« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Southeast
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
SULLIVAN, PATRICK
Judge
Case #
Party Name
PAUL MICHAEL NELSON - (3
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Willett
Case #
CR1991-091346-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/1994
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
10/12/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/1994
Description
ODP - Ord: Discharge from Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
10/4/1994
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEF HAS FAILED TO COMPLY W/TERMS #12B OF PROBATION
Filing Date
5/18/1993
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
5/19/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR WAIVER OF FEES & COSTS,SERV OF PROCESS COSTS OR PUBLICATION COSTS
Filing Date
5/18/1993
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
5/19/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVER OR DEFERRAL OF FEES & COSTS;SUPPLEMENTAL INFOR FOR WAIVER/DEFERRAL OF SER
Filing Date
7/8/1992
Description
PMC - Petition Mod Cond/Reg of Prob - Party ()
Docket Date
7/24/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/1991
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party ()
Docket Date
11/19/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/1991
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
9/27/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/1991
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
9/20/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/1991
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
9/20/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
9/11/1991
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
9/17/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/1991
Description
TOP - Terms & Conditions of Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
9/20/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
9/11/1991
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
9/20/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
AND APPEAL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
8/14/1991
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
8/19/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
8/14/1991
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
8/16/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/1991
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party ()
Docket Date
7/23/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/1991
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
7/24/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
7/11/1991
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
7/18/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
7/3/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/26/1991
Description
NDR - NOT DEFENSES/REQ REBUTTAL WITS - Party ()
Docket Date
7/3/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
6/21/1991
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party ()
Docket Date
6/25/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/1991
Description
PRC - Pretrl Srvcs Agncy/Recommendtion - Party ()
Docket Date
6/25/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/1991
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
6/24/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF WITNESSES AND EVIDENCE
Filing Date
6/20/1991
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
6/26/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/1991
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
6/24/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF DISCOVERY INTERVIEWS AND PLEA OFFER
Filing Date
6/11/1991
Description
MOR - Motion And Order - Party ()
Docket Date
6/17/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR TEMP REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES
Filing Date
6/6/1991
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party ()
Docket Date
6/11/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
6/11/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE ORD: BOND $1050 5/11/91 ORD RE COUNSEL: PUBLIC DEF; PSA RECOMMENDATION BACKGROUND INFO; FINANCIAL INFO PRIOR CONVICTIONS SHEET; RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE
Filing Date
5/30/1991
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
6/4/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/1991
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party ()
Docket Date
6/4/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/1991
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party ()
Docket Date
6/4/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUB DEFENDER
Filing Date
5/30/1991
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
6/4/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
REL-BOND $1480 5-24-91
Filing Date
5/30/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
6/4/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/1991
Description
PBA - PRETRIAL SRVCS AGENCY BACKGRND - Party ()
Docket Date
6/4/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/30/1991
Description
PRC - Pretrl Srvcs Agncy/Recommendtion - Party ()
Docket Date
6/4/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/1991
Description
NSI - NSI - Party ()
Docket Date
5/29/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1/BOND $1,050 NOT POSTED
Filing Date
5/28/1991
Description
WAR - WARRANT FOR ARREST - Party ()
Docket Date
5/29/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 2/APPEARANCE BOND $1,400/SERVED 5-22-91
Filing Date
5/23/1991
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
5/29/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/1991
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
5/29/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1-2 AGG DRIVING OR ACTUAL PHYSICAL CONTROL WHILE UNDER THE INFLUENCE OF; INTOXICATING LIQUOR OR DRUGS CL 5 FEL; DR 91-59532 TPD/DOC 5-11-91
Filing Date
5/21/1991
Description
143 - ME: G J Not/Supervening Indict - Party ()
Docket Date
5/29/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
CT 2 BOND $1400
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/30/1991
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty