« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Downtown  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   HANLON, THOMAS      
B Grand Jury - (2)
 
Deft Grand Jury  N/A   To Be Determined      
Rafael Stuart Vasquez - (3)
 
Defendant  M   Aguilar, David   Como  CR2000-013851-B  
Joshua Joel Page - (4)
 
Defendant  M   SHOSTAK, WILLIAM   Como  CR2000-013851-A  
Clerk Of The Court - (5)
 
In The Matter Of  N/A   To Be Determined      
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
Joshua Joel Page  13-1904 (F2)  ARMED ROBBERY  7/23/2000  Pled Guilty As Charged  Pled Guilty As Charged  12/6/2000 
Rafael Stuart Vasquez  13-1904 (F3)  ARMED ROBBERY  7/23/2000  Pled to Reduced Charge  Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge  12/14/2000 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
2/23/2011  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  2/25/2011   
NOTE: OF EMPLOYEE STATUS CHANGE
2/9/2011  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  2/11/2011   
NOTE: UNABLE TO WITHHOLD
2/9/2011  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  2/11/2011   
NOTE: UNABLE TO WITHHOLD
1/31/2011  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  2/1/2011   
NOTE: UNABLE TO WITHHOLD
1/19/2011  REP - Report - Party (A)  1/24/2011   
NOTE: QUARTERLY / OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR
1/11/2011  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  1/13/2011   
NOTE: STATEMENT TO A CONTINUING LIEN
12/27/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  1/4/2011   
12/14/2010  STA - Statement - Party (A)  12/15/2010   
NOTE: GARNISHEES ANSWER
11/30/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  12/1/2010   
11/18/2010  PPM – Pro Per Motion/Notice/Mail - Party (A)  11/18/2010  Defendant (4)  
11/2/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  11/8/2010   
10/27/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  10/28/2010   
NOTE: UNABLE TO WITHHOLD
10/20/2010  REP - Report - Party (A)  10/24/2010   
NOTE: QUARTERLY / OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR (EARNINGS)
10/5/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  10/19/2010   
9/21/2010  STA - Statement - Party (A)  9/24/2010   
NOTE: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER STATEMENT TO A CONTINUING LIEN
9/8/2010  STA - Statement - Party (A)  9/9/2010   
NOTE: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER / TO A CONTINUING LIEN
8/31/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  9/1/2010   
8/11/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  8/13/2010   
7/28/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party ()  7/30/2010   
7/22/2010  REP - Report - Party (A)  7/28/2010   
NOTE: QUARTERLY / OF JUDGMENT CREDITOR
7/15/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  7/16/2010   
NOTE: STATEMENT TO A CONTINUING LIEN
7/2/2010  STA - Statement - Party (A)  7/7/2010   
NOTE: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER/
6/16/2010  STA - Statement - Party (A)  6/17/2010   
NOTE: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER
6/2/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  6/4/2010   
5/18/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  5/19/2010   
5/11/2010  ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (A)  5/17/2010   
NOTE: OF CONTINUING LIEN
5/5/2010  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party (A)  5/10/2010   
5/4/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  5/6/2010   
4/21/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  4/23/2010   
NOTE: STATEMENT TO A CONTINUING LIEN
4/6/2010  STA - Statement - Party (A)  4/7/2010   
NOTE: OF COSTS
4/6/2010  APL - Application - Party (A)  4/7/2010   
NOTE: FOR ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN
4/6/2010  STA - Statement - Party (A)  4/12/2010   
NOTE: GARNISHEE'S ANSWER / TO A CONTINUING LIEN
3/31/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee - Party (A)  4/1/2010   
3/24/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service - Party (A)  3/25/2010   
NOTE: SERVED 03/16/10
3/24/2010  WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons - Party (A)  3/25/2010   
3/12/2010  APL - Application - Party (A)  3/15/2010   
NOTE: FOR WRIT OF CRIMINAL GARNISHMENT
12/19/2005  DRE - Disposition Report - Party (B)  12/27/2005   
12/21/2004  049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (A)  12/21/2004   
12/21/2004  CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (A)  1/6/2005   
2/9/2001  LET - Letter - Party (B)  3/23/2001   
2/9/2001  LET - Letter - Party (B)  3/23/2001   
2/9/2001  LET - Letter - Party (B)  3/23/2001   
1/22/2001  193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (B)  1/22/2001   
1/18/2001  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (B)  2/20/2001   
1/11/2001  193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (A)  1/11/2001   
1/8/2001  PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)  1/16/2001   
NOTE: RELATED CASE CR97-14651
1/8/2001  NRR - Notice Of Rights Of Review - Party (A)  2/23/2001   
12/27/2000  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (B)  1/3/2001   
12/7/2000  105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)  12/7/2000   
12/7/2000  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (B)  12/7/2000   
12/6/2000  PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)  1/18/2001   
11/16/2000  RES - Response - Party (B)  12/9/2000  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: TO DEF MOTION FOR MODIFICATION OF RELEASE CONDITIONS
11/7/2000  MOT - Motion - Party ()  11/8/2000  Defendant (4)  
NOTE: FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPTS
11/7/2000  MOT - Motion - Party ()  11/8/2000  Defendant (4)  
NOTE: TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING A MOTION FOR A REMAND TO THE GRAND JURY
11/3/2000  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (B)  11/29/2000  Plaintiff (1)  
11/3/2000  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (B)  11/29/2000  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 609
11/3/2000  ALG - Allegation - Party (B)  11/29/2000  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT
10/19/2000  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (B)  10/19/2000   
10/17/2000  194 : Me: Initial Pretrial Conference - Party (A)  10/17/2000   
10/11/2000  098 - ME: Substitution Of Counsel - Party (A)  10/11/2000   
9/22/2000  NWP - Notice Of Witness On Trial Of Prior(s) - Party (B)  10/28/2000  Plaintiff (1)  
9/21/2000  RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party ()  9/21/2000  Plaintiff (1)  
9/20/2000  RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party ()  9/21/2000  Plaintiff (1)  
9/20/2000  OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party ()  9/21/2000  Defendant (3)  
9/20/2000  MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party ()  9/21/2000  Defendant (3)  
9/20/2000  NOT - Notice - Party (B)  10/25/2000  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: OF DISCOVERY
9/14/2000  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (B)  9/28/2000   
9/13/2000  MOT - Motion - Party ()  10/12/2000  Defendant (4)  
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW: CONFLICT OF INTEREST
9/13/2000  ALG - Allegation - Party (A)  10/12/2000  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT
9/13/2000  RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (A)  10/12/2000  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: RULE 609
9/13/2000  ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (A)  10/12/2000  Plaintiff (1)  
9/13/2000  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  10/12/2000  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: OF DISCOVERY
9/8/2000  NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()  9/19/2000  Defendant (3)  
8/30/2000  060 - ME: Case Transfer Cc - Party ()  9/14/2000   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
1/8/2001  8:30   Sentencing. 
1/18/2001  8:30   Sentencing. 
click here for Law Library Resource Center