« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Allan Henry - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
ZZ CR Admin
Case #
CR1990-004521-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
Allan Henry
Crime Date
12/29/1989
Date
Description
ATTEMPT TO COMMIT - NARCOTIC DRUG-POSSESS/USE
ARSCode
13-3408A1 (F4)
Disposition Code
Disposition
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/1991
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (A)
Docket Date
3/25/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/5/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/1991
Description
SUB - Subpoena - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/5/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/31/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/5/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
REL ORDER-SUPERVISED REL-110291 ORDER RE COUNSEL-PVT; RECCOMMENDATION BACKGROUND INFO; FINANCIAL INFO WARR ARREST-SERVED; REL QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
1/31/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/5/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
BENC WARR-SERVED REL QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
1/31/1991
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/5/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUB DEF
Filing Date
1/31/1991
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/5/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEC APP BOND $1050-012291
Filing Date
1/31/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/5/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
REL ORDER-SUPERVISED REL 123089 ORDER RE COUNSEL-PUB DEF; RECCOMMENDATION BACKGROUND INFO; FINANCIAL INFO REL QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
1/30/1991
Description
323 - ME: Tasc Deferral - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/31/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/1991
Description
WPH - Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/1/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/1/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/1991
Description
INF - Information - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/1/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
ATTEMPTED POSSESESION/NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 5 FEL
Filing Date
1/30/1991
Description
ROR - Release Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
2/1/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPERVISED REL-013091
Filing Date
1/29/1991
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (A)
Docket Date
1/30/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED
Filing Date
11/19/1990
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/23/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/1990
Description
WAR - Warrant For Arrest - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/7/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 11/2/90
Filing Date
4/23/1990
Description
DCO - Direct Complaint - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/23/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
ATTEMPTED POSSESSION OF NARCOTIC DRUGS CL 5 FEL; 89-194005 PPD EAST PHX I - DOC: 12/29/89
Filing Date
4/23/1990
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
4/23/1990
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
No records found.