« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Efrain Olivas Guillen - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Likos, James
Judge
Kreamer
Case #
CR1998-001809-A
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1998-001809-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Efrain Olivas Guillen 
Crime Date
10/18/1997
Date
2/22/1999
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3415A (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Efrain Olivas Guillen 
Crime Date
10/18/1997
Date
3/29/1999
Description
NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3408A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2002
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/3/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNDESIGNATED
Filing Date
7/9/1999
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/26/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
6/29/1999
Description
114 - ME: Dispo-Reinstate - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/6/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/1999 9:42:00 AM
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/15/1999 9:42:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
6/15/1999
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/22/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/1999
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/26/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/1999
Description
117 - ME: Guilt New Chg/Prob Violation - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/28/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/1999
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/19/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/1999
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/20/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/1999
Description
111 - ME: Dismisal/Per Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/26/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/1999
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/1/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/1999 9:46:00 AM
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/29/1999 9:46:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
3/29/1999
Description
NRR - Notice Of Rights - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/6/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/1999
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/6/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/23/1999
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/23/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/1999
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/26/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/27/1999
Description
NDP - Notice of Discovery - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/5/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/22/1999
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/27/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/1999
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/3/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $1000 122698
Filing Date
1/22/1999
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/1999
Description
PTR - Pretrial Service Recommendation - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/1999
Description
PBA - Pretrial Srvcs Agency Backgrnd - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/1999
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/22/1999
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/3/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 122698
Filing Date
1/22/1999
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/1999
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/12/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/1999
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/26/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
O.R. 01-6-99
Filing Date
1/7/1999
Description
INF - Information - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/22/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1: POSS OR USE OF NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 4 FEL; CT 2: POSS OF DRUG PARA CL 6 FEL
Filing Date
1/6/1999
Description
WAV - Waiver - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/26/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PRELIMINARY HEARING
Filing Date
9/3/1998
Description
RAW - Request For Arrest Warrant - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/5/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $2000
Filing Date
3/10/1998
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/13/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/1998
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/17/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/1998
Description
SUM - Summons - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/4/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/13/1998
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/19/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/1998
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/6/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1: COCAINE: POSSESS CL 4 FEL; CT 2: POSSESSING DRUG PARAPHERNALIA CL 6 FEL; DOC: ON 10/18/1997
Filing Date
2/5/1998
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/19/1998
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
No records found.