« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Carrigan, Carol
Judge
ZZ CR Admin
Case #
CR1995-003433-A
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (3)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1995-003433-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis
Crime Date
8/15/1994
Date
4/27/1995
Description
NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3408A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis
Crime Date
8/15/1994
Date
5/25/1995
Description
THEFT
ARSCode
13-1802 (F3)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2000
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/22/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2000 1:30:00 PM
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/21/2000 1:30:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
3/21/1997
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/28/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/1997
Description
016 - ME: Ext/Time/Filing Granted - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/21/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/1997
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/13/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO NOTICE OF COMPLETE PCR FILE REVIEW
Filing Date
11/25/1996
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/29/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1996
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/17/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED
Filing Date
9/20/1996
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/20/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF FILING NOTICE OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
9/19/1996
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/20/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
9/11/1996
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/26/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REVOKE PROBATION WARRANTLESS ARREST
Filing Date
9/10/1996
Description
115 - ME: Dispo-Revoke/Prison (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/17/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/1996
Description
PVR - Probation Violation Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/19/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELATED CASE: CR94-08565
Filing Date
9/6/1996
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/26/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RIGHTS OF REVIEW AFTER CONVICTIONS AND PROCEDURE
Filing Date
8/30/1996
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/9/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/1996
Description
113 - ME: Violation Hearing - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/12/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/1996
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/30/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/1996
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/17/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/1996
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/2/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/1996
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/21/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/1996
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/7/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/1995
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/6/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/1995
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/27/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO DISMISS PET FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
8/11/1995
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/14/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PREPARATION OF PCR RECORD
Filing Date
8/3/1995
Description
129 – ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Retained re: plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/9/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/1995
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/21/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF FILING NOT OF PCR
Filing Date
7/17/1995
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/18/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF PREPARATION OF PCR RECORD
Filing Date
7/17/1995
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/18/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF PCR
Filing Date
7/13/1995
Description
099 - ME: Withdrawal Of Counsel - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/17/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/1995
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/24/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/1995
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/19/1995
Filing Party
In The Matter Of (IMO)(3)
NOTE:
FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
5/25/1995 11:35:00 AM
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/25/1995 11:35:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
5/25/1995
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/19/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
5/1/1995
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/3/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/1995
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/2/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/1995
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/22/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/1995
Description
COM - Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/14/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT 1: THEFT CL 3 FEL; CT 2: POSSESSION OF A NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 4 FEL; DOC: BETWEEN 8/15/94 AND 8/18/94 DR 40891003/40903382 PPD CR94-01896FE
Filing Date
4/13/1995
Description
BIN - Bindover - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/14/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUSTICE COURT PLEADINGS; WPH-ARR: 4/18/95 / 4/3/95 ARREST WARRANT-I/C 3/23/95; RELEASE ORD: BOND $3000 3/24/95 IA: 3/24/95; CO ATTY: DANIEL TERRELL DEF ATTY: JAMES HAZEL; TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
4/13/1995
Description
BIN - Bindover - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/14/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
--------------------------BEGIN SUPERIOR CT PLEADINGS---------------------------
Filing Date
4/12/1995
Description
REP - Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/5/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
INFORMATION; CT 1 THEFT CL 3 FEL; CT 2 POSSESS/NARCOTIC DRUG CL 4 FEL
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
No records found.