« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
FLADER, DAVID
Judge
Case #
Party Name
ALFONZO VALENZUELA - (3
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Aceto
Case #
CR1993-091207-D
Party Name
ROSEMARY MOLINA - (4
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Akers
Case #
CR1993-091207-B
Party Name
ELISA MOLINA - (5
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Akers
Case #
CR1993-091207-A
Party Name
ELFREDA SALAZAR - (6
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
F
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Gaylord
Case #
CR1993-091207-C
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (7)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1993-091207-C
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/1995
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party (B)
Docket Date
11/16/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1995
Description
ODP - Ord: Discharge from Probation - Party (B)
Docket Date
11/15/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DESIGNATING THIS A MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
7/25/1995
Description
RNL - RELEASE NOTIFICATION LETTER - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/27/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/1994
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/21/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/1994
Description
PTT - PETITION - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/23/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EARLY TERMINATION OF PROBATION OR SUMMARY PROBATION
Filing Date
11/4/1994
Description
ODP - Ord: Discharge from Probation - Party (A)
Docket Date
11/25/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
IT IS ORDERED THIS OFFENSE BE DESIGNATED A MISDEMEANOR
Filing Date
10/14/1994
Description
115 - ME: Dispo-Revoke/Prison (monetary Orders Entered) - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/18/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/1994
Description
113 - ME: Violation Hearing - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/21/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/26/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RIGHTS OF REV AFTER CONVCT AND PROCEDURE
Filing Date
10/14/1994
Description
APA - Appearance - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/26/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
INIT APPEAR ON PROB REVOCATION
Filing Date
10/6/1994
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/13/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/1994
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/6/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 9-23-94
Filing Date
9/29/1994
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/12/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/2/1994
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party (B)
Docket Date
5/9/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED
Filing Date
4/28/1994
Description
PMC - Petition Mod Cond/Reg of Prob - Party (B)
Docket Date
5/9/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/1993
Description
PRO - Petition to Revoke Prob/Order - Party (C)
Docket Date
12/21/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/1993
Description
MOT - Motion - Party (C)
Docket Date
12/17/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
12/8/1993
Description
214 - ME: WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL - Party (C)
Docket Date
12/17/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/1993
Description
ORD - Order - Party (C)
Docket Date
11/23/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXONERATING BOND
Filing Date
11/18/1993
Description
NRD - NOTICE OF RELEASE OF DEPOSIT - Party (C)
Docket Date
11/24/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
$700.00 CHECK PAID TO MARGARET MOLINA
Filing Date
11/5/1993
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party (D)
Docket Date
11/9/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/1993
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party (D)
Docket Date
11/9/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/1993
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/26/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/1993
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party (B)
Docket Date
10/26/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/1993
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party (D)
Docket Date
11/9/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/1993
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/18/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/1993
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/18/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/1993
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/20/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/1993
Description
JOR - Judgment and Order - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/12/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
9/30/1993
Description
JOR - Judgment and Order - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/30/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
9/30/1993
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/1/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/1993
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/5/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/1993
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/7/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/1993
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party (C)
Docket Date
10/4/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1993
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party (B)
Docket Date
9/27/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1993
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/27/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1993
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party (B)
Docket Date
9/27/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1993
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party (A)
Docket Date
10/4/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1993
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party (B)
Docket Date
10/4/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1993
Description
JOR - Judgment and Order - Party (B)
Docket Date
9/23/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
9/1/1993
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (C)
Docket Date
9/7/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/1993
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/7/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/1993
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party (C)
Docket Date
9/9/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/1993
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party (A)
Docket Date
9/13/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/1993
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party (C)
Docket Date
8/31/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/1993
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (B)
Docket Date
8/30/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/1993
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/31/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/1993
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party (B)
Docket Date
8/31/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/1993
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party (D)
Docket Date
8/17/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/1993
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party (D)
Docket Date
8/19/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/1993
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered by Court - Party (A)
Docket Date
8/11/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (B)
Docket Date
7/27/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/1993
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party (B)
Docket Date
7/30/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/19/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/19/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/1993
Description
TRF - Mot/Ord Temp Removal File Etc - Party (D)
Docket Date
7/14/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/1993
Description
214 - ME: WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL - Party (D)
Docket Date
7/13/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/1993
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/13/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/6/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCOVERY
Filing Date
6/24/1993
Description
NOT - Notice - Party (C)
Docket Date
7/6/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DEFENSES & REQ FOR DISCOVERY & DISCLOSURE OF REBUTTAL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
6/22/1993
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated - Party (A)
Docket Date
7/8/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/1993
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered by Court - Party (C)
Docket Date
6/29/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/1993
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered by Court - Party (B)
Docket Date
6/29/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/1993
Description
MFW - Motion for Withdraw - Party (D)
Docket Date
6/18/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/18/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/17/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/18/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/17/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/18/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/15/1993
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party (C)
Docket Date
6/22/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/1993
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party (D)
Docket Date
6/24/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/14/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/14/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/14/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/14/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/14/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/14/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/14/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/14/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/14/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/14/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/14/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/14/1993
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/10/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/11/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
LIST
Filing Date
6/10/1993
Description
APT - Allegation Pursuant to - Party ()
Docket Date
6/14/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/10/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (C)
Docket Date
6/11/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
LIST
Filing Date
6/10/1993
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party ()
Docket Date
6/14/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/10/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (D)
Docket Date
6/11/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
LIST
Filing Date
6/10/1993
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party ()
Docket Date
6/14/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/11/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
FELONY CONVICTION
Filing Date
6/9/1993
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party (B)
Docket Date
6/16/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/1993
Description
316 - ME: CASE ASSIGNED/REASSIGNED - Party (D)
Docket Date
6/16/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/1993
Description
NCJ - Notice of Change of Judge - Party (C)
Docket Date
6/9/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/1993
Description
NDC - Notice of Deposit with Court - Party (C)
Docket Date
6/8/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
$700
Filing Date
5/26/1993
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (C)
Docket Date
6/1/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/1993
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (A)
Docket Date
6/1/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/1993
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (D)
Docket Date
5/28/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/1993
Description
WAR - WARRANT FOR ARREST - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/21/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
APPEARANCE BOND $700/SERVED 5-19-93
Filing Date
5/20/1993
Description
WAR - WARRANT FOR ARREST - Party (C)
Docket Date
5/21/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
APPEARANCE BOND $700/SERVED 5-19-93
Filing Date
5/19/1993
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party (B)
Docket Date
5/20/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/1993
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party (C)
Docket Date
5/28/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEC/BOND $700 5/19/93
Filing Date
5/19/1993
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party (B)
Docket Date
5/20/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 5-19-93
Filing Date
5/19/1993
Description
FST - Financial Statement - Party (B)
Docket Date
5/20/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/1993
Description
FST - Financial Statement - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/28/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/1993
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party (B)
Docket Date
5/21/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/1993
Description
FST - Financial Statement - Party (C)
Docket Date
5/28/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/1993
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/28/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASED-O/R 5/19/93
Filing Date
5/19/1993
Description
179 - ME: Initial Appearance - Party (A,C)
Docket Date
5/26/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/1993
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
5/21/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party (D)
Docket Date
5/24/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE ORD-RELEASED OR 5-10-93 ORDER REGARDING COUNSEL; RECOMMENDATIONS BACKGRND INFOR; FINANCIAL INFORM RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
5/13/1993
Description
SUM - Summons - Party (B)
Docket Date
5/14/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 5-11-93
Filing Date
5/10/1993
Description
WAR - WARRANT FOR ARREST - Party ()
Docket Date
5/11/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
BOND $4,200 SERVED 5/9/93
Filing Date
5/5/1993
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (D)
Docket Date
5/11/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/1993
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (C)
Docket Date
5/21/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/1993
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (A)
Docket Date
5/21/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/1993
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party (B)
Docket Date
5/14/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/1993
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (B)
Docket Date
5/14/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/4/1993
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (D)
Docket Date
5/11/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
BURG IN THIRD DEG CL 4 FEL/DR 93-0300582 MPD/DOC ON OR ABOUT 1/30/93
Filing Date
5/4/1993
Description
IND - Indictment - Party (A,C)
Docket Date
5/21/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/4/1993
Description
145 - ME: G J True Bill/Warrant Iss - Party ()
Docket Date
5/21/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFS A,C BOND $700/DEF D BOND $4,200
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/17/1993
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty
Date
5/19/1993
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty
Date
5/25/1993
Time
8:30
Event
Arraignment Not Guilty
Date
5/26/1993
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty
Date
5/26/1993
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty