« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
PYEATTE, H
Judge
Case #
Party Name
MARK A CURTIS - (3
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Hotham
Case #
CR1993-001627-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/1993
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
7/23/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/1993
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party ()
Docket Date
7/27/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/1993
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
7/19/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/1993
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
6/21/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RIGHTS OF REVIEW AFTER CONVICTION
Filing Date
6/17/1993
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
6/22/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/17/1993
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
6/23/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/1993
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
6/9/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO STRIKE ARS 13-604.02(B) ALLEGATION
Filing Date
6/3/1993
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
6/7/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/1993
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
6/8/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/1993
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
6/8/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/1993
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party ()
Docket Date
5/27/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/27/1993
Description
RFH - RFH - Party ()
Docket Date
5/27/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 609
Filing Date
5/12/1993
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
5/20/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
3/23/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMMITTED WHILE RELEASED FROM CONFINEMENT PURSUANT TO ARS 13-604.02
Filing Date
3/23/1993
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party ()
Docket Date
3/23/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/23/1993
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
3/23/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY
Filing Date
3/23/1993
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
3/23/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO STRIKE DEF'S MOT FOR VOLUNTARINESS HEARING
Filing Date
3/18/1993
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered by Court - Party ()
Docket Date
3/29/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/1993
Description
MFD - Motion For Discovery - Party ()
Docket Date
3/24/1993
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
3/17/1993
Description
NDR - NOT DEFENSES/REQ REBUTTAL WITS - Party ()
Docket Date
3/24/1993
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
3/17/1993
Description
RVH - Req/Voluntariness Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
3/24/1993
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
3/10/1993
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
3/11/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
3/15/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
REL QUESTIONNAIRE PSA FINAN INFO; PRIOR CONVICTION PSA BACKGROUND INFO; RECOMMENDATION ORD RE: COUNSEL; REL ORD-SEC/BOND $14,000 3/3/93
Filing Date
3/4/1993
Description
WAR - WARRANT FOR ARREST - Party ()
Docket Date
3/5/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
APPEARANCE BOND $14,000
Filing Date
3/1/1993
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
3/5/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/1993
Description
145 - ME: G J True Bill/Warrant Iss - Party ()
Docket Date
3/5/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $14,000
Filing Date
2/26/1993
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
3/5/1993
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
ESCAPE 2ND DEG CLS 5 FEL/DR 9212-0183-B17-26 AZ DOC/DOC ON OR ABT 12-2-92
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/10/1993
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty