« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
CHARNELL, JAMES
Judge
Case #
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Hauser
Case #
CR1991-000671-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/1991
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
4/30/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/1991
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
5/1/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/1991
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
5/2/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/1991
Description
WPA - Waiver with Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
4/1/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/27/1991
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
4/2/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/1991
Description
052 - ME: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - Party ()
Docket Date
3/5/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/1991
Description
308 - ME: CASE TRAN FOR REASSIGNMENT - Party ()
Docket Date
3/4/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/1991
Description
PRC - Pretrl Srvcs Agncy/Recommendtion - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/1991
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
REL-BOND $8220 1-22-91
Filing Date
2/12/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 2-4-91
Filing Date
2/12/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/12/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 1-24-91
Filing Date
2/12/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/1991
Description
RQU - RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/1991
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUB DEFENDER
Filing Date
2/12/1991
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/1991
Description
PBA - PRETRIAL SRVCS AGENCY BACKGRND - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/12/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/7/1991
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/1991
Description
WPH - WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/1991
Description
INF - Information - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS 1 & 2: AGGRAVATED ASSAULT BOTH CL 3 FEL
Filing Date
2/1/1991
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued - Party ()
Docket Date
2/6/1991
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file