« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Attorney, County
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mark A Curtis - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Nickerson, Darius
Judge
Boyle
Case #
CR1996-003120-A
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1996-003120-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark A Curtis
Crime Date
3/14/1996
Date
4/2/1996
Description
CRIMINAL TRESPASS 1ST DEG
ARSCode
13-1504 (F6)
Disposition Code
Pled to Reduced Charge
Disposition
Pled Guilty To Reduced Charge
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/1999
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/10/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/1999 1:37:00 PM
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/9/1999 1:37:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
8/9/1999
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/23/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/1996
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/1/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED
Filing Date
10/8/1996
Description
114 - ME: Dispo-Reinstate - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/11/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/1996
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/11/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/1996
Description
APA - Appearance - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/21/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA ON PROBATION REVOCATION
Filing Date
10/3/1996
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/21/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/1996
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/16/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/1996
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/31/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
9/30/1996
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/21/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/1996
Description
PVW - Probation Violation Bench Warrant - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/11/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1996
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/19/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/1996
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/13/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/1996
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/9/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
8/7/1996
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/11/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/1996
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/13/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/1996
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/15/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/1996
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/19/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/1996
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/24/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE FAILURE TO APPEAR
Filing Date
5/7/1996
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/20/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM APO RE FAILURE TO APPEAR
Filing Date
5/2/1996
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/6/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/1996
Description
102 - ME: Waiver Prelim Hrg/Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/3/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/1996
Description
INF - Information - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/11/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
BURGLARY CL 3 FEL
Filing Date
3/26/1996
Description
COM - Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/27/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
BURGLARY A CL 3 FEL; DR60-420658 PPD CR96-01092FE DOC: ON OR ABOUT 3-14-96
Filing Date
3/26/1996
Description
BIN - Bindover - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/27/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
WPH-ARR: 3-22-96/4-2-96 REL ORD: SUPERVISED REL 3-22-96; DEF ATTY: DARIUS NICKERSON CO ATTY: JON WEISS; IA: 3-14-96 TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION--------------------------BEGIN SUPERIOR CT PLEADINGS---------------------------
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
No records found.