« Return to search results Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Type: Criminal  Location:  Southeast  
Party Information
Party Name - Number Relationship Sex Attorney Judge Case #
State Of Arizona - (1)
 
Plaintiff  N/A   To Be Determined      
David Scott Gingras - (2)
 
Defendant  M   BUDOFF, MARC   Z Unassigned  CR1999-093685-A  
Disposition Information
Party Name ARSCode Description Crime Date Disposition Code Disposition Date
David Scott Gingras  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  3/5/1996  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/1/1999 
David Scott Gingras  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  2/9/1996  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/1/1999 
David Scott Gingras  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  2/9/1996  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/1/1999 
David Scott Gingras  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  2/2/1996  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/1/1999 
David Scott Gingras  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  2/2/1996  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/1/1999 
David Scott Gingras  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  1/21/1996  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/1/1999 
David Scott Gingras  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  6/10/1995  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/1/1999 
David Scott Gingras  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  6/10/1995  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/1/1999 
David Scott Gingras  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  6/10/1995  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/1/1999 
David Scott Gingras  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  6/2/1995  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/1/1999 
David Scott Gingras  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  6/2/1995  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/1/1999 
David Scott Gingras  13-1405 (F6)  SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR  6/2/1995  Dismd Pros Mot  Dismissed By Prosecution Motion  12/1/1999 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
12/13/2001  DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet - Party (A)  12/17/2001   
12/4/2001  LET - Letter - Party (A)  12/6/2001   
11/21/2001  LED - 2.8 (d) Letter - Party (A)  11/27/2001   
7/24/2001  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  7/25/2001   
NOTE: MEMORANDUM DECISON AFFIRMED
7/23/2001  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party (A)  7/25/2001   
7/23/2001  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (A)  7/25/2001   
NOTE: AND MANDATE
7/23/2001  TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)  7/25/2001   
NOTE: TRACI J WEBSTER 11-12-99
2/29/2000  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  3/2/2000   
NOTE: OF COMPLETION OF RECORD OF APPEALS
2/2/2000  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order - Party (A)  2/8/2000   
NOTE: RE TRANSCRIPT OF 11/12/99
2/2/2000  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party (A)  2/8/2000   
1/26/2000  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  1/28/2000   
NOTE: TO COURT REPORTERS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
1/26/2000  REC - Receipt - Party (A)  1/28/2000   
1/4/2000  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)  1/4/2000   
12/28/1999  REQ - Request - Party (A)  12/30/1999  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: FOR PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPT FOR APPEAL
12/28/1999  NAP - Notice Of Appeal - Party (A)  1/6/2000  Plaintiff (1)  
12/8/1999  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (A)  12/14/1999   
11/16/1999  005 - ME: Hearing - Party (A)  11/16/1999   
11/12/1999  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party (A)  11/17/1999   
10/22/1999  REL - Reply - Party (A)  11/4/1999  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: TO STATES RESPONSE TO P2 MOTION TO DISMISS
10/14/1999  NOT - Notice - Party (A)  10/18/1999  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: OF FILING OF AFFIDAVIT
10/13/1999  RES - Response - Party (A)  10/15/1999  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: TO P2S MOTION TO DISMISS
10/2/1999  026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set - Party (A)  10/2/1999   
9/24/1999  MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (A)  9/29/1999  Defendant (2)  
8/17/1999  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence - Party (A)  8/19/1999  Plaintiff (1)  
8/13/1999  152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)  8/17/1999   
8/5/1999  WAV - Waiver - Party (A)  8/20/1999  Defendant (2)  
NOTE: OF PERSONAL APPEARANCE AND ENTRY OF PLEA OF NOT GUILTY
8/4/1999  INF - Information - Party (A)  8/6/1999  Plaintiff (1)  
NOTE: CT 1 THRU 12: SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH A MINOR CL 6 FEL
7/29/1999  COM - Complaint - Party (A)  8/2/1999   
NOTE: CT 1: SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR CL 6 FEL; CT 2: SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR CL 6 FEL; CT 3: SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR CL 6 FEL; CT 4: SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR CL 6 FEL; CT 5: SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR CL 6 FEL
7/29/1999  COM - Complaint - Party (A)  8/2/1999   
NOTE: CT 6: SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR CL 6 FEL; CT 7: SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR CL 6 FEL; CT 8: SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR CL 6 FEL; CT 9: SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR CL 6 FEL; CT 10: SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR CL 6 FEL
7/29/1999  COM - Complaint - Party (A)  8/2/1999   
NOTE: CT 11: SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR CL 6 FEL; CT 12: SEXUAL CONDUCT WITH MINOR CL 6 FEL; DOC: ON 06/02/1995 CR9700438FE
7/29/1999  BIN - Bindover - Party (A)  8/2/1999   
NOTE: RELEASE ORD: O.R. - - WPH/ARR: 07-28-1999/08-05-1999-A; IA: 07-09-1999 DEF ATTY: MARC BUDOFF; TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION-------------------------BEGIN SUPERIOR COURT PLEADINGS-------------------------
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center