« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
TUROFF, LARRY
Judge
Case #
Party Name
JEROME PIPKINS - (3
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Araneta
Case #
CR1992-009210-
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1992-009210-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/16/1996
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
2/26/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED
Filing Date
2/8/1996
Description
ODP - Ord: Discharge from Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
2/23/1996
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEF IS DISCHARGED FROM PROB & DESIGNATING OFFENSE A MISD
Filing Date
2/23/1995
Description
PMO - PETITION FOR MODIFICATION - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CONDITIONS OR REGULATIONS OF PROBATION & ORDER
Filing Date
12/21/1994
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
1/12/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
MODIFYING CONDITION PROB
Filing Date
12/13/1994
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
1/12/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
MODIFYING CONDITION PROB
Filing Date
8/11/1994
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
8/26/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND PETITION TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF PROBATION
Filing Date
3/29/1994
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
4/6/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
3/28/1994
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party ()
Docket Date
3/30/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/1994
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
3/16/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/1994
Description
JOR - Judgment and Order - Party ()
Docket Date
3/15/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
3/14/1994
Description
113 - ME: Violation Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
3/23/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/1994
Description
114 - ME: Dispo-Reinstate - Party ()
Docket Date
3/23/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/1994
Description
088 - ME: Case Transferred - Party ()
Docket Date
3/11/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/1994
Description
133 - ME: BW Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party ()
Docket Date
3/8/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/1994
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
2/11/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/1994
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party ()
Docket Date
1/31/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/1993
Description
PRO - Petition to Revoke Prob/Order - Party ()
Docket Date
12/28/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/1993
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/1993
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
3/22/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/1993
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
3/8/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/1993
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
3/4/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHTS REVIEW AFTER CONVICTION
Filing Date
2/24/1993
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
3/8/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/24/1993
Description
JOR - Judgment and Order - Party ()
Docket Date
2/24/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
2/1/1993
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
2/5/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/1993
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered by Court - Party ()
Docket Date
2/4/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/1993
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
1/28/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/1993
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
1/28/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/1992
Description
TRF - Mot/Ord Temp Removal File Etc - Party ()
Docket Date
12/22/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
12/15/1992
Description
PRC - Pretrl Srvcs Agncy/Recommendtion - Party ()
Docket Date
12/15/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/1992
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
12/21/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO RELEASE OF DEF
Filing Date
12/14/1992
Description
326 - ME: ORDER REDUCING BOND - Party ()
Docket Date
12/18/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/1992
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party ()
Docket Date
12/11/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/1992
Description
MRE - Motion for Release - Party ()
Docket Date
12/3/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
P3 ON HIS OWN RECOG OR IN THE ALTER TO REDUCE BOND
Filing Date
12/1/1992
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
12/3/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR VOLUNTARINESS HEARING
Filing Date
12/1/1992
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
12/3/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
12/1/1992
Description
NDR - NOT DEFENSES/REQ REBUTTAL WITS - Party ()
Docket Date
12/3/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
11/19/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE QUEST PSA FINANCIAL INFO; PSA BACKGROUND INFO PSA RECOMMENDS; ORDER RE:COUNSEL SEC PUBLIC DEF RELEASE ORDER APPEARANCE BOND $2100.
Filing Date
11/18/1992
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
11/23/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/1992
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
11/10/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/1992
Description
NSI - NSI - Party ()
Docket Date
11/10/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1-2 BOND $2,100 NOT POSTED
Filing Date
11/9/1992
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
11/10/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1-2 AGGRAV ASSAULT CLS 3 FELONIES; DR 20-647694 PPD/DOC ON OR ABT 11-2-92
Filing Date
11/9/1992
Description
143 - ME: G J Not/Supervening Indict - Party ()
Docket Date
11/10/1992
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/18/1992
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty