« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
AINLEY, MARK
Judge
Case #
Party Name
B Grand Jury - (2)
Relationship
Deft Grand Jury
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Raul Portillo Ruellas - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Rock, Roger
Judge
Myers
Case #
CR1996-009348-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Raul Portillo Ruellas
Crime Date
8/20/1996
Date
10/28/1997
Description
NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3408A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Raul Portillo Ruellas
Crime Date
8/20/1996
Date
10/28/1997
Description
NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3408A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Raul Portillo Ruellas
Crime Date
8/20/1996
Date
10/28/1997
Description
NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS FOR SALE
ARSCode
13-3408A2 (F2)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Raul Portillo Ruellas
Crime Date
8/20/1996
Date
9/23/1997
Description
NARC DRUG-TRANSP AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3408A7 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2001
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/29/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
$70 TO DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Filing Date
11/24/1997
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/2/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/5/1997
Description
193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/10/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/24/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
9/29/1997
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/8/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1997
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/7/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/1997
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/26/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/1997
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/24/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
$800 TO RFR
Filing Date
9/3/1997
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/5/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
I/C 8-28-97
Filing Date
8/27/1997
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/2/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/1997
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/22/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/1997
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/15/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/30/1997 2:00:00 PM
Description
JUD - Judgment - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/30/1997 2:00:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Forfeiture - This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
7/30/1997
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/1/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/1997
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/25/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO DETERMINE COUNSEL RELATED CASES CR97-03090, CR97-07455 AND CR97-07365
Filing Date
7/22/1997
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/25/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO DETERMINE COUNSEL RELATED CASES CR97-03090, CR97-07455 AND CR97-07365
Filing Date
7/22/1997
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/25/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO DETERMINE COUNSEL RELATED CASES CR97-03090, CR97-07455 AND CR97-07365
Filing Date
7/22/1997
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/25/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO DETERMINE COUNSEL RELATED CASES CR97-03090, CR97-07455 AND CR97-07365
Filing Date
7/17/1997
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/22/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/1997
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/18/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/1997
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/18/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/1/1997
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/11/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/1997
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/7/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/1997
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/3/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/1997
Description
SMO - Stip/Mot/Ord Removal Court Files - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/1/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPT
Filing Date
2/26/1997
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/28/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO DISCLOSE SPECIFIC ITEMS OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
2/26/1997
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/28/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
VOLUNTARINESS
Filing Date
2/25/1997
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/28/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/24/1997
Description
LWE - List Of Witnesses/Exhibits - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/27/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/19/1997
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/26/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 2-11-97
Filing Date
2/14/1997
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/19/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/1997
Description
INA - Initial Appearance On Bench Warrant - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/24/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/1997
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment Of Court Interpreter - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/24/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/1997
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/24/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 02-11-97
Filing Date
2/14/1997
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/24/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/1997
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/24/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEC/APP BOND $800 02-13-97
Filing Date
10/3/1996
Description
163 - ME: Arraign/Vacate/Bench Warr - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/9/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/1996
Description
TRM - Transmittal - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/10/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
REL ORD/BOND $70. 8-23-96 ORD RE COUNSEL/PUB DEF; PSA RECOMMENDATION PSA BACKGROUND INFO; PSA FINANCIAL INFO RELEASE QUESTIONAIRE
Filing Date
9/20/1996
Description
173 - ME: Arraignment Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/25/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/1996
Description
ASI - Amended Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/23/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1 RELEASED O.R.; CTS 2,3,4 N/I
Filing Date
9/18/1996
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/15/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMT $70 CASH BOND TRANSFER
Filing Date
9/9/1996
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/11/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1-3: SALE OF NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 2 FEL; CT 4: POSSESSION OF NARCOTIC DRUGS FOR SALE CL 2 FEL; DR 61347753 PPD DOC: ON OR ABT 08-20-96
Filing Date
9/9/1996
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/11/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/1996
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/11/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/1996
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/11/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1-4 REL O/R
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
No records found.