« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
LINDSTEDT, LISA
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Raul Payan Portillo - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
KIBLER, THOMAS
Judge
Cairo
Case #
CR2000-004645-A
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR2000-004645-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Raul Payan Portillo
Crime Date
3/14/2000
Date
5/22/2000
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3415A (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Raul Payan Portillo
Crime Date
3/14/2000
Date
7/20/2000
Description
NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3408A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2003
Description
MPL - Modification of Probation Level - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/25/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2003
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/3/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
INS ADMINISTRATIVE CASELOAD EXPIRATIONS
Filing Date
9/6/2000
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/3/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2000
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/25/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2000 9:00:00 AM
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/20/2000 9:00:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
7/20/2000
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/8/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELATED CASE CR2000-004992
Filing Date
7/20/2000
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/10/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2000
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/19/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2000
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/14/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2000
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/2/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2000
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/13/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/3/2000
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/26/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/18/2000
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/18/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2000
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/20/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2000
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/5/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $880.00 04/06/00
Filing Date
4/17/2000
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/10/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $885.00 03/14/00
Filing Date
4/17/2000
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/10/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2000
Description
PTR - Pretrial Service Recommendation - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/10/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2000
Description
PBA - Pretrial Srvcs Agency Backgrnd - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/10/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2000
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/10/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2000
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/10/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2000
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/12/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2000
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/11/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2000
Description
INF - Information - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/21/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1: POSS OF NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 4 FEL; CT 2: POSS OF DRUG PARA CL 6 FEL
Filing Date
4/6/2000
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/5/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
3/16/2000
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/17/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1: NARCOTIC DRUGS - POSSESS/USE CL 4 FEL; CT 2: POSSESS DRUG PARAPHERNALIA CL 6 FEL; DOC: ON 03/14/2000
Filing Date
3/16/2000
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/31/2000
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
No records found.