« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
MCKAY, GUNN
Judge
Case #
Party Name
ANTHONY PEREZ - (3
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
LION, CRAIG
Judge
Gaylord
Case #
CR1992-091737-
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1992-091737-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2000
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
4/10/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
4/3/2000
Description
115 - ME: Dispo-Revoke/Prison (monetary Orders Entered) - Party ()
Docket Date
4/6/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2000
Description
113 - ME: Violation Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
4/6/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2000
Description
IAP - Initail Appear Prob Revocation - Party ()
Docket Date
4/6/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELATED CASE CR99-92825
Filing Date
3/30/2000
Description
NRR - Notice of Rights of Review - Party ()
Docket Date
4/6/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2000
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
4/6/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
3/28/2000
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
3/30/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
3/7/2000
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
3/7/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2000
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
2/8/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2000
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party ()
Docket Date
2/1/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2000
Description
FID - Federal Information Disclaimer - Party ()
Docket Date
1/31/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2000
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party ()
Docket Date
1/31/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
1-18-00
Filing Date
1/7/2000
Description
PVW - PROBATION VIOLATION WARRANT - Party ()
Docket Date
1/10/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/1999
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions of Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
8/4/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
7/31/1999
Description
114 - ME: Dispo-Reinstate - Party ()
Docket Date
7/31/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/1999
Description
NRR - Notice of Rights of Review - Party ()
Docket Date
7/29/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHT TO POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
6/25/1999
Description
117 - ME: Guilt New Chg/Prob Violation - Party ()
Docket Date
6/28/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/1999
Description
IAP - Initail Appear Prob Revocation - Party ()
Docket Date
6/28/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/1999
Description
PRP - PETITION TO REVOKE PROBATION - Party ()
Docket Date
6/28/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/1999
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party ()
Docket Date
6/17/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/1999
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party ()
Docket Date
6/8/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/1998
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
5/22/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
5/8/1998
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered by Court - Party ()
Docket Date
5/13/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/1998
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
5/14/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/1998
Description
TCP - Terms & Conditions of Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
3/27/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
3/26/1998
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party ()
Docket Date
3/31/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/1998
Description
114 - ME: Dispo-Reinstate - Party ()
Docket Date
3/31/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/1998
Description
IAP - Initail Appear Prob Revocation - Party ()
Docket Date
3/25/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/1998
Description
NRR - Notice of Rights of Review - Party ()
Docket Date
3/25/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
3/17/1998
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party ()
Docket Date
3/19/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/12/98
Filing Date
1/7/1998
Description
PVW - PROBATION VIOLATION WARRANT - Party ()
Docket Date
1/15/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/1997
Description
SJU - SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - Party ()
Docket Date
6/2/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
$1,820.00 05-21-97
Filing Date
11/8/1996
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
11/19/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/1996
Description
JOR - Judgment and Order - Party ()
Docket Date
10/30/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
10/24/1996
Description
109 - ME: Sentence - Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
10/25/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/1996
Description
NRD - NOTICE OF RELEASE OF DEPOSIT - Party ()
Docket Date
10/30/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
$600 MAILED
Filing Date
10/18/1996
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
10/30/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXONERATING BOND
Filing Date
10/17/1996
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
10/18/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/1996
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
10/21/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHT TO APPEAL
Filing Date
10/17/1996
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party ()
Docket Date
10/21/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRETRIAL SERVICES AGENCY
Filing Date
9/18/1996
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
9/19/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/1996
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
9/18/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/1996
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
8/26/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/1996
Description
NDC - Notice of Deposit with Court - Party ()
Docket Date
8/22/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
$600
Filing Date
7/24/1996
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party ()
Docket Date
7/26/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 7-18-96
Filing Date
7/24/1996
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
7/26/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/1996
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
7/24/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPERVISED/SECURED BOND $600.00 071896
Filing Date
10/14/1994
Description
JOR - Judgment and Order - Party ()
Docket Date
10/14/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
10/14/1994
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party ()
Docket Date
10/26/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/1993
Description
RTM - Returned Mail - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/1992
Description
333 - ME: Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
1/5/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/1992
Description
133 - ME: BW Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party ()
Docket Date
12/18/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
12/11/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/1992
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
12/7/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/20/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
11/24/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
LIST
Filing Date
11/20/1992
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
11/24/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DISCLOSRE
Filing Date
11/6/1992
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
11/9/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/1992
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party ()
Docket Date
11/9/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/1992
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party ()
Docket Date
11/9/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEF
Filing Date
11/5/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
11/12/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/1992
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
11/4/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $1820 10/29/92
Filing Date
11/2/1992
Description
BAB - Bail Bond - Party ()
Docket Date
11/4/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMERICAN BONDING CO $1820
Filing Date
11/2/1992
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party ()
Docket Date
11/4/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/27/92
Filing Date
10/29/1992
Description
164 - ME: Plea Arraignment Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
11/3/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/1992
Description
INA - Initial Appearance on Bench Warrant - Party ()
Docket Date
10/30/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1992
Description
133 - ME: BW Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party ()
Docket Date
8/25/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/1992
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
8/11/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
8/7/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/1992
Description
SUM - Summons - Party ()
Docket Date
7/28/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 7-23-92
Filing Date
7/1/1992
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
7/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/1992
Description
144 - ME: G J True Bill/Summons Iss - Party ()
Docket Date
7/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/1992
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
7/28/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
POSSESSION OF NARCOTIC DRUGS FOR SALE CLS 2 FEL; DR 92-0970487 MPD/DOC ON OR ABT 4-6-92
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/18/1996
Time
8:30
Event
Quash Bench Warrant
Date
8/16/1996
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Firm Trial Date
Date
9/12/1996
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Firm Trial Date
Date
10/17/1996
Time
8:30
Event
Sentencing.
Date
3/18/1998
Time
8:30
Event
Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/1/1999
Time
8:30
Event
Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
6/10/1999
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
7/19/1999
Time
8:30
Event
Disposition Hearing
Date
1/24/2000
Time
8:30
Event
Revocation Arraignment Hearing
Date
2/1/2000
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
3/2/2000
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing
Date
3/30/2000
Time
8:30
Event
Non-Witness Violation Hearing