« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
THACKERAY, GAIL
Judge
Case #
Party Name
PAUL CHARLES NELSON - (2
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
VAUGHN, MICHAEL
Judge
Aceto
Case #
CR1992-090332-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/1992
Description
019 - ME: Ruling - Party ()
Docket Date
11/6/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/1992
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
10/23/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF'S MOTION FOR RETURN OF PROPERTY
Filing Date
10/15/1992
Description
304 - ME: ORAL ARGUMENT SET - Party ()
Docket Date
10/26/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/1992
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
10/15/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
RETURN PROPERTY
Filing Date
9/25/1992
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
9/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/15/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/1992
Description
308 - ME: CASE TRAN FOR REASSIGNMENT - Party ()
Docket Date
9/17/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/1992
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
9/16/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/1992
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
9/23/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/1992
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
9/14/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
8/6/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/1992
Description
308 - ME: CASE TRAN FOR REASSIGNMENT - Party ()
Docket Date
7/14/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/1992
Description
161 - ME: Guilty PLea Set Aside - Party ()
Docket Date
7/14/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
7/14/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
6/24/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
6/29/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/1992
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
6/3/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/1992
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
6/2/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
5/15/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/1992
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
5/5/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/1992
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference - Party ()
Docket Date
4/22/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/1992
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
3/12/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/1992
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered by Court - Party ()
Docket Date
2/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/1992
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
2/20/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO TRANSFER DEF TO DEP OF CORRECTIONS AND ORD
Filing Date
2/12/1992
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/1992
Description
INF - Information - Party ()
Docket Date
2/11/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
THEFT A CLASS 4 FELONY
Filing Date
2/5/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
2/5/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE ORD: BOND $4000 1/20/92 WPH-ARR: 2/12/92 @ 8:30 AM- 1/30/92; CO ATTY: GAIL THACKERRAY DEF ATTY: MIKE VAUGHN; IA: 1/20/92 TRANSMITTAL CERTIFICATION; ARREST WARRANT- SERVED 1/20/92
Filing Date
2/5/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
2/5/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/1992
Description
COM - Complaint/Petition - Party ()
Docket Date
2/5/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
THEFT CL 4 FEL; 5/14/91 - 10/2/91 / DR 91-11208 SCOTTSDALE PD / CR91-01854FE
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/12/1992
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty