« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
Cappellini, Jeffrey
Judge
Case #
Party Name
PAUL MICHAEL NELSON - (2)
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
Greer, Nora
Judge
Dunne
Case #
CR1988-004238-A
Disposition Information
Party Name
PAUL MICHAEL NELSON
Crime Date
4/19/1988
Date
9/2/1988
Description
ARSON OF STRUCTURE/PROPERTY
ARSCode
13-1703A (F4)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Party Name
PAUL MICHAEL NELSON
Crime Date
4/19/1988
Date
9/2/1988
Description
BURGLARY 2ND DEGREE
ARSCode
13-1507 (F3)
Disposition Code
Guilty By Jury
Disposition
Guilty By Jury
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2017
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail - Party ()
Docket Date
3/29/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2017
Description
OSJ - Order re: Setting Aside Judgment of Guilt - Party ()
Docket Date
3/10/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTED CIVIL RIGHTS/GRANTED GUN RIGHTS
Filing Date
1/24/2017
Description
CFI - Criminal Financial Information Worksheet - Party ()
Docket Date
1/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Criminal Financial Information Worksheet
Filing Date
1/11/2017
Description
ASJ - Application to Set aside Judgment / Dismiss Charges - Party ()
Docket Date
1/11/2017
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO RESTORE CIVIL RIGHTS/RESTORE GUN RIGHTS
Filing Date
6/25/1993
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
6/25/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
REL CASE: CR91-91346
Filing Date
5/18/1993
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
5/19/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR WAIVER OF FEES & COSTS,SERVICE OF PROCESS COSTS OR PUBLICATION COSTS
Filing Date
5/18/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
5/19/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER OR DEFERRALOF FEES & COSTS;SUPPLEMENTL INFOR FOR WAIVER/DEFERRAL OF SERV
Filing Date
10/20/1992
Description
ODP - Order of Discharge of Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
10/22/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEF IS HEREBY DISCHARGED FROM PROBATION IN THIS CAUSE
Filing Date
10/7/1991
Description
PMC - Petition Mod Cond/Reg Of Prob - Party ()
Docket Date
10/17/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/1991
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party ()
Docket Date
10/2/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/1991
Description
182 - ME: Disposition Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
9/17/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/1991
Description
NRA - Notice Of Right To Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
9/23/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/1991
Description
TOP - Terms and Conditions Of Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
9/26/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/1991
Description
117 - ME: Guilt New Chg/Prob Violation - Party ()
Docket Date
8/16/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/1991
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party ()
Docket Date
7/18/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/1991
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
7/2/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/1991
Description
RQU - Release Questionnaire - Party ()
Docket Date
6/28/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/1991
Description
IAP - Initial Appearance Probation Revocation - Party ()
Docket Date
6/28/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/1991
Description
PET - Petition - Party ()
Docket Date
6/28/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/1991
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party ()
Docket Date
6/13/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/1991
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party ()
Docket Date
6/13/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/1991
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
6/10/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/1991
Description
MRD - Motion to Release Defendant on Own Recognizance, Reduce Bond and/or Release to a Third Party - Party ()
Docket Date
6/10/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/1991
Description
PET - Petition - Party ()
Docket Date
5/30/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REVOKE PROBATION
Filing Date
5/23/1991
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party ()
Docket Date
5/31/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/1991
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party ()
Docket Date
3/22/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
FROM ADULT PROB TO JUDGE
Filing Date
2/28/1990
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
3/1/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERT COPY OF CT OF APPEALS ORD & MANDATE AFFIRMING JUDGMENT & SENTENCE
Filing Date
2/28/1990
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal - Party ()
Docket Date
3/1/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/1989
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
4/10/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING PUB DEFENDER'S OFFICE TO WITHDRAW AS ATTY OF RECORD FOR DEF/ & APPT-; ATTY- GEORGE STERLING AS COUNSEL FOR DEF
Filing Date
1/19/1989
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
1/25/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLETION OF RECORD
Filing Date
1/17/1989
Description
APW - Appeals Worksheet - Party ()
Docket Date
1/20/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/1989
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party ()
Docket Date
1/12/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
12/23/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/1988
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
12/20/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/1988
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
12/19/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING OF REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPTS
Filing Date
12/13/1988
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/1988
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
12/15/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/1988
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
12/13/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/1988
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings - Party ()
Docket Date
12/6/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
DATED: 8/31/88 - VOLUNTARINESS HEARING
Filing Date
11/17/1988
Description
AGR - Atty General Receipt Of Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
11/21/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/1988
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
11/21/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/1988
Description
DCR - Defense Counsel Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
11/22/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/1988
Description
CCT - Certificate Of Certification - Party ()
Docket Date
11/17/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
11/17/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
11/17/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/1988
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
11/17/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
11/2/1988
Description
DRE - Disposition Report - Party ()
Docket Date
11/8/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
10/27/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
WORK FURLOUGH PRESENTENCE SCREENING
Filing Date
10/25/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
10/27/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL
Filing Date
10/24/1988
Description
NRA - Notice Of Right To Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
10/25/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/1988
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
10/31/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
JURY VERDICT GUILTY CT 1 BURGLARY 2ND DEG CL 3/ CT 2 ARSON OF UNOCCUPIED; STRUCTURE CL 4 FEL ASSESSMENT $100 @ $10 PER MO; PROB 4 YRS BEGIN ALL PYMTS 1/1/89; 40 DAYS COUNTY JAIL BOND EXONERATED; PROB FEE $30 PER MO
Filing Date
10/24/1988
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
10/27/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/1988
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
10/25/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
DATED: 10/19/88
Filing Date
10/24/1988
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party ()
Docket Date
10/24/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
10/24/1988
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions Of Probation/Money Ordered - Party ()
Docket Date
10/24/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
10/3/1988
Description
176 - ME: Continuance - Party ()
Docket Date
10/11/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/1988
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO AMEND INFORMATION
Filing Date
9/6/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/1988
Description
VER - Verdict - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT II GUILTY OF RECKLESS BURNING (UNSIGNED)
Filing Date
9/6/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/1988
Description
VER - Verdict - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT I GUILTY OF ATTEMPTED BURGLARY IN THE SECOND DEGREE (UNSIGNED)
Filing Date
9/2/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/1988
Description
VER - Verdict - Party ()
Docket Date
9/15/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT 2 GUILTY OF BURGLARY OF ARSON UNOCCUPIED STRUCTURE
Filing Date
9/2/1988
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party ()
Docket Date
9/6/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/1988
Description
VER - Verdict - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT II GUILTY OF ATTEMPTED ARSON OF AN UNOCCUPIED STRUCTURE (UNSIGNED)
Filing Date
9/2/1988
Description
VER - Verdict - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT GUILTY AS TO COUNT II (UNSIGNED)
Filing Date
9/2/1988
Description
VER - Verdict - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOT GUILTY AS TO COUNT I (UNSIGNED)
Filing Date
9/2/1988
Description
VER - Verdict - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT I GUILTY OF CRIMINAL TRESPASS (UNSIGNED)
Filing Date
9/2/1988
Description
014 - ME: Trial/Verdict - Party ()
Docket Date
9/12/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/1988
Description
VER - Verdict - Party ()
Docket Date
9/15/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT 1 GUILTY OF BURGLARY 2ND DEGREE
Filing Date
9/1/1988
Description
INF - Information - Party ()
Docket Date
9/7/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED-CT1: BURGLARY 2ND DEGREE CL 3 FEL; CT2: ARSON O/AN UNOCCUPIED STRUCTURE CL 4 FEL
Filing Date
9/1/1988
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/1988
Description
052 - ME: Order Transferring Case - Party ()
Docket Date
9/6/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/1988
Description
058 - ME: Motion Denied - Party ()
Docket Date
9/6/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/1988
Description
000 - ME: Minute Entry - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/1988
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party ()
Docket Date
9/6/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/7/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/6/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
STATE'S REQUESTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Filing Date
8/16/1988
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party ()
Docket Date
8/19/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/1988
Description
121 - ME: Ord/Prescreening Report - Party ()
Docket Date
8/19/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/1988
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
8/15/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
8/9/1988
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
8/15/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR HEARING
Filing Date
8/2/1988
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party ()
Docket Date
8/3/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
QUASHED 7/25/88
Filing Date
7/25/1988
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator - Party ()
Docket Date
8/2/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/1988
Description
133 - ME: Bw Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party ()
Docket Date
7/27/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/1988
Description
151 - ME: Pretrial Conference - Party ()
Docket Date
6/10/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/1988
Description
ADN - Allegation of Dangerous Nature Felony - Party ()
Docket Date
5/24/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/1988
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
5/24/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCOVERY/INTERVIEWS/PLEA OFFER
Filing Date
5/12/1988
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
5/17/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCOVERY
Filing Date
5/12/1988
Description
NDR - Notice of Defenses and Request for Notice of Rebuttal Witnesses - Party ()
Docket Date
5/17/1988
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/1988
Description
RFH - Rfh - Party ()
Docket Date
5/17/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
VOLUNTARINESS
Filing Date
5/10/1988
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
5/16/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
SETTING TRIAL FOR: 6/27/88 - PRETRIAL CONF: 6/6/88
Filing Date
5/6/1988
Description
INF - Information - Party ()
Docket Date
5/11/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT 1: BURGLARY 2 DEG CL 3 FEL; CT 2: ARSON UNOCCUPIED STRUCTURE CL 4 FEL
Filing Date
5/4/1988
Description
COM - Complaint - Party ()
Docket Date
5/5/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT 1: BURGLARY SECOND DEGREE CL 3 FEL; CT 2: ARSON OF UNOCCUPIED STRUCTURE CL 4 FEL; DR 88-051784 PPD
Filing Date
5/4/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
5/5/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEF WIT LIST SUBPOENA; REL ORD-3RD PRTY CUST-S NELSON 4-28-88 RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE; PSA FINANCIAL INFO PSA BACKGROUND INFO; PSA RECOMMENDATION ORDER RE COUNSEL-PUBLIC DEF; RELEASE ORDER W/BOND $10,960 4-19-88 WAIVER PRELIM 5-10-88
Filing Date
5/4/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
5/5/1988
Filing Party
NOTE:
JC DOCKET (DEF ATTY-NORA GREER) TRANMITTAL CERT
Filing Date
5/4/1988
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
5/5/1988
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
No records found.