« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
DITSWORTH, JOHN
Judge
Case #
Party Name
ALEX VALENZUELA - (3
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
PUBLIC DEFENDER,
Judge
Superior Court
Case #
CR1992-005603-
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
Beneficiary
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1992-005603-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/1995
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter of Transmittal - Party ()
Docket Date
2/9/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/1995
Description
CAO - Court of Appeals Order - Party ()
Docket Date
2/9/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER - AFFIRMED
Filing Date
1/4/1995
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
1/12/1995
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
10/20/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COMPLETION OF RECORD
Filing Date
9/8/1994
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
9/12/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/1994
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
9/1/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/1994
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
8/24/1994
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
8/30/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/1994
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
8/30/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1994
Description
WSH - Worksheet - Party ()
Docket Date
8/22/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1994
Description
CER - Certificate - Party ()
Docket Date
8/22/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
8/19/1994
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
8/22/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTIFICATION COURT REPORTERS / APPEAL FILED
Filing Date
8/19/1994
Description
APP - Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
8/22/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
INDEX
Filing Date
8/11/1994
Description
ECR - Exhibits/Classified/Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
8/16/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/1994
Description
ECR - Exhibits/Classified/Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
8/16/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/1994
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
7/12/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
7/6/1994
Description
130 - ME: Counsel Appt for Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
7/15/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/5/1994
Description
NAP - Notice of Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
7/7/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
AND MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Filing Date
7/1/1994
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
7/7/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/1994
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
7/11/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/1994
Description
115 - ME: Dispo-Revoke/Prison (monetary Orders Entered) - Party ()
Docket Date
7/13/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/1994
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
7/13/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/1994
Description
117 - ME: Guilt New Chg/Prob Violation - Party ()
Docket Date
5/27/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/1994
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
5/10/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/1994
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
3/14/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/1994
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
3/17/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/1994
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
3/7/1994
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/20/1994
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
1/24/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/1994
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
1/14/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/1993
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
12/29/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/1993
Description
IAP - Initail Appear Prob Revocation - Party ()
Docket Date
11/30/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/1993
Description
RQU - RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE - Party ()
Docket Date
11/30/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/1993
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
11/30/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/1/1993
Description
TRF - Mot/Ord Temp Removal File Etc - Party ()
Docket Date
11/4/1993
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
10/29/1993
Description
214 - ME: WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL - Party ()
Docket Date
11/2/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/1993
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
10/27/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING MOTION TO DETERMINE COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/25/1993
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
10/29/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/1993
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
10/12/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/1993
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
10/1/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/1993
Description
PET - Petition - Party ()
Docket Date
9/28/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVOKE PROBATION WARRANTLESS ARREST
Filing Date
9/1/1993
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/1993
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party ()
Docket Date
8/17/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/11/1992
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/1992
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
11/23/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/1992
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
11/19/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
& RIGHT TO POST CONVICTION RELIEF
Filing Date
11/16/1992
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
11/23/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/1992
Description
JOR - Judgment and Order - Party ()
Docket Date
11/16/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
11/5/1992
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
11/6/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF FILING
Filing Date
10/15/1992
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
10/21/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/1992
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
10/20/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/1992
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
9/22/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPERVISED RELEASE 9-21-92
Filing Date
9/21/1992
Description
000 - ME: Minute Entry - Party ()
Docket Date
9/23/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/1992
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party ()
Docket Date
9/17/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RE RELEASE CONDITIONS
Filing Date
9/8/1992
Description
PUP - Pretrial Services Agency/Update - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/1992
Description
333 - ME: Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
9/9/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/1992
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party ()
Docket Date
9/1/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/1992
Description
NDP - NOT DISC/INTRVWS/PLEA Offer - Party ()
Docket Date
8/28/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/27/1992
Description
TRF - Mot/Ord Temp Removal File Etc - Party ()
Docket Date
8/31/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
8/21/1992
Description
MRD - Mot Rel Def O.R./Rde Bnd/3 Pty - Party ()
Docket Date
8/24/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
8/14/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/17/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $1540 8/7/92
Filing Date
8/14/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/17/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/17/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/1992
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
8/18/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/17/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/17/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/17/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
8/17/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEF
Filing Date
8/10/1992
Description
WAR - WARRANT FOR ARREST - Party ()
Docket Date
8/10/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 08-07-92 SECURED APP BOND $5600
Filing Date
7/1/1992
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
8/10/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/1992
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
8/10/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
BURGLARY IN THE SECOND DEG CL 3 FEL; DR 20138405 PPD/DOC 03-09-92
Filing Date
6/30/1992
Description
145 - ME: G J True Bill/Warrant Iss - Party ()
Docket Date
8/10/1992
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/14/1992
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty