« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   Campagnolo, Theodore      
B State Grand Jury - (2)
 
Deft Grand Jury  N/A   To Be Determined      
Stephen Barry Beizer - (3)
 
Defendant  M   Baskin, Alan   Fox  CR2001-003702-  
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Stephen Barry Beizer  44-1841 (F4)  SALE-UNREGISTERED SECURITIES  9/1/1995  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  2/13/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-2310 (F2)  FRAUDULENT SCHEMES/ARTIFICES  7/1/1997  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/16/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-1802 (F3)  THEFT  9/1/1997  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  2/13/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-1802 (F2)  THEFT  8/21/1997  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/16/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-1802 (F2)  THEFT  8/4/1998  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/16/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-1802 (F2)  THEFT  8/20/1998  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/16/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-1802 (F3)  THEFT  4/12/1996  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/16/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-1802 (F3)  THEFT  10/7/1996  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/16/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-1802 (F3)  THEFT  2/24/1997  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/16/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-1802 (F3)  THEFT  4/28/1997  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/16/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-1802 (F3)  THEFT  5/23/1997  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/16/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-1802 (F3)  THEFT  3/15/1999  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/16/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-1802 (F4)  THEFT  6/6/1997  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/16/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-1802 (F4)  THEFT  7/14/1998  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/16/2004 
Stephen Barry Beizer  13-2312 (F3)  ILLEGAL CONTROL OF ENTERPRISE  9/1/1995  Dismissed - Plea Other  Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count  4/16/2004 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
12/19/2016  018 - ME: Findings Of Fact And Conclusion Of Law - Party ()  12/19/2016   
12/16/2016  LET - Letter - Party ()  12/20/2016   
2/11/2010  NTF - Notice to the File - Party ()  2/18/2010   
1/25/2010  PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party ()  2/19/2010   
NOTE: COUNT 3
6/3/2009  049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party ()  6/3/2009   
6/2/2009  CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party ()  6/4/2009   
6/2/2009  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party ()  6/4/2009   
NOTE: COUNT 3
6/2/2009  CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party ()  6/10/2009   
4/16/2009  NOT - Notice - Party ()  4/17/2009   
NOTE: OF WITHDRAWAL OF ITS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE ENTRY OF ORDER ON ADULT PROBATION DEPT REQUEST FOR MODIFICATION/TERMINATION OF PROBATION
4/8/2009  003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party ()  4/8/2009   
4/3/2009  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party ()  4/3/2009   
4/2/2009  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party ()  4/2/2009   
NOTE: of Hearing on Adult Probation Departments Request for Modification/Termination of Probation
3/17/2009  LET - Letter - Party ()  3/23/2009   
5/9/2008  ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party ()  5/19/2008   
NOTE: COUNT 1
9/21/2007  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party ()  9/21/2007   
7/10/2007  REQ - Request - Party ()  7/11/2007  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: TO DELETE WHITE COLLAR PROBATION
5/3/2007  RSD - Request to Establish Start Date of Restitution, Probation Service Fees, Fines - Party ()  5/9/2007   
4/3/2007  LET - Letter - Party ()  4/4/2007   
1/26/2007  AFF - Affidavit - Party ()  2/1/2007   
NOTE: OF IDENTITY
7/7/2005  118 - ME: Modifica/Terms Probation - Party ()  7/7/2005   
7/4/2005  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party ()  7/4/2005   
6/10/2005  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party ()  6/10/2005   
3/31/2005  MOT - Motion - Party ()  4/18/2005  Defendant (3)  
NOTE: /TO MODIFY TERMS OF PROBATION
9/21/2004  DRE - Disposition Report - Party ()  9/27/2004   
4/20/2004  109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party ()  4/20/2004   
4/16/2004  TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party ()  4/22/2004   
4/16/2004  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party ()  4/27/2004   
4/16/2004  PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()  4/28/2004   
4/13/2004  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party ()  4/13/2004   
4/8/2004  SUP - Supplemental Presentence Report - Party ()  4/29/2004   
3/16/2004  169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party ()  3/16/2004   
3/11/2004  MEM - Memorandum - Party ()  3/25/2004   
NOTE: SENTENCING
3/4/2004  NOT - Notice - Party ()  3/23/2004   
NOTE: OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM
2/18/2004  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party ()  2/18/2004   
2/13/2004  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()  2/25/2004   
11/25/2003  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()  11/25/2003   
11/25/2003  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party ()  11/25/2003   
11/24/2003  005 - ME: Hearing - Party ()  11/21/2003   
11/20/2003  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party ()  11/25/2003   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO/ OR REMAND
11/13/2003  NOT - Notice - Party ()  11/25/2003   
NOTE: OF DEFENSE DISCLOSURE
11/3/2003  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party ()  11/15/2003   
NOTE: AND MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING PRETRIAL MOTIONS
10/29/2003  RES - Response - Party ()  11/6/2003   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO REMAND
10/21/2003  056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party ()  10/21/2003   
10/16/2003  APL - Application - Party ()  10/27/2003   
NOTE: FOR SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
10/14/2003  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party ()  10/27/2003   
NOTE: AND SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO REMAND
10/7/2003  016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party ()  10/7/2003   
10/6/2003  ORD - Order - Party ()  10/20/2003   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION TO REMAND
10/3/2003  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party ()  10/3/2003   
10/1/2003  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party ()  10/3/2003   
NOTE: WITHIN WHICH TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION TO REMAND
9/19/2003  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party ()  9/24/2003   
NOTE: WITHIN WHICH TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION TO REMAND
9/16/2003  176 - ME: Continuance - Party ()  9/16/2003   
9/15/2003  022 - ME: Order Signed - Party ()  9/15/2003   
9/15/2003  ORD - Order - Party ()  9/25/2003   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION TO REMAND
9/10/2003  176 - ME: Continuance - Party ()  9/10/2003   
9/9/2003  MET - Motion for Extension Of Time - Party ()  9/17/2003   
NOTE: WITHIN WHICH TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION TO REMAND
9/4/2003  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party ()  9/10/2003   
9/4/2003  066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party ()  9/4/2003   
9/3/2003  118 - ME: Modifica/Terms Probation - Party ()  9/3/2003   
9/2/2003  MCO - Motion To Continue - Party ()  9/11/2003   
NOTE: PREHEARING CONFERENCE
8/27/2003  ORD - Order - Party ()  9/4/2003   
NOTE: GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION TO REMAND
8/27/2003  ROR - Release Order - Party ()  9/4/2003   
NOTE: SUPERVISED RELEASE BOND $5000 08-21-03
8/25/2003  005 - ME: Hearing - Party ()  8/25/2003   
8/22/2003  BON - Bond - Party ()  8/29/2003   
NOTE: PAPER/SURETY $5000 BANKERS INS. CO
8/18/2003  005 - ME: Hearing - Party ()  8/18/2003   
8/12/2003  MOT - Motion - Party ()  8/15/2003   
NOTE: TO REMAND AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME WITHIN WHICH TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION TO REMAND
8/8/2003  095 - ME: Oral Argument Reset - Party ()  8/8/2003   
8/6/2003  NDD - Notice of Discovery Disclosure/Witness/Interviews - Party ()  8/11/2003   
7/28/2003  MOT - Motion - Party ()  8/18/2003   
NOTE: TO MODIFY CONDITION OF RELEASE
7/22/2003  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()  8/6/2003   
7/22/2003  IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party ()  7/25/2003   
7/18/2003  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()  8/6/2003   
7/14/2003  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party ()  7/14/2003   
NOTE: SERVED 7/11/03
6/20/2003  WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party ()  7/14/2003   
NOTE: USED FOR EXEMPT ONLY
3/15/2001  IND - Indictment - Party ()  7/14/2003   
3/15/2001  604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party ()  7/14/2003   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
7/18/2003  8:30   Original Arraignment Hearing 
8/14/2003  8:30   Oral Argument 
8/21/2003  8:30   Oral Argument 
8/25/2003  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
9/8/2003  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
9/22/2003  8:30   Initial Pretrial Conference 
11/14/2003  10:00   Oral Argument 
11/14/2003  13:30   Oral Argument 
11/21/2003  10:00   Oral Argument 
12/1/2003  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
12/3/2003  9:30   Trial 
2/13/2004  8:30   Trial Management Conference 
2/17/2004  9:30   Trial 
3/12/2004  8:30   Sentencing 
4/9/2004  9:30   Sentencing 
4/16/2004  12:30   Sentencing 
7/1/2005  8:30   Oral Argument 
3/20/2009  9:00   Restitution Hearing 
4/3/2009  8:30   Restitution Hearing 
5/8/2009  8:30   Restitution Hearing 
5/11/2009  9:00   Restitution Hearing 
click here for Law Library Resource Center