Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Boyle, John | ||
Nelson Douglas JohnsonIII - (2) |
Defendant | M | Tellez, Jeff | Gantz | CR1998-012856-A |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Nelson Douglas Johnson III | 13-3102 (F4) | MISCONDUCT INVOLVING WEAPONS | 8/7/1998 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 12/9/1998 |
Nelson Douglas Johnson III | 13-1803A (F6) | UNLAW USE OF MEANS OF TRANSP | 8/7/1998 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 3/31/1999 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
4/11/2007 | PRW = Petition To Revoke Probation - Warrantless Arrest - Party (A) | 4/11/2007 | |
4/6/2007 | 585 - ME: Disp Rev/Doc-Rev Arr/Hrg - Party (A) | 4/6/2007 | |
4/3/2007 | IAD - Initial Appearance Document - Party (A) | 4/17/2007 | |
4/3/2007 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A) | 4/12/2007 | |
4/3/2007 | PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (A) | 4/6/2007 | |
4/3/2007 | OCP-Order of Confinement/Sentence of Imprisonment to ADOC - Party (A) | 4/6/2007 | |
4/19/2005 | REQ - Request - Party (A) | 5/3/2005 | |
NOTE: TO ESTABLISH START DATE OF RESTITUTION, PROBATION SERVICE FEES, FINES AND/OR OTHER FEES | |||
4/1/1999 | 109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (A) | 4/21/1999 | |
3/31/1999 | TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (A) | 4/5/1999 | |
3/31/1999 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A) | 4/8/1999 | |
3/26/1999 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A) | 4/8/1999 | |
2/3/1999 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A) | 2/4/1999 | |
1/11/1999 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A) | 1/14/1999 | |
12/11/1998 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A) | 12/17/1998 | |
12/9/1998 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A) | 1/6/1999 | |
12/7/1998 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A) | 12/22/1998 | |
11/18/1998 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A) | 11/23/1998 | |
10/20/1998 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A) | 10/23/1998 | |
10/5/1998 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A) | 10/7/1998 | |
9/21/1998 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A) | 9/30/1998 | |
NOTE: 090298 BY KIMBERLY D MC ANDREWS | |||
9/18/1998 | NOT - Notice - Party (A) | 10/3/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: OF DISCOVERY | |||
9/18/1998 | ALG - Allegation - Party (A) | 10/3/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: OF FELONY COMMITTED WHILE ON RELEASE/ ENHANCED SENTENCING | |||
9/14/1998 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A) | 9/15/1998 | |
9/14/1998 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A) | 9/15/1998 | |
9/10/1998 | 060 - ME: Case Transfer Cc - Party (A) | 9/21/1998 | |
9/9/1998 | INF - Information - Party (A) | 10/8/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: CT 1: UNLAWFUL USE OF MEANS OF TRANSPORTATION CL 6 FEL; CT 2: MISCONDUCT INVOLVING WEAPONS CL 4 FEL | |||
9/2/1998 | COM - Complaint - Party (A) | 9/10/1998 | |
NOTE: CT 1: UNAUTHORIZED USE OF VEHICLE/TRANSPORTATION CL 6 FEL; CT 2: MISCONDUCT INVOLVING WEAPONS CL 4 FEL; DOC: ON 08/07/1998 | |||
9/2/1998 | BIN - Bindover - Party (A) | 9/10/1998 | |
NOTE: RELEASE ORD: BOND NO BOND SET WPH/ARR: - - /09-11-1998-AIA: 09-02-1998 DEF ATTY: KAREN MARIE A NOBLE ¢PD!; TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION-------------------------BEGIN SUPERIOR COURT PLEADINGS------------------------- |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
4/3/2007 | 11:00 | Probation Revocation Arraignment Hearing |
4/3/2007 | 11:1 | Disposition Hearing |