« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
DITSWORTH, JOHN
Judge
Case #
Party Name
ALEX VALENZUELA - (3
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
WISDOM, MARY
Judge
Superior Court
Case #
CR1993-006548-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/1997
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
7/11/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/1995
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
7/1/94
Filing Date
1/26/1995
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
2/8/1995
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO RELEASE EXHIBITS
Filing Date
1/5/1995
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
1/18/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRANSMITTAL LETTER
Filing Date
1/5/1995
Description
CAO - Court of Appeals Order - Party ()
Docket Date
1/18/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER AND MANDATE - AFFIRMED
Filing Date
1/4/1995
Description
REC - RECEIPT - Party ()
Docket Date
1/12/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY - EXHIBITS & CLASSIFIED MATERIALS
Filing Date
1/4/1995
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
1/12/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
5-10-94
Filing Date
10/12/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
10/14/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLETION OF RECORD
Filing Date
9/8/1994
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
9/14/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERT COPY FOR CT REPORTER TO PREPARE AND FILE TRANSCRIPT
Filing Date
8/29/1994
Description
REC - RECEIPT - Party ()
Docket Date
8/31/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/1994
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
8/30/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/1994
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
8/30/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1994
Description
CER - Certificate - Party ()
Docket Date
8/22/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
8/19/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
8/22/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COURT REPORTERS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
8/19/1994
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party ()
Docket Date
8/22/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1994
Description
APP - Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
8/22/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
INDEX
Filing Date
7/5/1994
Description
NAP - Notice of Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
7/7/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
7/1/1994
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
7/8/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/1994
Description
193 - ME: Sentence-Imprisonment (Monetary Orders Entered) - Party ()
Docket Date
7/13/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/1994
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
6/29/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/1994
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party ()
Docket Date
5/27/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/1994
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet - Party ()
Docket Date
5/31/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/1994
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party ()
Docket Date
5/17/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/1994
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
5/18/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
5/10/1994
Description
AFS - Affidavit of Service - Party ()
Docket Date
5/18/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
5/9/1994
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party ()
Docket Date
5/19/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/1994
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party ()
Docket Date
5/20/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
PARTIES
Filing Date
5/9/1994
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party ()
Docket Date
5/20/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
PARTIES
Filing Date
5/9/1994
Description
STP - Stipulation - Party ()
Docket Date
5/20/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PARTIES
Filing Date
5/9/1994
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
5/20/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
5/12/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF DEFENSES (AMENDED)
Filing Date
5/5/1994
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
5/12/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
SUBPOENA
Filing Date
4/27/1994
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
5/11/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/1994
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
3/17/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/1994
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
3/7/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
2/24/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
3/1/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY- AMENDED
Filing Date
2/24/1994
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
3/1/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO SUPPRESS IDENTIFICATION
Filing Date
2/24/1994
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
3/1/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
3/1/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
2/24/1994
Description
ADN - Allegation Dangerous Nature Felony - Party ()
Docket Date
3/1/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/18/1994
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
2/23/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO SUBMIT QUESTIONAAIRE TO VENIREMEN
Filing Date
2/15/1994
Description
NDR - NOT DEFENSES/REQ REBUTTAL WITS - Party ()
Docket Date
2/18/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/24/1994
Description
RFH - RFH - Party ()
Docket Date
1/31/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
DESSUREAULT
Filing Date
1/20/1994
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
1/28/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
1/18/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF NECESSITY FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
1/10/1994
Description
APT - Allegation Pursuant to - Party ()
Docket Date
1/18/1994
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
ARS 13-604.02
Filing Date
1/6/1994
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
1/10/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/1993
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
12/29/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/1993
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
11/30/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/1993
Description
TRF - Mot/Ord Temp Removal File Etc - Party ()
Docket Date
11/4/1993
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
10/29/1993
Description
214 - ME: WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL - Party ()
Docket Date
11/3/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/1993
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
10/29/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/1993
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party ()
Docket Date
10/15/1993
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
CONFIDENTIAL/TO SUPPLEMENT/MOTION TO DETERMINE COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/6/1993
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
10/13/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/1993
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
10/4/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/1993
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party ()
Docket Date
9/27/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/1993
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
9/10/1993
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO DETERMINE COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/27/1993
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
8/30/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEC/BOND $280,000 8/23/93
Filing Date
8/23/1993
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
9/2/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/1993
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
8/16/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/16/1993
Description
NSI - NSI - Party ()
Docket Date
8/16/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
BOND $280,000 D190816/CT 2 NI
Filing Date
8/13/1993
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
8/16/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1 1ST DEG MURDER CL 1 AND DANGEROUS FEL; CT 2 THEFT CL 3 FEL; DR 30486311 PPD/DOC ON OR ABT 8-6-93
Filing Date
8/13/1993
Description
143 - ME: G J Not/Supervening Indict - Party ()
Docket Date
8/16/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $280,000
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/23/1993
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty