« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
HANLON, THOMAS
Judge
Case #
Party Name
B Grand Jury - (2)
Relationship
Deft Grand Jury
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Corey, Susan
Judge
Martin
Case #
CR2001-018018-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
10/30/2001
Date
3/29/2002
Description
PROMOTING PRISON CONTRABAND
ARSCode
13-2505 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2002
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/28/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2002
Description
571 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (no Monetary Orders Entered) - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/6/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/2002
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/14/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
5/2/2002
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/30/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/29/2002
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/29/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2002
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/3/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2002
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/1/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2002
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/26/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/2002
Description
STA - Statement - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/17/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL
Filing Date
3/6/2002
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/6/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
3/6/2002
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/6/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
VOIR DIRE
Filing Date
2/11/2002
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/12/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2002
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/17/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2002
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/15/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2002
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/9/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2002
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/15/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO DETERMINE COUNSEL (RELATED CASE CR2001-13021)
Filing Date
12/21/2001
Description
NWP - Notice Of Witness On Trial Of Prior(s) - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/8/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/21/2001
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/8/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
12/21/2001
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/8/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
12/21/2001
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/8/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/13/2001
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/14/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2001
Description
PTR - Pretrial Service Recommendation - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/20/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2001
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/20/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2001
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/20/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $17,700 12/03/01
Filing Date
12/12/2001
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/20/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2001
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/20/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2001
Description
PBA - Pretrial Srvcs Agency Backgrnd - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/20/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2001
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/5/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
BOND $17,700
Filing Date
11/30/2001
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/5/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PROMOTING PRISON CONTRABAND CL 2 FEL; DR 0129959 - MCSO DOC: ON OR ABT 10-30-01
Filing Date
11/30/2001
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/5/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2001
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/5/2001
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/3/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference.
Date
1/11/2002
Time
9:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
3/28/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Trial Management Conference
Date
4/24/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing.
Date
5/2/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing.