« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
General, Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Wanda Denise French - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
Kimble, Raymond
Judge
ZZ CR Admin
Case #
CR2001-001524-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
10/1/1999
Date
7/13/2001
Description
THEFT-OBTAIN BY MISREPRESENT
ARSCode
13-1802A3 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
10/1/1999
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FRAUD SCHEME/PRACTICE-CONCEAL
ARSCode
13-2311 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
4/2/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (M1)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
3/26/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
3/19/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
3/12/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
3/5/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
2/27/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
2/21/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
2/13/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
2/6/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
1/30/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
1/23/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
1/16/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
1/9/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
1/2/2000
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
12/26/1999
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
12/19/1999
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
12/13/1999
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
12/5/1999
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
11/28/1999
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
11/21/1999
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
11/14/1999
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
11/7/1999
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Wanda Denise French 
Crime Date
10/31/1999
Date
7/13/2001
Description
FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS
ARSCode
23-785 (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2002
Description
OVJ - Order Vacating Judgment - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/5/2002
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/14/2002
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/21/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2001
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/30/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2001
Description
192 - ME: Sentence - Fine - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/30/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2001
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/1/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
OR 04-06-01
Filing Date
7/25/2001
Description
APL - Application - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/26/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO VACATE CONVICTION
Filing Date
7/17/2001
Description
ORD - Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/21/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
ASSESSING FINE
Filing Date
7/13/2001
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/31/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2001
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/31/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2001
Description
179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/17/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2001
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/3/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
ENTERING OF NOT GUILTY PLEA
Filing Date
2/22/2001
Description
SUM - Summons - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/22/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED CERT MAIL
Filing Date
1/31/2001
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/2/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 2: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 3: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 4: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 5: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL
Filing Date
1/31/2001
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/2/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 6: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 7: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 8: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 9: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 10: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL
Filing Date
1/31/2001
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/2/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 11: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 12: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 13: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 14: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 15: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL
Filing Date
1/31/2001
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/2/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 16: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 17: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 18: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 19: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 20: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL
Filing Date
1/31/2001
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/2/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 21: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 22: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 23: FALSE STMT TO OBTAIN BENEFITS CL 6 FEL; CT 24: FRAUD SCHEME/PRACTICE-CONCEAL CL 5 FEL; CT 25: THEFT-OBTAIN BY MISREPRESENT CL 3 FEL
Filing Date
1/31/2001
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/2/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
DOC: ON 10/31/1999
Filing Date
1/31/2001
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/8/2001
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
No records found.