« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
AINLEY, MARK
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Raul Portillo Ruellas - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Rock, Roger
Judge
Myers
Case #
CR1997-006922-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Raul Portillo Ruellas
Crime Date
6/11/1997
Date
10/28/1997
Description
DRUG PARAPHERNALIA-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3415A (F6)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Raul Portillo Ruellas
Crime Date
6/11/1997
Date
9/23/1997
Description
NARC DRUG-TRANSP AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3408A7 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/1997
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/2/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/1997
Description
193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/10/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/24/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
9/29/1997
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/8/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1997
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/6/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/1997
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/26/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/1997
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/2/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/18/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF DEFENSES
Filing Date
7/17/1997
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/22/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/1997
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/18/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
NO BOND 07-15-97
Filing Date
7/3/1997
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/15/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/1997
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/9/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPANISH
Filing Date
7/1/1997
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/8/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO REVOKE DEF RELEASE
Filing Date
6/30/1997
Description
LWE - List Of Witnesses/Exhibits - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/7/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/30/1997
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/7/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF FELONY COMMITTED WHILE ON RELEASE/ENHANCED SENTENCING
Filing Date
6/30/1997
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/7/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/27/1997
Description
INF - Information - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/2/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1: POSS OF NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 4 FEL; CT 2: POSS OF DRUG PARA CL 6 FEL
Filing Date
6/24/1997
Description
COM - Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/26/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT 1: POSS NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 4 FEL; CT 2: POSS DRUG PARA CL 6 FEL; CR97-02439 FE DOC: ON OR ABT 06/11/97
Filing Date
6/24/1997
Description
BIN - Bindover - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/26/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
WPH/ARR: 06/20/97/06/30/97 REL ORD: $1,600; DEF ATTY: ROGER BAEURLE IA: 06/12/97; TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION----------------------------BEGIN SUPERIOR CRT PLEADINGS------------------------
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
No records found.