« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
CRUM, PAUL
Judge
Case #
Party Name
ANTONIO CONTRERAS PEREZ - (3
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Reinstein
Case #
CR1990-012844-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/1992
Description
PRO - Petition to Revoke Prob/Order - Party ()
Docket Date
8/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/1992
Description
182 - ME: Disposition Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
8/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/1992
Description
PVR - PROBATION VIOLATION REPORT - Party ()
Docket Date
8/31/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/1992
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
8/28/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/1992
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
8/12/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/1992
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment of Court Interpreter - Party ()
Docket Date
7/24/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/1992
Description
RQU - RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE - Party ()
Docket Date
7/24/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/21/1992
Description
IAP - Initail Appear Prob Revocation - Party ()
Docket Date
7/24/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/1992
Description
113 - ME: Violation Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
7/22/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/1992
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party ()
Docket Date
7/6/1992
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/1991
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment of Court Interpreter - Party ()
Docket Date
6/17/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/1991
Description
INA - Initial Appearance on Bench Warrant - Party ()
Docket Date
6/17/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/1991
Description
RQU - RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE - Party ()
Docket Date
6/17/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/1991
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party ()
Docket Date
6/17/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 5/15/91
Filing Date
6/7/1991
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
6/17/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/1991
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
6/15/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/1991
Description
TOP - Terms & Conditions of Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
6/18/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/1991
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
6/14/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/1991
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
6/12/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/1991
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set - Party ()
Docket Date
6/3/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/1991
Description
BWA - Bench Warrant - Party ()
Docket Date
5/22/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 5-15-91
Filing Date
5/7/1991
Description
133 - ME: BW Issued Hrg/Trl Vacate - Party ()
Docket Date
5/16/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/1991
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
4/15/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/1991
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
4/19/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/11/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 3/4/91
Filing Date
3/4/1991
Description
015 - ME: Trial Reset Date - Party ()
Docket Date
3/12/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/4/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AGGRAVATED DUI
Filing Date
2/28/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/4/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AGGRAVATED DUI
Filing Date
2/28/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/4/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AGGRAVATED DUI
Filing Date
2/28/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/4/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AGGRAVATED DUI
Filing Date
2/28/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/4/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AGGRAVATED DUI
Filing Date
2/28/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/1/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/28/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
3/1/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
2/6/1991
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
2/13/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR TEMPORARY REMOVAL OF OFFICIAL COURT FILES, TRANSCRIPTS OR EXHIBITS & ORDER
Filing Date
1/31/1991
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
2/7/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/1991
Description
057 - ME: MOTION GRANTED - Party ()
Docket Date
1/29/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/1991
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
1/18/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/17/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
1/18/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 1/12/91
Filing Date
1/16/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
1/17/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 1/15/91
Filing Date
1/15/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
1/17/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/15/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
1/17/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/10/1991
Description
MET - Motion/Extension of Time - Party ()
Docket Date
1/11/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO FILE PRETRIAL MOTIONS
Filing Date
1/10/1991
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
1/11/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/1991
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
1/11/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF WITNESSES ON TRIAL OF PRIORS
Filing Date
1/4/1991
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party ()
Docket Date
1/7/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/2/1991
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
1/4/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/27/1990
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
12/31/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
13-604.02 (B)
Filing Date
12/27/1990
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
12/31/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONVICTION
Filing Date
12/21/1990
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
12/26/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
12/19/1990
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
12/19/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
O.R. 12/18/90
Filing Date
12/19/1990
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party ()
Docket Date
12/19/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUBLIC DEF
Filing Date
12/19/1990
Description
ORI - Order Regarding Appointment of Court Interpreter - Party ()
Docket Date
12/19/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/1990
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
12/19/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/1990
Description
SUM - Summons - Party ()
Docket Date
12/11/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED BY CERTIFIED MAIL 12/6/90
Filing Date
12/6/1990
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
12/11/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
DATED: 12/3/90
Filing Date
12/4/1990
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
12/11/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/1990
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
12/11/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AGGRAVATED DRIVING OR ACTUAL PHYSICAL CONTROL WHILE UNDER THE INFLUENCE; OF INTOXICATING LIQUOR OR DRUGS A CL 5 FEL; DR 90-31557 DPS - DOC: 8//5/90
Filing Date
12/3/1990
Description
144 - ME: G J True Bill/Summons Iss - Party ()
Docket Date
12/11/1990
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/18/1990
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty