Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Boyle, John | ||
B Grand Jury - (2) |
Deft Grand Jury | N/A | To Be Determined | ||
Nelson Douglas Johnson - (3) |
Defendant | M | NOBLE, KAREN | Garbarino | CR1998-003113-A |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Nelson Douglas Johnson | 28-661 (F3) | HIT AND RUN W/DEATH/INJURY | 1/31/1998 | Dismissed - Plea Other | Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count | 3/31/1999 |
Nelson Douglas Johnson | 13-1204A (F3) | AGGRAVATED ASSAULT | 1/31/1998 | Pled Guilty As Charged | Pled Guilty As Charged | 12/9/1998 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
5/11/2006 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (A) | 5/11/2006 | |
5/26/1999 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (A) | 5/26/1999 | |
4/21/1999 | MOT - Motion - Party (A) | 4/27/1999 | Defendant (3) |
NOTE: TO CORRECT THE SENTENCE | |||
4/1/1999 | 193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (A) | 4/21/1999 | |
3/31/1999 | PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A) | 4/6/1999 | |
3/31/1999 | NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A) | 4/8/1999 | |
3/26/1999 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A) | 4/8/1999 | |
2/8/1999 | LET - Letter - Party (A) | 2/17/1999 | |
NOTE: RELATED CASE CR98-12856 | |||
2/8/1999 | LET - Letter - Party (A) | 2/17/1999 | |
NOTE: RELATED CASE CR98-12856 | |||
2/3/1999 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A) | 2/4/1999 | |
1/13/1999 | ARC - Adult Probation Request for Continuation - Party (A) | 1/27/1999 | |
NOTE: RELATED CASE CR98-12856 | |||
1/11/1999 | 169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A) | 1/14/1999 | |
12/11/1998 | 105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A) | 12/17/1998 | |
12/9/1998 | PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A) | 1/6/1999 | |
12/7/1998 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A) | 12/22/1998 | |
11/18/1998 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A) | 11/23/1998 | |
10/20/1998 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A) | 10/23/1998 | |
10/5/1998 | 176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A) | 10/8/1998 | |
8/31/1998 | NOT - Notice - Party (A) | 9/15/1998 | Defendant (3) |
NOTE: OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF TRIAL DATE & WAIVER RE: RULE 8 | |||
8/21/1998 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A) | 8/25/1998 | |
7/29/1998 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (A) | 8/5/1998 | |
7/20/1998 | MOT - Motion - Party (A) | 8/5/1998 | Defendant (3) |
NOTE: TO EXTEND TIME FOR MOTIONS AND/OR RESPONSE | |||
6/18/1998 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A) | 6/23/1998 | |
5/5/1998 | 019 - ME: Ruling - Party (A) | 5/12/1998 | |
4/21/1998 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (A) | 4/23/1998 | |
4/20/1998 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A) | 4/24/1998 | Defendant (3) |
4/17/1998 | NOT - Notice - Party (A) | 4/22/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: OF SUPPLEMENTAL WITNESSES AND EXHIBITS | |||
4/16/1998 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A) | 4/22/1998 | Defendant (3) |
4/16/1998 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A) | 4/22/1998 | Defendant (3) |
4/16/1998 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (A) | 4/22/1998 | Defendant (3) |
4/9/1998 | RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A) | 4/17/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/8/1998 | NOT - Notice - Party (A) | 4/16/1998 | Defendant (3) |
NOTE: RULE 15 DISCLOSURE | |||
4/8/1998 | MOT - Motion - Party (A) | 4/16/1998 | Defendant (3) |
NOTE: TO RESERVE RIGHT TO FILE MOTIONS IN LIMINE | |||
4/8/1998 | MOT - Motion - Party (A) | 4/16/1998 | Defendant (3) |
NOTE: TO RESERVE RIGHT TO FILE 12.9 MOTION | |||
4/8/1998 | MOT - Motion - Party (A) | 4/16/1998 | Defendant (3) |
NOTE: TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE OF ALL EVIDENCE FAVORABLE TO DEFENDANT | |||
4/8/1998 | RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A) | 4/17/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/8/1998 | MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party (A) | 4/17/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/8/1998 | OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party (A) | 4/17/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/6/1998 | NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (A) | 4/9/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
4/6/1998 | MOT - Motion - Party (A) | 4/9/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE ADMISSION OF INADMISSIBLE HEARSAY | |||
4/6/1998 | ADN - Allegation of Dangerous Nature Felony - Party (A) | 4/9/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
3/30/1998 | RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (A) | 4/8/1998 | |
3/13/1998 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A) | 3/13/1998 | |
2/27/1998 | IND - Indictment - Party (A) | 3/3/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: CT 1: AGGRAVATED ASSUALT CL 3 FEL; CT 2: LEAVING THE SCENE CL 3 FEL; DR 80173507 PPD DOC: ON OR ABOUT 01-31-98 | |||
2/27/1998 | 606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (A) | 3/3/1998 | |
2/27/1998 | DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A) | 3/3/1998 | |
2/27/1998 | NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (A) | 3/3/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: CT 1-2: R.O.R. |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |