECISION/RENEWAL OF REQUEST FOR SIGNED FINAL ORDER 
8/10/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)  8/10/2009   
7/16/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  7/17/2009   
NOTE: NOTIFICATION TO COURT REPORTERS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED 
7/14/2009  NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (A)  7/15/2009  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: FROM SUPERIOR COURT 
7/1/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)  7/1/2009   
6/18/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  6/19/2009  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: OF SERVICE/REQUEST FOR RELIEF 
6/3/2009  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (A)  6/3/2009   
6/2/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)  6/2/2009   
5/19/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  5/20/2009  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO AMEND 
5/19/2009  REQ - Request - Party (A)  5/20/2009  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: FOR STATUS UPDATE 
5/15/2009  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  5/18/2009  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: OF FAULT AND OPPORTUNITY TO CURE AND CONTEST ACCEPTANCE 
3/11/2009  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  3/12/2009  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: FOR LEAVE OF COURT 
3/5/2009  MFR - Motion For Reconsideration - Party (A)  3/6/2009  Defendant (3)  
2/24/2009  167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (A)  2/24/2009   
2/20/2009  597 - ME: PCR: Assigned for Ruling - Party (A)  2/20/2009   
11/28/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  11/28/2008  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR 
6/27/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  6/30/2008  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: FOR STATUS UPDATE 
6/27/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  7/1/2008  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: FOR STATUS UPDATE 
5/20/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  5/20/2008  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO CORRECT THE ERROR IN SENTENCING THE DEFENDANT TO COMMUNITY SUPERVISION ON COUNT ONE ON FEBRUARY 22, 2002 
5/19/2008  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  5/20/2008  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO HAVE MY CLASSIFICATION RECORD REFLECT THAT MY CRIME IS NON-DANGEROUS, NON-REPETITIVE AND NON-VIOLENT 
5/19/2004  167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (A)  5/19/2004   
3/23/2004  197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (A)  3/23/2004   
3/11/2004  NRE - Notice of Completion of Post Conviction Relief Request for Extension of Time - Party (A)  3/17/2004   
2/26/2004  197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (A)  2/26/2004   
2/13/2004  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party (A)  2/26/2004   
NOTE: BECAUSE OF EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES 
1/21/2004  197 – ME: PCR: Extension of Time - Party (A)  1/21/2004   
1/9/2004  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  1/16/2004   
NOTE: TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING PETITION FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF 
11/21/2003  596 - ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Apptd re: trial - Party (A)  11/21/2003   
11/5/2003  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (A)  11/5/2003   
NOTE: NOTICE OF POST-CONVICTION RELIEF 
10/30/2003  NPC - Notice Of Post Conviction Relief - Party (A)  10/31/2003  Plaintiff (1)  
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: LAURIE R YAZWA 10-4-01 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: LAURIE R YAZWA 10-11-01 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: LAURIE R YAZWA 11-2-01 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: LAURIE R YAZWA 12-3-01 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: LAURIE R YAZWA 12-7-01 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: LAURIE R YAZWA 12-17-01 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: LAURIE R YAZWA 1-4-02 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: DONNA JOHNSON 1-8-02 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: ANTOINETTE SALAZAR 1-9-02 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: DONNA JOHNSON 1-10-02 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: DONNA JOHNSON 1-14-02 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: ANTOINETTE SALAZAR 1-15-02 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: 1-16-02 DONNA JOHNSON 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: DONNA JOHNSON 1-17-02 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: DONNA JOHNSON 1-18-02 
10/24/2003  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  11/4/2003   
NOTE: DONNA JOHNSON 2-22-02 
10/23/2003  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (A)  10/30/2003   
10/23/2003  MAN - Order Of Mandate - Party (A)  10/30/2003   
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS/OPINION - AFFIRMED 
5/19/2003  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (A)  8/4/2009   
10/1/2002  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (A)  10/25/2002   
7/5/2002  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)  8/4/2009   
7/2/2002  REC - Receipt - Party (A)  7/2/2002   
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS 
7/2/2002  REC - Receipt - Party (A)  7/2/2002   
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL 
6/26/2002  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (A)  6/28/2002   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL 
6/20/2002  STP - Stipulation - Party (A)  6/25/2002  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO CORRECT OR MODIFY THE RECORD ON APPEAL 
6/20/2002  NOF - Notice Of Filing - Party (A)  6/25/2002  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: DOCUMENTS ITEMS MODIFIED RECORD 
6/18/2002  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)  6/18/2002   
6/7/2002  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (A)  6/18/2002   
5/29/2002  REP - Report - Party (A)  6/5/2002   
NOTE: ADOT COURT ABSTRACT 
5/24/2002  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)  5/24/2002   
5/16/2002  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (A)  5/20/2002   
5/16/2002  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (A)  5/20/2002   
NOTE: STAY OF APPEAL 
5/2/2002  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (A)  5/14/2002   
5/2/2002  REC - Receipt - Party (A)  6/5/2002   
4/19/2002  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (A)  4/19/2002   
NOTE: AMENDED 
4/18/2002  REC - Receipt - Party (A)  4/18/2002   
NOTE: PUBLIC DEFENDER 
4/4/2002  RES - Response - Party (A)  4/12/2002  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL 
4/2/2002  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  4/11/2002   
NOTE: OF COMPLETION OF RECORD 
3/28/2002  REC - Receipt - Party (A)  3/29/2002   
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS 
3/21/2002  REC - Receipt - Party (A)  3/25/2002   
NOTE: ATTORNEY GENERAL 
3/15/2002  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  3/22/2002  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: DESIGNATION OF RECORD FOR APPEAL 
3/15/2002  AIX - Appeals Index - Party (A)  3/15/2002   
3/15/2002  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  3/15/2002   
NOTE: TO COURT REPORTERS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED 
3/11/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  3/15/2002   
3/8/2002  099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (A)  3/8/2002   
3/8/2002  ORD - Order - Party (A)  3/15/2002  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: THAT MICHAEL V BLACK IS ALLOWED TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR THE; DEFENDANT SCOTT G SUCHAREW 
3/1/2002  189 - ME: Sentence - Imprisonment And Probation - Party (A)  3/1/2002   
2/25/2002  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  2/28/2002  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 
2/25/2002  NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (A)  3/1/2002  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: RAPID TRANSCRIPT 
2/22/2002  STA - Statement - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  LET - Letter - Party (A)  2/28/2002   
2/22/2002  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)  3/4/2002   
2/22/2002  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (A)  3/5/2002   
2/22/2002  TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (A)  3/18/2002   
2/6/2002  RES - Response - Party (A)  2/7/2002  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: TO DEF MOT FOR NEW TRIAL 
1/28/2002  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  1/30/2002  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: FOR NEW TRIAL 
1/24/2002  012 - ME: Trial - Party (A)  1/24/2002   
1/23/2002  VER - Verdict - Party (A)  1/24/2002   
NOTE: UNSIGNED 
1/23/2002  VER - Verdict - Party (A)  1/24/2002   
NOTE: UNSIGNED 
1/23/2002  VER - Verdict - Party (A)  1/24/2002   
NOTE: UNSIGNED 
1/23/2002  VER - Verdict - Party (A)  1/24/2002   
NOTE: UNSIGNED 
1/23/2002  VER - Verdict - Party (A)  1/24/2002   
NOTE: UNSIGNED 
1/23/2002  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (A)  1/31/2002   
1/23/2002  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (A)  2/11/2002   
1/21/2002  012 - ME: Trial - Party (A)  1/21/2002   
1/18/2002  012 - ME: Trial - Party (A)  1/18/2002   
1/18/2002  JNO - Jury Note - Party (A)  1/24/2002   
1/18/2002  JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (A)  1/24/2002   
NOTE: PRELIMINARY 
1/18/2002  VER - Verdict - Party (A)  1/24/2002   
NOTE: SIGNED 
1/18/2002  VER - Verdict - Party (A)  1/24/2002   
NOTE: SIGNED 
1/17/2002  012 - ME: Trial - Party (A)  1/17/2002   
1/17/2002  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (A)  1/24/2002  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL 
1/16/2002  012 - ME: Trial - Party (A)  1/16/2002   
1/16/2002  REQ - Request - Party (A)  1/17/2002  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: ADDITIONAL JURY INSTRUCTION 
1/15/2002  REQ - Request - Party (A)  1/16/2002  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: JURY INSTRUCTIONS 
1/14/2002  012 - ME: Trial - Party (A)  1/14/2002   
1/14/2002  012 - ME: Trial - Party (A)  1/14/2002   
1/11/2002  012 - ME: Trial - Party (A)  1/11/2002   
1/8/2002  088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (A)  1/8/2002   
1/8/2002  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (A)  1/8/2002   
1/8/2002  JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (A)  1/24/2002   
1/4/2002  DCJ - Defendant Not Change Of Judge - Party (A)  1/9/2002  Defendant (3)  
1/4/2002  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  1/9/2002  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO DETERMINE VOLUNTARINESS OF STATEMENTS 
1/3/2002  RES - Response - Party (A)  1/4/2002  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: TO DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE 
1/2/2002  SUB - Subpoena - Party (A)  1/3/2002  Plaintiff (1)  
12/28/2001  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (A)  12/31/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
12/28/2001  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (A)  1/2/2002  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TRIAL DATE 
12/26/2001  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  12/28/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: AMENDED PAGE 3/TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE DIRECT & DERIVATIVE BASED ON VIOLATION; OF DEFS RIGHT TO COUNSEL SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM 
12/19/2001  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (A)  12/19/2001   
12/19/2001  AFF - Affidavit - Party (A)  12/21/2001   
NOTE: FOR EXONERATION OF BOND 
12/19/2001  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  12/26/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE DIRECT & DERIVATIVE BASED ON VIOLATION OF DEFS RIGHT; TO COUNSEL SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM 
12/17/2001  PTT - Petition - Party (A)  12/18/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: FOR ORDER GRANTING IMMUNITY TO WITNESS 
12/17/2001  ORD - Order - Party (A)  12/18/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: WESTON DOYLE IS REQUIRED TO GIVE TESTIMONY OR PRODUCE EVIDENCE WHICH SHALL; NOT BE USED AGAINST HIM 
12/14/2001  MEM - Memorandum - Party (A)  12/17/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RE RIGHT TO COUNSEL 
12/12/2001  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (A)  12/12/2001   
12/7/2001  WSH - Worksheet - Party (A)  12/13/2001   
NOTE: TRIAL HEARING 
12/6/2001  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)  12/6/2001   
11/30/2001  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set - Party (A)  11/30/2001   
11/28/2001  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (A)  11/29/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
11/28/2001  SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party (A)  11/29/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
11/26/2001  RES - Response - Party (A)  11/27/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: TO MOTION TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE SEARCH WARRANT 
11/26/2001  RES - Response - Party (A)  11/27/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: TO MOTION TO SUPPRESS RIGHT TO COUNSEL 
11/26/2001  RES - Response - Party (A)  11/27/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: TO MOTION TO CONTINUE 
11/22/2001  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)  11/22/2001   
11/13/2001  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (A)  11/19/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TRIAL DATE 
11/13/2001  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  11/19/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE DIRECT AND DERIVATIVE BASED ON VIOLATION OF DEF RIGHT TO; COUNSEL 
11/13/2001  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  11/19/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO SUPPRESS EVIDENCE DIRECT AND DERIVATIVE BASED UPON FALSE AFFIDAVIT MOT FOR; FRANKS HRG 
11/13/2001  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  11/19/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL/OF WIT AND EXH 
11/13/2001  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  11/19/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO SUBMIT JURY QUESTIONNAIRE 
11/9/2001  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (A)  11/13/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL 
11/7/2001  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (A)  11/8/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL 
11/6/2001  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (A)  11/6/2001   
11/6/2001  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  11/7/2001  Defendant (3)  
11/5/2001  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (A)  11/5/2001   
11/5/2001  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  11/7/2001  Defendant (3)  
10/29/2001  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  10/30/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: TO ACCELERATE HEARING ON MOTION TO REMAND 
10/22/2001  RES - Response - Party (A)  10/23/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: TO MOTION TO REMAND 
10/19/2001  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (A)  10/19/2001   
10/17/2001  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  10/17/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO COMPEL AND MOT FOR SANCTIONS 
10/17/2001  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  10/18/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
10/17/2001  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (A)  10/18/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
10/17/2001  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  10/18/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
10/17/2001  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  10/18/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
10/16/2001  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  10/19/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO REMAND PURSUANT TO RULE 12.9 ARCP 
10/15/2001  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (A)  10/15/2001   
10/15/2001  LET - Letter - Party (A)  10/15/2001   
10/12/2001  LET - Letter - Party (A)  10/12/2001   
10/10/2001  LET - Letter - Party (A)  10/11/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF ORIGINAL RELEASE CONDITIONS 
10/8/2001  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party (A)  10/8/2001   
10/5/2001  RES - Response - Party (A)  10/10/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: TO MOT TO AMEND CONDITIONS OF RELEASE 
10/4/2001  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  10/4/2001  Defendant (3)  
10/4/2001  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  10/4/2001  Defendant (3)  
10/4/2001  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  10/4/2001  Defendant (3)  
10/4/2001  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (A)  10/4/2001  Defendant (3)  
10/1/2001  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  10/4/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO AMEND CONDITIONS OF RELEASE 
9/28/2001  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (A)  9/28/2001   
9/25/2001  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (A)  9/25/2001   
9/25/2001  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party (A)  9/25/2001   
9/24/2001  NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (A)  9/26/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: 1ST 
9/18/2001  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  9/18/2001  Defendant (3)  
9/18/2001  ORD - Order - Party (A)  9/20/2001   
NOTE: RE STILL & ELECTRONIC CAMERAS - CAMERA COVERAGE IS PERMITTED ONLY IN COURTROOM; IN WHICH A PROCEEDING IS BEING HELD 
9/18/2001  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  9/20/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE A MOT TO REMAND 
9/17/2001  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  9/18/2001  Defendant (3)  
9/17/2001  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  9/18/2001  Defendant (3)  
9/17/2001  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (A)  9/18/2001  Defendant (3)  
9/14/2001  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (A)  9/17/2001  Defendant (3)  
9/14/2001  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  9/17/2001  Defendant (3)  
9/14/2001  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  9/17/2001  Defendant (3)  
9/14/2001  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)  9/17/2001  Defendant (3)  
8/28/2001  019 - ME: Ruling - Party (A)  8/28/2001   
8/24/2001  BON - Bond - Party (A)  8/28/2001   
NOTE: $20,000 
8/23/2001  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (A)  8/23/2001   
8/20/2001  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (A)  8/28/2001   
8/20/2001  ACR - Additional Conditions For Release - Party (A)  9/18/2001   
8/20/2001  ROR - Release Order - Party (A)  9/18/2001   
NOTE: SUPERVISED 8-20-01 
8/16/2001  INF - Information - Party (A)  8/17/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL/RE MOTION TO RELEASE VICTIMS STATEMENTS 
8/14/2001  REL - Reply - Party (A)  8/15/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO STATES RES TO DEF MOT FOR RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE MOT TO ACCELERATE HRG 
8/13/2001  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  8/14/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: OF DISCOVERY 
8/8/2001  RES - Response - Party (A)  8/8/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR RELEASE 
8/1/2001  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)  8/3/2001   
8/1/2001  LET - Letter - Party (A)  8/6/2001   
8/1/2001  MOT - Motion - Party (A)  8/6/2001  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: AMENDED/FOR RELEASE ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE 
7/30/2001  MRD - Motion to Release Defendant on Own Recognizance, Reduce Bond and/or Release to a Third Party - Party (A)  8/1/2001  Defendant (3)  
7/26/2001  TRM - Transmittal - Party (A)  7/27/2001   
NOTE: RELEASE ORDER BOND $123,900 7-4-01 ORDER REGARDING COUNSEL; PSA RECOMMENDATION PSA BACKGROUND INFORMATION; PSA FINANCIAL INFORMATION RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE 
7/26/2001  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (A)  8/2/2001  Defendant (3)  
7/16/2001  NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (A)  7/18/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: CTS 1-2: BOND $123,900 NOT POSTED 
7/16/2001  IND - Indictment - Party (A)  7/18/2001  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: CT 1: SECOND DEGREE MURDER CL 1 FEL; CT 2: LEAVING SCENE OF FATAL INJURY ACCIDENT CL 3 FEL; DR 200111242164 - PHOENIX PD DOC: ON OR ABT 07-04-01 
7/16/2001  606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (A)  7/18/2001   
7/16/2001  DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)  7/18/2001   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
8/17/2001  10:00   Oral Argument. 
9/19/2001  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
10/4/2001  9:00   Oral Argument. 
10/11/2001  8:30   Oral Argument. 
11/2/2001  8:30   Oral Argument. 
12/7/2001  13:30   Evidentiary Hearing . 
12/17/2001  13:30   Pretrial Conference 
1/4/2002  8:30   Motion To Continue 
1/8/2002  9:30   Firm Trial Date 
1/9/2002  9:30   Trial Continuing 
1/10/2002  10:00   Trial Continuing 
1/14/2002  10:00   Trial Continuing 
1/15/2002  13:15   Trial Continuing 
1/16/2002  13:30   Trial Continuing 
1/17/2002  9:30   Trial Continuing 
1/18/2002  10:00   Trial Continuing 
2/22/2002  11:00   Sentencing. 
3/6/2002  0:00   Motion To Withdraw - Attorney 
6/7/2002  10:30   Status Conference.