Criminal Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Case Type: | Criminal | Location: | Downtown |
Party Information | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name - Number | Relationship | Sex | Attorney | Judge | Case # |
State Of Arizona - (1) |
Plaintiff | N/A | Eckhardt, Carl | ||
Gary Thomas Kelley - (2) |
Defendant | M | Kamin, Marc | Superior Court | CR1997-007962-A |
Clerk Of The Court - (3) |
In The Matter Of (IMO) | N/A | To Be Determined |
Disposition Information | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Party Name | ARSCode | Description | Crime Date | Disposition Code | Disposition | Date |
Gary Thomas Kelley | 28-692A2 (M1) | DUI W/ BAC OF .10 OR MORE | 3/1/1997 | Guilty By Jury | Guilty By Jury | 1/21/1998 |
Gary Thomas Kelley | 28-692A (M1) | DUI-LIQUOR/DRUGS/VAPORS/COMBO | 3/1/1997 | Guilty By Jury | Guilty By Jury | 1/21/1998 |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/1/2004 | DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet - Party (A) | 10/15/2004 | |
7/13/2004 | LED - 2.8 (d) Letter - Party (A) | 7/28/2004 | |
6/29/1999 | ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (A) | 7/6/1999 | |
6/18/1999 | PTP - Petition Early Termination Probation Order - Party (A) | 6/24/1999 | |
7/7/1998 | PMP - Petition to Modify Condition of Probation/Order - Party (A) | 7/24/1998 | |
2/12/1998 | DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A) | 2/18/1998 | |
2/12/1998 | REP - Report - Party (A) | 2/18/1998 | |
NOTE: ADOT CRT ABSTRACT | |||
2/2/1998 | 088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (A) | 2/6/1998 | |
1/26/1998 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (A) | 1/27/1998 | |
1/26/1998 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (A) | 1/27/1998 | |
1/26/1998 | 092 - ME: Order Releasing Exhibit - Party (A) | 1/28/1998 | |
1/26/1998 | 109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (A) | 1/29/1998 | |
1/22/1998 | 012 - ME: Trial - Party (A) | 1/26/1998 | |
1/21/1998 3:15:00 PM | JOR - Judgment And Order - Party (A) | 1/21/1998 3:15:00 PM | |
NOTE: This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment | |||
1/21/1998 | WSH - Worksheet - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
NOTE: EXHIBIT | |||
1/21/1998 | VER - Verdict - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
1/21/1998 | VER - Verdict - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
NOTE: SIGNED | |||
1/21/1998 | JUR - Jury - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
NOTE: QUESTION | |||
1/21/1998 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
1/21/1998 | VER - Verdict - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
NOTE: UNSIGNED | |||
1/21/1998 | VER - Verdict - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
NOTE: UNSIGNED | |||
1/21/1998 | VER - Verdict - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
NOTE: UNSIGNED | |||
1/21/1998 | VER - Verdict - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
NOTE: UNSIGNED | |||
1/21/1998 | NOT - Notice - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
NOTE: RIGHT TO APPEAL | |||
1/21/1998 | REQ - Request - Party (A) | 1/23/1998 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |||
1/20/1998 | MOT - Motion - Party (A) | 1/23/1998 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: IN LIMINE | |||
1/20/1998 | MOT - Motion - Party (A) | 1/23/1998 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: IN LIMINE | |||
1/20/1998 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (A) | 1/23/1998 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: REQUESTED | |||
1/20/1998 | JUR - Jury - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
NOTE: QUESTION | |||
1/20/1998 | JUR - Jury - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
NOTE: QUESTION | |||
1/20/1998 | STP - Stipulation - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: OF FACT | |||
1/20/1998 | JIN - Jury Instructions - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
1/16/1998 | REQ - Request - Party (A) | 1/22/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: JURY INSTRUCTIONS | |||
1/16/1998 | REQ - Request - Party (A) | 1/22/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: VOIR DIRE | |||
1/16/1998 | JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 - Party (A) | 2/2/1998 | |
1/12/1998 | 088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party (A) | 1/15/1998 | |
1/8/1998 | REQ - Request - Party (A) | 1/13/1998 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS | |||
12/30/1997 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (A) | 1/9/1998 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/25/1997 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (A) | 12/4/1997 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/21/1997 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A) | 12/9/1997 | |
11/20/1997 | MCO - Motion To Continue - Party (A) | 12/4/1997 | Plaintiff (1) |
11/12/1997 | REQ - Request - Party (A) | 11/20/1997 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: FOR DISCOVERY | |||
10/1/1997 | MOT - Motion - Party (A) | 10/7/1997 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: FOR DISCOVERY | |||
10/1/1997 | MOT - Motion - Party (A) | 10/7/1997 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: FOR VOLUNTARINESS HEARING | |||
10/1/1997 | NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party (A) | 10/7/1997 | Defendant (2) |
9/29/1997 | SMO - Stip/Mot/Ord Removal Court Files - Party (A) | 10/4/1997 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: PRELIMINARY HEARING TRANSCRIPTS | |||
9/24/1997 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (A) | 9/27/1997 | |
9/22/1997 | REP - Report - Party (A) | 9/29/1997 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: INITIAL STATUS | |||
9/22/1997 | REP - Report - Party (A) | 9/29/1997 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: INITIAL STATUS | |||
9/4/1997 | 172 - ME: Pretrial Conference Reset - Party (A) | 9/10/1997 | |
9/2/1997 | REP - Report - Party (A) | 9/4/1997 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: INITIAL STATUS | |||
8/21/1997 | SMO - Stip/Mot/Ord Removal Court Files - Party (A) | 8/22/1997 | Defendant (2) |
NOTE: PRELIMINARY HRG TRANSCRIPT | |||
8/7/1997 | SMO - Stip/Mot/Ord Removal Court Files - Party (A) | 8/13/1997 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: PRELIMINARY HEARING TRANSCRIPT | |||
8/4/1997 | NOT - Notice - Party (A) | 8/6/1997 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: DISCOVERY | |||
7/28/1997 | 152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A) | 7/28/1997 | |
7/24/1997 | INF - Information - Party (A) | 7/28/1997 | Plaintiff (1) |
NOTE: CTS 1,2: AGG DRIVING OR ACTUAL PHYSICAL CONTROL WHILE UNDER THE INFLUENCE OF; INTOXICATING LIQUOR OR DRUGS CL 4 FEL | |||
7/24/1997 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A) | 7/30/1997 | |
NOTE: 7-17-97 BY PATRICIA E LANDAU | |||
7/18/1997 | COM - Complaint - Party (A) | 7/23/1997 | |
NOTE: CTS 1,2: AGG DUI CL 4 FEL; CR 97-01316 FE DOC: ON OR ABT 3/1/97 | |||
7/18/1997 | BIN - Bindover - Party (A) | 7/23/1997 | |
NOTE: WPH/ARR: 7/17/97 / 7/25/97 REL ORD: SUPERVISED RELEASE 6/30/97; DEF ATTY: MARC KAMIN IA: 6/30/97; TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION-------------------------BEGIN SUPERIOR CRT PLEADINGS--------------------------- | |||
7/3/1997 | WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (A) | 7/25/1997 | |
NOTE: SERVED 06-30-97 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |