« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
NELSON, E
Judge
Case #
Party Name
MARK CURTIS - (3
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Araneta
Case #
CR1990-003736-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/1991
Description
CAO - Court of Appeals Order - Party ()
Docket Date
10/30/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERT COPY AFFIRMING JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/25/1991
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter of Transmittal - Party ()
Docket Date
11/4/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/1991
Description
NCR - Notice of Completion of Record - Party ()
Docket Date
6/6/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/1991
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
6/6/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/1991
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
7/5/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/1991
Description
CAO - Court of Appeals Order - Party ()
Docket Date
5/15/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERT COPY FOR CT REPORTER TO PREPARE AND FILE TRANSCRIPT
Filing Date
5/10/1991
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
5/15/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/1991
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
5/13/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/1991
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
5/8/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/1991
Description
REC - RECEIPT - Party ()
Docket Date
4/18/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/1991
Description
REC - RECEIPT - Party ()
Docket Date
4/18/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/1991
Description
CAR - Court of Appeals Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
4/18/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/1991
Description
ATR - Appeals Transmittal Receipt - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/1991
Description
AIX - Appeals Index - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/1991
Description
CCT - Certificate of Certification - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/18/1991
Description
NAP - Notice of Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
3/20/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
3/7/1991
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
3/12/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED
Filing Date
2/27/1991
Description
PVR - PROBATION VIOLATION REPORT - Party ()
Docket Date
3/6/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/1991
Description
182 - ME: Disposition Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
3/4/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/1991
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
3/4/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/1991
Description
113 - ME: Violation Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
2/14/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/1991
Description
060 - ME: Case Transfer CC - Party ()
Docket Date
2/5/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/1991
Description
IAP - Initail Appear Prob Revocation - Party ()
Docket Date
1/28/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/1991
Description
RQU - RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE - Party ()
Docket Date
1/28/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/1991
Description
PET - Petition - Party ()
Docket Date
1/28/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REVOKE PROBATION
Filing Date
1/24/1991
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
1/25/1991
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
1/24/1991
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party ()
Docket Date
1/31/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/1990
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
9/11/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/1990
Description
058 - ME: MOTION DENIED - Party ()
Docket Date
9/6/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/1990
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
8/24/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/1990
Description
TOP - Terms & Conditions of Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
7/27/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/1990
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
7/27/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/1990
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
7/27/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/1990
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
7/27/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/1990
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
6/26/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/1990
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
6/26/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/1990
Description
REQ - Request - Party ()
Docket Date
6/13/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR RULE 609 HEARING
Filing Date
6/12/1990
Description
RVH - Req/Voluntariness Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
6/13/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/12/1990
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party ()
Docket Date
6/13/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/3/1990
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
5/7/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/1990
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
4/26/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
4-3-90
Filing Date
4/12/1990
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
4/19/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/1990
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
4/16/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
REL ORDER-APPEAR BOND $1370-032990 ORDER RE: COUNSEL-PUB DEF; RECCOMMENDATION BACKGROUND INFO; PRIOR CONVICTIONS FINANCIAL INFO; WARR ARREST
Filing Date
4/11/1990
Description
ASI - Amended Not Supervening Indict - Party ()
Docket Date
4/12/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
BOND $1370 NOT POSTED
Filing Date
4/4/1990
Description
NSI - NSI - Party ()
Docket Date
4/5/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
BOND $13700 NOT POSTED
Filing Date
4/4/1990
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
4/5/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/3/1990
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
4/5/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
THEFT CL 3 FEL/DR 09-047458 PPD/DOC 3-24-90
Filing Date
4/3/1990
Description
143 - ME: G J Not/Supervening Indict - Party ()
Docket Date
4/5/1990
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/12/1990
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty