« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
Party Name
B Grand Jury - (2)
Relationship
Deft Grand Jury
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis - (3)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Carrigan, Carol
Judge
ZZ CR Admin
Case #
CR1994-008565-A
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1994-008565-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
9/20/1994
Date
5/25/1995
Description
ESCAPE 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-2503 (F5)
Disposition Code
Dismissed - Plea Other
Disposition
Dismissed Due To Plea On Other Count
Party Name
Mark Anthony Curtis 
Crime Date
9/20/1994
Date
4/27/1995
Description
NARC DRUG-TRANSP AND/OR SELL
ARSCode
13-3408A7 (F2)
Disposition Code
Pled Guilty As Charged
Disposition
Pled Guilty As Charged
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2000
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/22/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2000 1:30:00 PM
Description
CRR - Criminal Restitution Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/21/2000 1:30:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
3/21/1997
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/28/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/1997
Description
018 - ME: Findings Of Fact And Conclusion Of Law - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/21/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/1997
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/13/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO NOTICE OF COMPLETE PCR FILE REVIEW
Filing Date
2/10/1997
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/25/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF COMPLETE PCR FILE REVIEW/ MOTION FOR EXTENSION
Filing Date
1/13/1997
Description
TRN - Transcript - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/11/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
8-6-96
Filing Date
12/18/1996
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/16/1997
Filing Party
NOTE:
9/6/96 TIA VAN ZANDT RELATED CASE;CR95-03433
Filing Date
11/25/1996
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/29/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/1996
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/11/1996
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOT FOR PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPTS/MOT FOR EXTENSION
Filing Date
11/4/1996
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/23/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPTS / FOR EXTENSION
Filing Date
9/20/1996
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/20/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF FILING NOTICE OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
9/20/1996
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/28/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED
Filing Date
9/19/1996
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/20/1996
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
9/12/1996
Description
APA - Appearance - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/27/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
IA ON PROBATION REVOCATION REL CASE:CR95-03433
Filing Date
9/12/1996
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/27/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
REL CASE:CR95-03433
Filing Date
9/10/1996
Description
115 - ME: Dispo-Revoke/Prison (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/16/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/1996
Description
PTT - Petition - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/26/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REVOKE PROBATION/WARRANTLESS ARREST
Filing Date
9/6/1996
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/26/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
8/30/1996
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/9/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/1996
Description
113 - ME: Violation Hearing - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/12/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/1996
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/30/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/1996
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/17/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/1996
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/2/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/1996
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/21/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/1996
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/7/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/1995
Description
ORD - Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/28/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
MODIFYING THE CONDITION OF PROBATION AS RECOMMEDED
Filing Date
9/29/1995
Description
167 - ME: Pcr Dismissed - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/2/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/1995
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/6/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOT TO DISMISS PET FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
9/14/1995
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/27/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO DISMISS PET FOR POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
8/25/1995
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/8/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO REQUEST FOR PREPARATION OF POST CONVICTION RELEF RECORD REL CASE:CR95-03433
Filing Date
8/11/1995
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/14/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PREPARATION OF PCR RECORD
Filing Date
8/3/1995
Description
129 – ME: PCR: Initiated/Atty Retained re: plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/4/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/1995
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/21/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF FILING NOTICE OF PCR
Filing Date
7/17/1995
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/18/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR PREPARATION OF PCR RECORD
Filing Date
7/17/1995
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/18/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF PCR
Filing Date
6/13/1995
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/24/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/1995
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/13/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/1995
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/2/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/1995
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/6/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/1995
Description
LET - Letter - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/20/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/1995 11:35:00 AM
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/25/1995 11:35:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
5/25/1995
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/20/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
5/19/1995
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/17/1995
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR CHANGE OF COUNSEL REL CASE:CR95-03433
Filing Date
5/1/1995
Description
065 - ME: Order Exonerating Bond - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/3/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/1995
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change Of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/3/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/1995
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/24/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/1995
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/10/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXONERATION OF BOND
Filing Date
3/10/1995
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/16/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/1995
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/15/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/1995
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/14/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/1995
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/19/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/1994
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/16/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/1994
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/16/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/1994
Description
005 - ME: Hearing - Party (A)
Docket Date
12/2/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/1994
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/22/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/1994
Description
BON - Bond - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/22/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
$2800 INTERNATIONAL FIDELITY
Filing Date
11/3/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/7/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY, INTERVIEWS & PLEA OFFER
Filing Date
11/3/1994
Description
REQ - Request - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/7/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
11/3/1994
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/7/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF HISTORICAL PRIORS
Filing Date
11/3/1994
Description
ALG - Allegation - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/7/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF OFFENSES COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO ARS 13-604.O2
Filing Date
10/31/1994
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/7/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/1994
Description
RES - Response - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/31/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
MOTION FOR RELEASE
Filing Date
10/14/1994
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/20/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO REL DEF ON O/R OR IN ALTERNATIVE REDUCE BOND OR REL DEF TO 3RD PARTY CUSTODY
Filing Date
10/11/1994
Description
TRM - Transmittal - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/13/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
REL ORD BOND 2800 9-21-94 ORD RE COUNSEL PUB DEF; PSA RECOMMENDATION PSA BACKGROUND INFO; PSA PRIOR CONVICTIONS PSA FINANCIAL INFO; REL QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
10/11/1994
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/19/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/1994
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/4/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/3/1994
Description
NSI - Notice of Supervening Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/4/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1,2 BOND $2800 NOT POSTED
Filing Date
9/30/1994
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/4/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1 SALE OF NARCOTIC DRUG CL 2 FEL; CT 2 ESCAPE CL 5 FEL; DR 41092925 PPD/DOC 9/20/94
Filing Date
9/30/1994
Description
606 - ME: GJ Not/Supervening Indictment - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/4/1994
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
No records found.