« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Fuller, Steven
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Defender - Ccc, Public
Judge
Culbertson
Case #
CR2001-011578-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis
Crime Date
8/22/2001
Date
8/30/2001
Description
BURGLARY TOOLS POSSESSION
ARSCode
13-1505 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis
Crime Date
8/22/2001
Date
8/30/2001
Description
BURGLARY 3RD DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1506 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Grand Jury Indictment
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2001
Description
TRM - Transmittal - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/14/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE ORDER BOND $1770 08-23-01 ORDER REGARDING COUNSEL; PSA RECOMMENDATION PSA BACKGROUND INFORMATION; PSA FINANCIAL INFORMATION RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
8/31/2001
Description
620 - ME: Gj Order Dismissing Case - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/26/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2001
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/6/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
MOTION AND/DIRECT COMPLAINT
Filing Date
8/27/2001
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/29/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1: BURGLARY IN THE THIRD DEGREE CL 4 FEL; CT 2: POSS OF BURGLARY TOOLS CL 6 FEL; DR200111576411 PHX PD DOC: ON OR ABT 082201
Filing Date
8/27/2001
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/29/2001
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/30/2001
Time
11:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty