« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
HANLON, THOMAS
Judge
Case #
Party Name
B Grand Jury - (2)
Relationship
Deft Grand Jury
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Corey, Susan
Judge
Culbertson
Case #
CR2001-013021-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
8/22/2001
Date
3/28/2002
Description
BURGLARY TOOLS POSSESSION
ARSCode
13-1505 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
8/22/2001
Date
11/30/2001
Description
BURGLARY 3RD DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1506 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled No Contest
Disposition
Pled No Contest
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2002
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/29/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2002
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/27/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR CHANGE OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
4/2/2002
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/27/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR PLEA WITHDRAWAL
Filing Date
4/1/2002
Description
571 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (no Monetary Orders Entered) - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/1/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2002
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/6/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2002
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/24/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2002
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/11/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2002
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/16/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2002
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/8/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2002
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/11/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO DETERMINE COUNSEL/RELATED CASE CR 2001-018018
Filing Date
1/2/2002
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/9/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF'S MOTION FOR CHANGE OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
12/27/2001
Description
905 - ME: Correspondence Received By Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/27/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2001
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/4/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2001
Description
LET - Letter - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/14/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2001
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/30/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2001
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/14/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2001
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/4/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SUPPRESS
Filing Date
11/28/2001
Description
MIL - Motion In Limine - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/4/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO PRECLUDE INTRODUCTION OF DEFENDANTS EXCULPATORY STATEMENTS
Filing Date
11/27/2001
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/27/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2001
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/27/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/27/2001
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/30/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF'S ADDENDUM TO PRECLUDE
Filing Date
11/26/2001
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/26/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/26/2001
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/26/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/26/2001
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/26/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/23/2001
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/26/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
11/23/2001
Description
STA - Statement - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/26/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL
Filing Date
11/23/2001
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/26/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
VOIR DIRE
Filing Date
11/21/2001
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/21/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2001
Description
STA - Statement - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/29/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
ADDENDUM TO MOTION TO PRECLUDE
Filing Date
11/19/2001
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/23/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE
Filing Date
11/1/2001
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/6/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF SETTING INTERVIEWS
Filing Date
10/30/2001
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/2/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF'S MOTION TO ORDER DEPOSITIONS
Filing Date
10/29/2001
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/1/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO ORDER DEPOSITION
Filing Date
10/23/2001
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/23/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2001
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/15/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
10/11/2001
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/11/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2001
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/11/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
10/11/2001
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/11/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
10/11/2001
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/11/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
10/10/2001
Description
NWP - Notice Of Witness On Trial Of Prior(s) - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/18/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/10/2001
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/18/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT
Filing Date
10/10/2001
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/18/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
10/10/2001
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/18/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/10/2001
Description
NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/18/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/9/2001
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/18/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF'S MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
10/2/2001
Description
MRD - Motion to Release Defendant on Own Recognizance, Reduce Bond and/or Release to a Third Party - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/10/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
9/20/2001
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/20/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2001
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/25/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
9/18/2001
Description
RAD - Request For Automatic Additional Disclosure - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/25/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
8/30/2001
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/4/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1: BURGLARY IN THE THIRD DEGREE CL 4 FEL; CT 2: POSS OF BURGLARY TOOLS CL 6 FEL; DR 200111576411 - PHOENIX PD DOC: ON OR ABT 08-22-01
Filing Date
8/30/2001
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/4/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2001
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/4/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2001
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/4/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1-2: BOND $1770 NOT POSTED
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/18/2001
Time
8:30
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
10/18/2001
Time
8:30
Event
Motion To Modify Release
Date
11/16/2001
Time
11:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing .
Date
11/30/2001
Time
9:30
Event
Change Of Plea
Date
1/3/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing.
Date
1/11/2002
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference.
Date
2/7/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing.
Date
3/28/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing.