« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Koplow, Lawrence
Judge
Case #
Party Name
B Grand Jury - (2)
Relationship
Deft Grand Jury
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Raul Portillo Ruellas - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Rock, Roger
Judge
Myers
Case #
CR1997-003090-C
Party Name
Manuel Banda - (4)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
MICHAELSEN, ALWIN
Judge
Myers
Case #
CR1997-003090-D
Party Name
Hector Octavio Hernandez - (5)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Babbitt, Charles
Judge
Myers
Case #
CR1997-003090-A
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (6)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1997-003090-A
Party Name
Jesus Valente Mendoza - (7)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Vanwert, Ronald
Judge
Green
Case #
CR1997-003090-B
Disposition Information
Party Name
Hector Octavio Hernandez 
Crime Date
8/6/1996
Date
10/23/1997
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - NARC DRUG-TRANSP AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3408A7 (F3)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Party Name
Jesus Valente Mendoza 
Crime Date
8/23/1996
Date
1/4/2007
Description
NARCOTIC DRUG VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3408 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Jesus Valente Mendoza 
Crime Date
8/23/1996
Date
1/4/2007
Description
NARCOTIC DRUG VIOLATION
ARSCode
13-3408 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismd Pros Mot
Disposition
Dismissed By Prosecution Motion
Party Name
Raul Portillo Ruellas 
Crime Date
8/23/1996
Date
10/28/1997
Description
NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3408A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Raul Portillo Ruellas 
Crime Date
8/23/1996
Date
9/23/1997
Description
NARC DRUG-TRANSP AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3408A7 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Manuel Banda 
Crime Date
8/22/1996
Date
9/23/1997
Description
NARC DRUG-TRANSP AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3408A7 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2009
Description
PDP - Petition to Dismiss Petition to Revoke Probation/Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/29/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT 1
Filing Date
10/26/2009
Description
PVW - Probation Violation Bench Warrant - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/27/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
QUASHED 10/21/09
Filing Date
10/22/2009
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/22/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2009
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2007
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party (B)
Docket Date
1/8/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/8/2007
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal - Party (B)
Docket Date
1/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
12/26/2006
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (B)
Docket Date
1/2/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
QUASHED 12-21-06
Filing Date
12/18/2006
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss - Party (B)
Docket Date
12/26/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND QUASH WARRANT/SUMMONS
Filing Date
11/6/2002
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party ()
Docket Date
11/20/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
INS ADMINISTRATIVE CASELOAD EXPIRATIONS
Filing Date
5/2/2001
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (B)
Docket Date
5/9/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/6/2001
Description
195 - ME: Bond Forfeited - Party ()
Docket Date
4/6/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2001 2:02:00 PM
Description
JUD - Judgment - Party (B)
Docket Date
4/2/2001 2:02:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Forfeiture - This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
3/22/2001
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (B)
Docket Date
3/22/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2001
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (B)
Docket Date
2/14/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2001
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (B)
Docket Date
1/11/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2000
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
1/13/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
RULE 15 DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR REBUTTAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
12/15/2000
Description
NDD - Notice of Discovery Disclosure/Witness/Interviews - Party (B)
Docket Date
1/11/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/13/2000
Description
RTR - Return Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
Filing Date
12/12/2000
Description
MTR - Motion for Temporary Removal Of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibit - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
Filing Date
12/12/2000
Description
OFT - Order for Temporary Removal of Court File/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
Filing Date
12/12/2000
Description
RRF - Release Receipt For Official Court Files/Transcripts/Exhibits - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
Filing Date
12/11/2000
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (B)
Docket Date
12/12/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2000
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (B)
Docket Date
12/19/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2000
Description
BON - Bond - Party (B)
Docket Date
12/13/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAPER/SURETY $2500 AMWEST SURETY INS CO
Filing Date
12/6/2000
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (B)
Docket Date
1/11/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $2500 11-25-00
Filing Date
12/6/2000
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (B)
Docket Date
1/11/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2000
Description
PTR - Pretrial Service Recommendation - Party (B)
Docket Date
1/11/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2000
Description
PBA - Pretrial Srvcs Agency Backgrnd - Party (B)
Docket Date
1/11/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2000
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party (B)
Docket Date
1/11/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2000
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (B)
Docket Date
1/11/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2000
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (B)
Docket Date
12/8/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2000
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (B)
Docket Date
11/28/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 5,6 BOND $1600 SERVED 11-25-2000
Filing Date
8/20/1999
Description
LET - Letter - Party (D)
Docket Date
8/27/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELATED CASES CR97-07455 CR97-07365
Filing Date
6/22/1998
Description
PVW - Probation Violation Bench Warrant - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/8/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/1998
Description
LET - Letter - Party (D)
Docket Date
2/12/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELATED CASE #CR97-07365
Filing Date
1/30/1998
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/3/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/1997
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (C)
Docket Date
1/6/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/1997
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (D)
Docket Date
1/6/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/1997
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/9/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/1997
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (D)
Docket Date
11/24/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/1997 9:18:00 AM
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/18/1997 9:18:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
11/18/1997
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/11/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/12/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
11/12/1997
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (D)
Docket Date
11/24/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/1997
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (D)
Docket Date
11/28/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (D)
Docket Date
12/12/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
11/5/1997
Description
193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (C)
Docket Date
11/10/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/1997
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/31/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/1997
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (C)
Docket Date
11/12/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (C)
Docket Date
11/24/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
10/23/1997
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/31/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/1997
Description
LET - Letter - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/6/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/1997
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/6/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
INITIAL
Filing Date
9/29/1997
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/3/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/1997
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (D)
Docket Date
10/7/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1997
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/6/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1997
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (D)
Docket Date
10/6/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/1997
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (C)
Docket Date
9/26/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/1997
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/26/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/1997
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (D)
Docket Date
9/26/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/1997
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
9/3/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW CONFLICT OF INTEREST
Filing Date
8/27/1997
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (C)
Docket Date
9/2/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/1997
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (C)
Docket Date
8/22/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/1997
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (D)
Docket Date
8/12/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/1997
Description
SMO - Stip/Mot/Ord Removal Court Files - Party ()
Docket Date
8/13/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT
Filing Date
8/1/1997
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party ()
Docket Date
8/5/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF FELONY COMMITTED WHILE ON RELEASE/ENHANCED SENTENCING
Filing Date
8/1/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (D)
Docket Date
8/5/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
8/1/1997
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (D)
Docket Date
8/5/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO REVOKE DEFENDANT'S RELEASE
Filing Date
8/1/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/5/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
7/24/1997
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
7/25/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/1997
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/25/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $1,600.00 07-15-97
Filing Date
7/22/1997
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/25/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/1997
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/25/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRIOR CONVICTIONS
Filing Date
7/22/1997
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/25/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/1997
Description
PBA - Pretrial Srvcs Agency Backgrnd - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/25/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/1997
Description
PTR - Pretrial Service Recommendation - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/25/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/1997
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/25/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/1997
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/25/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/1997
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/22/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/1997
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/17/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1 BOND $1,600 SERVED 07/15/97
Filing Date
7/10/1997
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (D)
Docket Date
7/11/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/1997
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (D)
Docket Date
7/16/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/1997
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (D)
Docket Date
7/16/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $1600 6/22/97
Filing Date
7/10/1997
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (D)
Docket Date
7/16/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/1997
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/15/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/1997
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (D)
Docket Date
7/9/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
SPANISH
Filing Date
6/30/1997
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/2/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/30/1997
Description
LWE - List Of Witnesses/Exhibits - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/2/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/27/1997
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/1/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPERVISED RELEASE 6-14-97
Filing Date
6/27/1997
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/1/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/1997
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/1/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/1997
Description
PTR - Pretrial Service Recommendation - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/1/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/1997
Description
PBA - Pretrial Srvcs Agency Backgrnd - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/1/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/1997
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/1/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/1997
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/1/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/1997
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (C)
Docket Date
6/26/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/1997
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (D)
Docket Date
6/24/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 4: BOND $1600 SERVED 6/22/97
Filing Date
6/23/1997
Description
PSS - PSA Supervised Release - Party (C)
Docket Date
6/26/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/1997
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (C)
Docket Date
6/17/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 2, 3 BOND $5,600 I/C 06/13/97
Filing Date
3/24/1997
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (C)
Docket Date
6/17/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1: SALE OF NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 2 FEL (A); CT 2: SALE OF NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 2 FEL (C); CT 3: POSS OF NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 4 FEL (C); CT 4: SALE OF NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 2 FEL (D); CTS 5-6: SALE OF NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 2 FEL (B)
Filing Date
3/24/1997
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
6/17/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
DOC: ON OR BTWN 08/06/96-08/23/96 DR61263019/61233262 PPD
Filing Date
3/24/1997
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (C)
Docket Date
6/17/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/1997
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (D)
Docket Date
6/24/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/24/1997
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (D)
Docket Date
6/24/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/1997
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/17/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/24/1997
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/17/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/1997
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (B)
Docket Date
11/28/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/24/1997
Description
604 - ME: GJ True Bill/Warrant Issue - Party ()
Docket Date
11/28/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/1997
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (B)
Docket Date
11/28/2000
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/8/2001
Time
9:00
Event
Initial Pretrial Conference
Date
1/8/2001
Time
9:1
Event
Bench Warrant Issued