« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
HANLON, THOMAS
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Garner, Yancey
Judge
Superior Court
Case #
CR2000-017228-A
Party Name
Stantley Welch - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Spencer, Lorna
Judge
Green
Case #
CR2000-017228-B
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis
Crime Date
10/26/2000
Date
4/9/2001
Description
UNLAW FLIGHT FROM LAW ENF VEH
ARSCode
28-622.01 (F5)
Disposition Code
Not Guilty By Court
Disposition
Not Guilty By Court
Party Name
Stantley Welch
Crime Date
10/26/2000
Date
1/4/2001
Description
ROBBERY
ARSCode
13-1902 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2001
Description
REP - Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/24/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
ADOT COURT ABSTRACT
Filing Date
4/17/2001
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/24/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2001
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/18/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2001
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/11/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2001
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/11/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2001
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/19/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXONERATION OF BOND
Filing Date
4/2/2001
Description
BON - Bond - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/5/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $6000 SAFETY NATIONAL CASUALTY CORP
Filing Date
3/20/2001
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/20/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2001
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party ()
Docket Date
4/10/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/16/2001
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party ()
Docket Date
4/10/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/16/2001
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party ()
Docket Date
4/10/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/16/2001
Description
SUA - Subpoena And Affidavit Of Service - Party ()
Docket Date
4/10/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/14/2001
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/14/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2001
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
4/6/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TRIAL/MOTION FOR REDETERIMINATION OF INDIGENCY/MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF; COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/7/2001
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/6/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
VOIR DIRE
Filing Date
3/7/2001
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/6/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
2/27/2001
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/29/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL/ OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/21/2001
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/17/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXONERATION OF BOND
Filing Date
2/20/2001
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (B)
Docket Date
2/26/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2001
Description
571 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (no Monetary Orders Entered) - Party (B)
Docket Date
2/7/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2001
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (B)
Docket Date
2/27/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2001
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (B)
Docket Date
3/8/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2001
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party ()
Docket Date
3/3/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
1/5/2001
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (B)
Docket Date
1/5/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2001
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (B)
Docket Date
1/22/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/26/2000
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/26/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/26/2000
Description
194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (B)
Docket Date
12/26/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2000
Description
BON - Bond - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/8/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $6000 SAFETY CASUALTY CORP
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (B)
Docket Date
11/21/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/21/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (B)
Docket Date
12/9/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
NWP - Notice Of Witness On Trial Of Prior(s) - Party (B)
Docket Date
12/9/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (B)
Docket Date
12/9/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (B)
Docket Date
12/9/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF SERIOUS OFFENSE/LIFE IMPRISONMENT
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (B)
Docket Date
12/9/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/9/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/9/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF OFFENSES COMMITED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
NWP - Notice Of Witness On Trial Of Prior(s) - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/9/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/9/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
12/9/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (B)
Docket Date
12/9/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
11/8/2000
Description
INF - Information - Party (A,B)
Docket Date
12/2/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/8/2000
Description
INF - Information - Party (A,B)
Docket Date
1/8/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/6/2000
Description
COM - Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/7/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT 2: UNLAW FLIGHT FROM LAW ENF VEH CL 5 FEL (A); DOC: ON 10/26/2000 CR0002622FE (A)
Filing Date
11/6/2000
Description
BIN - Bindover - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/7/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE ORD: BOND $6000.00 WPH/ARR: 11-02-2000/11-09-2000-A; IA: 10-26-2000 DEF ATTY: YANCEY GARNER; TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
11/6/2000
Description
COM - Complaint - Party (B)
Docket Date
11/7/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT 1: ROBBERY CL 4 FEL (B); DOC: ON 10/26/2000 CR0002622FE (B)
Filing Date
11/6/2000
Description
BIN - Bindover - Party (B)
Docket Date
11/7/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE ORD: BOND $10620.00 WPH/ARR: 11-02-2000/11-09-2000-AIA: 10-26-2000 DEF ATTY: WILLIAM MOORE ¢LD!; TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION-------------------------BEGIN SUPERIOR COURT PLEADINGS-------------------------
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/6/2001
Time
9:00
Event
Sentencing.
Date
3/8/2001
Time
13:30
Event
Motion To Continue
Date
4/9/2001
Time
9:00
Event
Firm Trial Date