« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Type:
Criminal
Location:
Downtown
Party Information
Party Name - Number
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Judge
Case #
Party Name
State Of Arizona - (1)
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
N/A
Attorney
KNOPF, WILLIAM
Judge
Case #
Party Name
PAUL CHARLES NELSON - (2
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
M
Attorney
KENDALL, MARK
Judge
McClennen
Case #
CR1988-009720-B
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/1999
Description
ODI - ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Party ()
Docket Date
2/22/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
W/O PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/22/1999
Description
MTD - Motion to Dismiss - Party ()
Docket Date
2/22/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
W/O PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/22/1999
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full - Party ()
Docket Date
2/22/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
W/O PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/7/1991
Description
RNL - RELEASE NOTIFICATION LETTER - Party ()
Docket Date
5/13/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/1991
Description
RNL - RELEASE NOTIFICATION LETTER - Party ()
Docket Date
3/29/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/1991
Description
LET - Letter - Party ()
Docket Date
2/27/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/1991
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order - Party ()
Docket Date
2/28/1991
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/1990
Description
NRA - Notice of Right to Appeal - Party ()
Docket Date
9/4/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/1990
Description
PSR - Presentence Report - Party ()
Docket Date
9/5/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/1990
Description
181 - ME: Sentencing - Party ()
Docket Date
9/6/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/1990
Description
NDR - NOT DEFENSES/REQ REBUTTAL WITS - Party ()
Docket Date
8/7/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
& NOT/WITNESSES/EXHIBITS
Filing Date
8/7/1990
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
8/7/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO STATE'S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Filing Date
8/3/1990
Description
105 - ME: Plea Agreement/Change of Plea - Party ()
Docket Date
8/8/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
8/6/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
8/6/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/1990
Description
012 - ME: Trial - Party ()
Docket Date
8/8/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/1990
Description
PAG - Plea Agreement - Party ()
Docket Date
8/7/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/1990
Description
SUA - SUBPOENA AND AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - Party ()
Docket Date
8/3/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
8/2/1990
Description
SUA - SUBPOENA AND AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - Party ()
Docket Date
8/3/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
8/1/1990
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
8/2/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
7/24/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/1990
Description
176 - ME: CONTINUANCE - Party ()
Docket Date
7/20/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/1990
Description
MCO - Motion to Continue - Party ()
Docket Date
7/13/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/11/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
7/12/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 7-10-90
Filing Date
7/11/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
7/12/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 7-10-90
Filing Date
7/11/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
7/12/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 7-10-90
Filing Date
7/11/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
7/12/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 7-10-90
Filing Date
7/11/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
7/12/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 7-10-90
Filing Date
7/11/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
7/12/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 7-10-90
Filing Date
7/11/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
7/12/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 7-10-90
Filing Date
7/11/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
7/12/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 7-10-90
Filing Date
7/11/1990
Description
SUB - SUBPOENA - Party ()
Docket Date
7/12/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 7-10-90
Filing Date
7/10/1990
Description
RES - Response - Party ()
Docket Date
7/11/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEFENSE MOTION TO SUPPRESS ALL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
7/9/1990
Description
PRA - Praecipe - Party ()
Docket Date
7/19/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CRIMINAL SUBPOENA
Filing Date
7/3/1990
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed - Party ()
Docket Date
7/10/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/1990
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
6/25/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO IMPOSE SANCTIONS
Filing Date
6/22/1990
Description
MOT - Motion - Party ()
Docket Date
6/26/1990
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO SUPPRESS ALL EVIDENCE
Filing Date
5/4/1990
Description
ACO - Allegation of Historical Priors - Party ()
Docket Date
5/8/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
ALLEG/HANNAH
Filing Date
5/3/1990
Description
151 - ME: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - Party ()
Docket Date
5/7/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/1990
Description
CSR - Case Status Report - Party ()
Docket Date
5/9/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/1990
Description
RVH - Req/Voluntariness Hearing - Party ()
Docket Date
4/24/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/23/1990
Description
NDP - NOT DISC/INTRVWS/PLEA Offer - Party ()
Docket Date
4/24/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/16/1990
Description
ORC - Order Regarding Counsel - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
PUB DEFENDER
Filing Date
4/16/1990
Description
FIN - Financial Information - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/1990
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
REL-BOND $13,700 4-6-90
Filing Date
4/16/1990
Description
PRC - Pretrl Srvcs Agncy/Recommendtion - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/1990
Description
PBA - PRETRIAL SRVCS AGENCY BACKGRND - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/1990
Description
RQU - RELEASE QUESTIONNAIRE - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/1990
Description
ROR - RELEASE ORDER - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND $13700 04-13-90
Filing Date
4/13/1990
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/1990
Description
152 - ME: Not Guilty Plea Arraign - Party ()
Docket Date
4/18/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/1990
Description
BAB - Bail Bond - Party ()
Docket Date
4/17/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMT: $13,700
Filing Date
4/10/1990
Description
WAR - WARRANT FOR ARREST - Party ()
Docket Date
4/16/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 04-06-90/CTS I II III IV V VI VII VIII X; XI XII XIII XIV/APPEARANCE BOND $13700
Filing Date
4/9/1990
Description
WAR - WARRANT FOR ARREST - Party ()
Docket Date
4/16/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SERVED 04-06-90/CTS I II III IV V VI VII VIII X; XI XII XIII XIV/APPEARANCE BOND $13700 (COPY)
Filing Date
12/5/1988
Description
SUM - Summons - Party ()
Docket Date
4/16/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
QUASHED REPLACED WITH WARRANT 11-30-88
Filing Date
11/30/1988
Description
147 - ME: G J Quash Summ/Issue Warr - Party ()
Docket Date
4/16/1990
Filing Party
NOTE:
BOND AMOUNT $13700
Filing Date
10/21/1988
Description
DWL - Defendant/Witness List - Party ()
Docket Date
4/16/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
10/20/1988
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
4/16/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
CTS I III V VII IX X XIII BURGLARY 3RD DEG CL 4 FELONIES (A&B); CT IX BURGLARY 3RD DEG CL 4 FEL (A); CTS II VIII XII THEFT CL 3 FELONIES (A&B); CTS IV XIV THEFT CL 4 FELONIES (A&B); CT VI THEFT CL 5 FEL (A&B)
Filing Date
10/20/1988
Description
144 - ME: G J True Bill/Summons Iss - Party ()
Docket Date
4/16/1990
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/20/1988
Description
IND - Indictment - Party ()
Docket Date
4/16/1990
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
DR 88-067836 88-066108 88-066109 88-064771 88-044283 PPD; 88-29973 88-29940 88-28812 GPD/04-0-88 05-13-88 THRU 05-17-88; 05-15-88 THRU 05-18-88 05-18-88 THRU 05-20-88 05-21-88
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/13/1990
Time
8:30
Event
Original Arraignment Not Guilty