« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
ELLEXSON, RANDY
Judge
Case #
Party Name
PAUL NELSON - (3
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
GIERLOFF, RICHARD
Judge
Araneta
Case #
CR1989-009715-
Party Name
Clerk Of The Court - (4)
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
N/A
Attorney
To Be Determined
Judge
Case #
CR1989-009715-
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/1999
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party ()
Docket Date
12/16/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF IDENTITY
Filing Date
3/23/1998
Description
CRO - Criminal Restitution Order - Party ()
Docket Date
3/23/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
3/23/1998
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
3/31/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED
Filing Date
3/17/1998
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party ()
Docket Date
3/19/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/1998
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed - Party ()
Docket Date
3/19/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/1998
Description
ODP - Ord: Discharge from Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
3/18/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/1996
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
6/19/1996
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/1995
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
4/3/1995
Filing Party
NOTE:
MODIFY CONDIT PROBATION
Filing Date
4/4/1994
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party ()
Docket Date
4/7/1994
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/1993
Description
MEM - Memorandum - Party ()
Docket Date
12/23/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/1993
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
10/19/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/1993
Description
PMC - Petition Mod Cond/Reg of Prob - Party ()
Docket Date
9/7/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/1993
Description
ORD - Order - Party ()
Docket Date
7/2/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/1993
Description
PMP - PET: Modify Cond Prob/Order - Party ()
Docket Date
7/6/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/1993
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
5/7/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/1993
Description
SUM - Summons - Party ()
Docket Date
4/20/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/1993
Description
113 - ME: Violation Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
4/20/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/1993
Description
182 - ME: Disposition Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
4/20/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/1993
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
4/20/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
RIGHTS REVIEW AFTER CONVICTION
Filing Date
4/12/1993
Description
JUD - Judgment - Party ()
Docket Date
4/12/1993
Filing Party
NOTE:
Bond Forfeiture - This docket was added by the conversion for a judgment
Filing Date
4/2/1993
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
4/8/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/1993
Description
112 - ME: Revocation Arraignment - Party ()
Docket Date
3/24/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/1993
Description
PRO - Petition to Revoke Prob/Order - Party ()
Docket Date
3/9/1993
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/1991
Description
PMC - Petition Mod Cond/Reg of Prob - Party ()
Docket Date
12/5/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/1991
Description
PET - Petition - Party ()
Docket Date
8/7/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO MODIFY TERMS OF PROBATION
Filing Date
7/30/1991
Description
333 - ME: Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
8/7/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/1991
Description
MOR - Motion And Order - Party ()
Docket Date
4/4/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
WITHDRAWING RICHARD D GIERLOFF AS COUNSEL FOR DEF
Filing Date
4/2/1991
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party ()
Docket Date
4/8/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/1991
Description
DRE - Disposition - Party ()
Docket Date
3/15/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/1991
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
3/12/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/1991
Description
TOP - Terms & Conditions of Probation - Party ()
Docket Date
3/13/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/1991
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
3/7/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/1991
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
3/11/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/1991
Description
SDT - SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - Party ()
Docket Date
2/13/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/1991
Description
SDT - SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - Party ()
Docket Date
2/13/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/1991
Description
SDT - SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - Party ()
Docket Date
2/7/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
2/4/1991
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
2/7/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/1991
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
2/8/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/1991
Description
RVH - Req/Voluntariness Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
2/6/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/31/1991
Description
NCJ - Notice of Change of Judge - Party ()
Docket Date
2/5/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
1/31/1991
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
2/1/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
CRM/SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
1/30/1991
Description
052 - ME: ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE - Party ()
Docket Date
2/8/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
1/31/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/24/1991
Description
SDT - SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - Party ()
Docket Date
1/25/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/17/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
1/21/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/17/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
1/21/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/17/1991
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
1/21/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/15/1991
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
1/17/1991
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
1/3/1991
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
1/8/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/2/1991
Description
SDT - SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - Party ()
Docket Date
1/4/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 12/28/90
Filing Date
12/31/1990
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
1/2/1991
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/6/1990
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/1990
Description
015 - ME: Trial Reset Date - Party ()
Docket Date
12/14/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/1990
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
12/13/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/6/1990
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
11/8/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/6/1990
Description
015 - ME: Trial Reset Date - Party ()
Docket Date
11/13/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/1990
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
10/25/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
10/9/1990
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
10/15/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/1990
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
10/3/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
9/17/1990
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
9/19/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/1990
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
9/14/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/31/1990
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
9/4/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
8/29/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
8/24/1990
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
8/29/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/1990
Description
MOR - Motion And Order - Party ()
Docket Date
7/5/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR TEMPORARY TRAVEL PERMISSION
Filing Date
6/29/1990
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party ()
Docket Date
7/6/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
7/2/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 6/25/90
Filing Date
6/29/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
7/2/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 6/25/90
Filing Date
6/28/1990
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party ()
Docket Date
10/12/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
6/28/1990
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party ()
Docket Date
10/12/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
6/28/1990
Description
161 - ME: Guilty PLea Set Aside - Party ()
Docket Date
7/6/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/1990
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party ()
Docket Date
10/12/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
6/28/1990
Description
AFF - Affidavit - Party ()
Docket Date
10/12/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
6/28/1990
Description
EXH - Exhibit - Party ()
Docket Date
7/24/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
WORKSHEET
Filing Date
6/26/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
6/27/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/21/1990
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
6/26/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/1990
Description
169 - ME: Sent/Dispo Reset - Party ()
Docket Date
6/14/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/1990
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
5/21/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/1990
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
4/23/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/1990
Description
308 - ME: CASE TRAN FOR REASSIGNMENT - Party ()
Docket Date
3/14/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/1990
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
3/9/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/1990
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
3/8/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/1990
Description
161 - ME: Guilty PLea Set Aside - Party ()
Docket Date
3/7/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/1990
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
2/5/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/1990
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
2/9/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/15/1990
Description
015 - ME: Trial Reset Date - Party ()
Docket Date
1/18/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/1990
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
1/16/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
12/7/1989
Description
058 - ME: MOTION DENIED - Party ()
Docket Date
12/12/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/1989
Description
058 - ME: MOTION DENIED - Party ()
Docket Date
12/12/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/1989
Description
057 - ME: MOTION GRANTED - Party ()
Docket Date
12/12/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/1989
Description
NOT - Notice - Party ()
Docket Date
12/12/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF DEFENSES & NOTICE OF DEFENSE WITNESSES
Filing Date
12/5/1989
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
12/12/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR DESSUREAULT HEARING
Filing Date
12/5/1989
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
12/12/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
12/4/1989
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
12/9/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TRIAL
Filing Date
11/27/1989
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
12/1/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR REMAND FOR NEW DETERMINATION OF PROABLE CAUSE RULE 12.9 ARCP
Filing Date
11/24/1989
Description
058 - ME: MOTION DENIED - Party ()
Docket Date
12/4/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/1989
Description
ADN - Allegation Dangerous Nature Felony - Party ()
Docket Date
11/17/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
11/13/1989
Description
057 - ME: MOTION GRANTED - Party ()
Docket Date
11/22/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/1989
Description
057 - ME: MOTION GRANTED - Party ()
Docket Date
11/15/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/1989
Description
MET - Motion/Extension of Time - Party ()
Docket Date
11/14/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
11/3/1989
Description
TRF - Mot/Ord Temp Removal File Etc - Party ()
Docket Date
11/9/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
11/2/1989
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
11/8/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO SEVER COUNTS
Filing Date
10/12/1989
Description
999 - ME: Other - Party ()
Docket Date
10/18/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE ORDER REGARDING COUNSEL & REIMBURSEMENT; RELEASE ORDER - OWN RECOGNIZANCE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; SUMMONS SUBPOENA; RELEASE ORDER-OWN RECOGNIZANCE
Filing Date
10/11/1989
Description
TSP - TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - Party ()
Docket Date
10/16/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
09-19-89
Filing Date
10/10/1989
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
10/13/1989
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
10/10/1989
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
10/13/1989
Filing Party
NOTE:
O/R
Filing Date
10/4/1989
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
10/19/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/1989
Description
SUM - Summons - Party ()
Docket Date
10/3/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED CERTIFIED MAIL 09-29-89/CTS I II
Filing Date
9/20/1989
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
10/3/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
9/19/1989
Description
144 - ME: G J True Bill/Summons Iss - Party ()
Docket Date
10/3/1989
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/1989
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
10/3/1989
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS I II AGGRAVATED ASSULT CL 3 FELONIES; DR 89-6549 89-48221 GPD 01-28-89/07-15-89
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/4/1989
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty