« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
BLAKE, JAMES
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
McClennen
Case #
CR1991-007813-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/1999
Description
RNL - RELEASE NOTIFICATION LETTER - Party ()
Docket Date
1/3/2000
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELATED CASE #CR92-04301
Filing Date
9/23/1992
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
9/24/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1992
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
9/25/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/1992
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
8/27/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/1992
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
8/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/1992
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
8/20/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
8/18/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
8/19/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/1992
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
7/17/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
7/14/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
7/16/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/1992
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
7/8/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
O/INTENT TO USE OTHER CRIMES WRONGS
Filing Date
6/30/1992
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party ()
Docket Date
7/8/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/1992
Description
TRF - Mot/Ord Temp Removal File Etc - Party ()
Docket Date
6/17/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/1992
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
7/6/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/1992
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
6/2/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
5/22/1992
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
6/2/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
REQUESTING VOLUNTARINESS HEARING
Filing Date
5/22/1992
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
6/2/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
REQUESTING DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
4/8/1992
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
4/14/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
DISCOVERY
Filing Date
4/1/1992
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
4/3/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/1992
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
4/22/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONFIRMING ORDER
Filing Date
4/1/1992
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
4/8/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
3/21/92
Filing Date
3/30/1992
Description
017 - ME: Counsel Appointed - Party ()
Docket Date
4/3/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/1992
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
4/1/1992
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR SPECIAL APPOINTMENT AND COMPENSATION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/23/1992
Description
WAR - WARRANT FOR ARREST - Party ()
Docket Date
3/23/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1-5 APPEARANCE BOND $7,000/SERVED 3-21-92
Filing Date
9/23/1991
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
3/23/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/1991
Description
145 - ME: G J True Bill/Warrant Iss - Party ()
Docket Date
3/23/1992
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $7,000
Filing Date
9/20/1991
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
3/23/1992
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CT 1 CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT AGG ASSAULT CL 3 FEL; CTS 2-3 AGG ASSAULT CL 3 & DANG FEL; CT 4 ENDNGERMENT CL 6 FEL; CT 5 POSS OF PROHIBITIVE WEAPON CL 4 FEL; DR 10-026632 PPD/DOC ON OR ABT 1-14-91
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/1/1992
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty